Depot: Gateshead
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Gateshead | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | B14 | 4-6-0 | 2111 | m/e | 12/1900 (New) | GHD | on | 07/11/1924 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||||
Steam | B14 | 4-6-0 | 2112 | m/e | 06/1901 (New) | GHD | on | 07/10/1924 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||||
Steam | B14 | 4-6-0 | 2113 | m/e | 06/1901 (New) | GHD | on | 07/11/1924 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||||
Steam | B14 | 4-6-0 | 2114 | m/e | 06/1901 (New) | GHD | on | 07/10/1924 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||||
Steam | B14 | 4-6-0 | 2115 | m/e | 08/1901 (New) | GHD | on | 07/11/1924 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||||
Steam | H1 | 4-4-4T | 2153 | m/e | 12/1913 (New) | GHD | on | 08/08/1934 | DAR | Darlington | ||||
Steam | H1 | 4-4-4T | 2154 | m/e | 12/1913 (New) | GHD | on | 18/01/1939 | SUN | Sunderland | ||||
Steam | H1 | 4-4-4T | 2155 | m/e | 02/1914 (New) | GHD | on | 02/12/1927 | MID | Middlesbrough | ||||
Steam | H1 | 4-4-4T | 2156 | on | 27/06/1902 | BLA | Blaydon | m/e | 02/1914 (New) | GHD | on | 21/07/1926 | HTN | Heaton |
Steam | H1 | 4-4-4T | 1517 | m/e | 05/1920 (New) | GHD | on | 21/07/1926 | HTN | Heaton | ||||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 920 | m/e | 09/1920 (New) | GHD | on | 29/06/1936 | YK | York (North) | ||||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 2363 | m/e | 11/1922 (New) | GHD | on | 31/05/1937 | YK | York (North) | ||||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | 2400 | m/e | 12/1922 (New) | GHD | on | 07/05/1934 | YK | York (North) | ||||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 2365 | m/e | 12/1922 (New) | GHD | m/e | 01/1925 | BLA | Blaydon | ||||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | 2401 | on | 30/12/1922 (New) | GHD | on | 09/02/1934 | YK | York (North) | ||||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 2367 | on | 17/01/1923 (New) | GHD | on | 30/03/1931 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 2369 | on | 08/03/1923 (New) | GHD | on | 30/03/1931 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 2371 | on | 28/03/1923 (New) | GHD | on | 23/06/1931 | YK | York (North) | ||||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 2375 | on | 23/05/1923 (New) | GHD | on | 16/01/1937 | DAR | Darlington | ||||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 2377 | on | 06/06/1923 (New) | GHD | on | 15/01/1937 | BLA | Blaydon | ||||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 2379 | on | 30/06/1923 (New) | GHD | on | 30/03/1931 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 2381 | on | 16/08/1923 (New) | GHD | on | 29/06/1936 | YK | York (North) | ||||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | 1481 | on | 08/09/1923 | DON | Doncaster (New) | on | 01/11/1923 | GHD | on | 10/04/1924 | DON | Doncaster |
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | 2402 | on | 11/03/1924 (New) | GHD | on | 13/08/1934 | YK | York (North) | ||||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | 2403 | on | 24/03/1924 (New) | GHD | on | 26/04/1934 | YK | York (North) | ||||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | 2404 | on | 25/03/1924 (New) | GHD | on | 07/11/1934 | YK | York (North) | ||||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | 2568 | on | 19/09/1924 (New) | GHD | on | 11/12/1936 | YK | York (North) | ||||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | 2569 | on | 24/09/1924 (New) | GHD | on | 18/04/1938 | YK | York (North) | ||||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | 2570 | on | 27/09/1924 (New) | GHD | on | 11/11/1936 | YK | York (North) | ||||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | 2571 | on | 30/09/1924 (New) | GHD | on | 28/03/1943 | HTN | Heaton | ||||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | 2572 | on | 03/10/1924 (New) | GHD | on | 28/03/1943 | YK | York (North) | ||||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | 2573 | on | 08/10/1924 (New) | GHD | on | 18/04/1928 | HAY | Haymarket | ||||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | 2574 | on | 11/10/1924 (New) | GHD | on | 17/08/1952 | 51A | Darlington | ||||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | 2575 | on | 14/10/1924 (New) | GHD | on | 19/12/1948 | DAR | Darlington | ||||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | 2576 | on | 19/10/1924 (New) | GHD | on | 17/11/1936 | YK | York (North) | ||||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | 2577 | on | 24/10/1924 (New) | GHD | on | 07/01/1937 | YK | York (North) | ||||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | 1712 | on | 25/09/1925 | DAR | Darlington (New) | on | 22/10/1925 | GHD | on | 21/08/1929 | HTN | Heaton |
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | 4419 | on | 03/05/1924 | DAR | Darlington | on | 27/10/1925 | GHD | on | 05/12/1925 | HTN | Heaton |
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | 1750 | on | 31/10/1925 (New) | GHD | on | 21/08/1929 | HTN | Heaton | ||||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | 2562 | on | 27/06/1925 | DON | Doncaster (New) | on | 07/12/1925 | GHD | on | 26/09/1926 | DON | Doncaster |
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | 1784 | on | 10/02/1926 (New) | GHD | on | 28/05/1928 | SALT | Saltburn | ||||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | 1719 | m/e | 03/1926 | DAR | Darlington | on | 20/05/1926 | GHD | on | 21/08/1929 | HTN | Heaton |
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | 1766 | m/e | 03/1926 | DAR | Darlington | on | 20/05/1926 | GHD | on | 28/05/1928 | SALT | Saltburn |
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | 1767 | m/e | 02/1926 | NEV | Neville Hill | on | 20/05/1926 | GHD | on | 28/05/1928 | SALT | Saltburn |
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | 2565 | on | 16/07/1924 | HAY | Haymarket (New) | on | 05/05/1928 | GHD | on | 05/07/1928 | HAY | Haymarket |
Steam | H1 | 4-4-4T | 2144 | m/e | 10/1913 | SALT | Saltburn (New) | on | 28/05/1928 | GHD | on | 09/07/1938 | TDK | Tyne Dock |
Steam | H1 | 4-4-4T | 2146 | m/e | 11/1913 | SALT | Saltburn (New) | on | 28/05/1928 | GHD | on | 17/01/1939 | BLA | Blaydon |
Steam | H1 | 4-4-4T | 2148 | m/e | 12/1913 | SALT | Saltburn (New) | on | 28/05/1928 | GHD | on | 19/06/1934 | HTN | Heaton |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 2573 | on | 18/04/1928 | HAY | Haymarket | on | 05/07/1928 | GHD | on | 12/04/1937 | HAY | Haymarket |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 2580 | on | 09/11/1924 | HTN | Heaton (New) | on | 29/09/1928 | GHD | on | 05/03/1930 | HTN | Heaton |
Steam | H1 | 4-4-4T | 2157 | m/e | 02/1914 | HTN | Heaton (New) | on | 21/08/1929 | GHD | on | 27/06/1935 | SKN | Stockton |
Steam | H1 | 4-4-4T | 2158 | m/e | 03/1914 | HTN | Heaton (New) | on | 21/08/1929 | GHD | on | 25/05/1935 | MID | Middlesbrough |
Steam | H1 | 4-4-4T | 2160 | m/e | 03/1914 | HTN | Heaton (New) | on | 21/08/1929 | GHD | on | 19/06/1934 | HTN | Heaton |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 2595 | on | 22/02/1930 (New) | GHD | on | 28/03/1943 | HTN | Heaton | ||||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 2596 | on | 22/02/1930 (New) | GHD | on | 28/03/1943 | HTN | Heaton | ||||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 2597 | on | 07/04/1930 (New) | GHD | on | 15/03/1936 | DON | Doncaster | ||||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 2598 | on | 14/06/1930 (New) | GHD | on | 29/07/1937 | DON | Doncaster | ||||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 2599 | on | 12/07/1930 (New) | GHD | on | 08/10/1937 | HAY | Haymarket | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2260 | m/e | 02/1920 | BLA | Blaydon (New) | on | 07/11/1931 | GHD | on | 26/11/1931 | BLA | Blaydon |
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | 631 | m/e | 1927 | BOR | Borough Gardens | on | 29/05/1933 | GHD | on | 10/02/1938 | SEL | Selby |
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | 633 | m/e | 1930 | BOR | Borough Gardens | on | 29/05/1933 | GHD | on | 03/04/1935 | GHD | Gateshead |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 2501 | on | 09/07/1934 (New) | GHD | on | 09/12/1939 | YK | York (North) | ||||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 2503 | on | 11/08/1934 (New) | GHD | on | 30/09/1939 | HTN | Heaton | ||||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 2504 | on | 09/09/1934 (New) | GHD | on | 30/11/1935 | DON | Doncaster | ||||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 2507 | on | 01/12/1934 (New) | GHD | on | 27/09/1945 | NEV | Neville Hill | ||||
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | 633 | on | 29/05/1933 | GHD | Gateshead | on | 03/04/1935 | GHD | on | 19/03/1937 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | 1179 | on | 12/09/1932 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 06/06/1935 | GHD | on | 23/10/1937 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 1522 | on | 29/05/1934 | SKN | Stockton | on | 27/06/1935 | GHD | on | 31/12/1936 | DAR | Darlington |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 2156 | on | 21/07/1926 | HTN | Heaton | on | 30/09/1935 | GHD | H | 12/1935 | GHD | Gateshead |
Steam | H1 | 4-4-4T | 1521 | m/e | 12/1921 | BLA | Blaydon (New) | on | 05/10/1935 | GHD | on | 16/07/1936 | DAR | Darlington |
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | 2511 | on | 05/11/1935 | KX | Kings Cross (New) | on | 18/11/1935 | GHD | on | 10/11/1939 | HTN | Heaton |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 2156 | on | 30/09/1935 | GHD | Gateshead | H | 12/1935 | GHD | on | 16/07/1938 | SKN | Stockton |
Steam | N9 | 0-6-2T | 1652 | by | 01/01/1923 | AFP | Annfield Plain | H | 12/1935 | GHD | on | 01/01/1948 | PEL | |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 2161 | m/e | 04/1914 | SBK | Starbeck (New) | on | 23/01/1936 | GHD | on | 20/03/1939 | MID | Middlesbrough |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 2743 | on | 22/08/1928 | DON | Doncaster (New) | on | 15/03/1936 | GHD | on | 17/07/1936 | DON | Doncaster |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 2597 | on | 15/03/1936 | DON | Doncaster | on | 17/07/1936 | GHD | on | 30/09/1939 | HTN | Heaton |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 645 | on | 04/06/1927 | BOR | Borough Gardens | on | 05/10/1936 | GHD | on | 21/11/1940 | HTN | Heaton |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 2746 | on | 26/10/1928 | KX | Kings Cross (New) | on | 10/11/1936 | GHD | on | 15/12/1936 | KX | Kings Cross |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 2505 | on | 27/10/1934 | HAY | Haymarket (New) | on | 16/11/1936 | GHD | on | 02/12/1939 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | 2576 | on | 17/11/1936 | YK | York (North) | on | 11/12/1936 | GHD | on | 28/03/1943 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | 2510 | on | 21/09/1935 | KX | Kings Cross (New) | on | 15/12/1936 | GHD | on | 26/01/1937 | KX | Kings Cross |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 2544 | on | 27/08/1924 | DON | Doncaster | on | 06/01/1937 | GHD | on | 17/05/1938 | HTN | Heaton |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 2746 | on | 15/12/1936 | KX | Kings Cross | on | 14/01/1937 | GHD | on | 28/03/1943 | HTN | Heaton |
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | 4487 | on | 20/03/1937 | HAY | Haymarket (New) | on | 26/03/1937 | GHD | on | 21/02/1938 | HAY | Haymarket |
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | 4493 | on | 26/07/1937 (New) | GHD | on | 19/00/1938 | DON | Doncaster | ||||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | 4485 | on | 20/02/1937 | HAY | Haymarket (New) | on | 08/10/1937 | GHD | on | 22/01/1938 | HAY | Haymarket |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 2598 | on | 29/07/1937 | DON | Doncaster | on | 13/10/1937 | GHD | on | 16/10/1937 | HAY | Haymarket |
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | 4463 | on | 14/12/1937 | GHD | on | 26/10/1940 | HTN | Heaton | ||||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | 4465 | on | 08/01/1938 (New) | GHD | on | 30/11/1944 | HTN | Heaton | ||||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 2599 | on | 08/10/1937 | HAY | Haymarket | on | 23/01/1938 | GHD | on | 28/03/1943 | HTN | Heaton |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 578 | on | 22/03/1924 | SEL | Selby | on | 05/02/1938 | GHD | on | 21/11/1940 | HTN | Heaton |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 2598 | on | 16/10/1937 | HAY | Haymarket | on | 08/02/1938 | GHD | on | 09/03/1939 | HAY | Haymarket |
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | 4462 | on | 10/12/1937 | KX | Kings Cross (New) | on | 16/02/1938 | GHD | on | 17/06/1940 | HTN | Heaton |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 2573 | on | 12/04/1937 | HAY | Haymarket | on | 21/02/1938 | GHD | on | 02/12/1939 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | 4469 | on | 30/03/1938 (New) | GHD | on | 06/06/1942 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | 4499 | on | 12/04/1938 (New) | GHD | on | 31/08/1943 | KX | Kings Cross | ||||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | 4500 | on | 26/04/1938 (New) | GHD | on | 12/10/1964 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | 4901 | on | 08/06/1938 (New) | GHD | on | 28/10/1963 | 64A | St Margarets | ||||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 2144 | on | 09/07/1938 | TDK | Tyne Dock | on | 17/09/1938 | GHD | on | 14/11/1938 | SUN | Sunderland |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 2149 | on | 17/03/1936 | HTN | Heaton | on | 17/09/1938 | GHD | on | 17/11/1938 | SUN | Sunderland |
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | 2559 | on | 09/03/1938 | GRA | Grantham | on | 09/03/1939 | GHD | on | 27/01/1952 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 4831 | on | 26/05/1939 (New) | GHD | on | 30/09/1939 | HTN | Heaton | ||||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 2503 | on | 30/09/1939 | HTN | Heaton | on | 10/11/1939 | GHD | on | 04/01/1943 | HTN | Heaton |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 2505 | on | 02/12/1939 | YK | York (North) | on | 09/12/1939 | GHD | on | 28/03/1943 | HTN | Heaton |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 1467 | on | 19/06/1939 | TWD | Tweedmouth | on | 20/01/1940 | GHD | on | 28/03/1943 | DAR | Darlington |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 2544 | on | 17/05/1938 | HTN | Heaton | on | 22/01/1940 | GHD | on | 28/02/1954 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 2578 | on | 31/01/1938 | HTN | Heaton | on | 22/01/1940 | GHD | on | 06/01/1945 | HTN | Heaton |
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | 2582 | on | 06/12/1924 | HTN | Heaton (New) | on | 17/06/1940 | GHD | on | 26/10/1940 | HTN | Heaton |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 3659 | on | 22/10/1941 (New) | GHD | on | 03/11/1945 | TWD | Tweedmouth | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 4897 | on | 17/12/1941 (New) | GHD | on | 19/11/1950 | 52B | Heaton | ||||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | 4482 | on | 01/08/1941 | HTN | Heaton | on | 05/01/1942 | GHD | on | 28/10/1963 | 64A | St Margarets |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 3641 | on | 12/02/1942 (New) | GHD | on | 03/11/1945 | HTN | Heaton | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 3644 | on | 13/03/1942 (New) | GHD | on | 19/11/1950 | 52B | Heaton | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 3649 | on | 03/06/1942 (New) | GHD | on | 03/11/1945 | HTN | Heaton | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 3654 | on | 18/07/1942 (New) | GHD | on | 06/02/1949 | HTN | Heaton | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 3669 | on | 07/10/1942 (New) | GHD | on | 06/05/1946 | HTN | Heaton | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 3671 | on | 02/11/1942 (New) | GHD | on | 06/02/1949 | HTN | Heaton | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 3677 | on | 25/02/1943 (New) | GHD | on | 30/11/1952 | 64A | St Margarets | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 3678 | on | 15/03/1943 (New) | GHD | on | 13/10/1946 | HTN | Heaton | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 3679 | on | 26/03/1943 (New) | GHD | on | 12/06/1960 | 51L | Thornaby | ||||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | 2511 | on | 10/11/1939 | HTN | Heaton | on | 28/03/1943 | GHD | on | 03/05/1943 | HTN | Heaton |
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | 4463 | on | 26/10/1940 | HTN | Heaton | on | 28/03/1943 | GHD | on | 03/05/1943 | HTN | Heaton |
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | 4464 | on | 18/12/1937 | HTN | Heaton (New) | on | 28/03/1943 | GHD | on | 28/10/1963 | 64A | St Margarets |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 4772 | on | 08/08/1936 | YK | York (North) (New) | on | 28/03/1943 | GHD | on | 06/02/1949 | HTN | Heaton |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 4773 | on | 03/10/1936 | YK | York (North) (New) | on | 28/03/1943 | GHD | on | 13/10/1946 | HTN | Heaton |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 4776 | on | 16/07/1937 | YK | York (North) (New) | on | 28/03/1943 | GHD | on | 06/02/1949 | HTN | Heaton |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 4777 | on | 06/08/1937 | YK | York (North) (New) | on | 28/03/1943 | GHD | on | 06/02/1949 | HTN | Heaton |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 4778 | on | 24/08/1937 | HTN | Heaton (New) | on | 28/03/1943 | GHD | on | 06/02/1949 | HTN | Heaton |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 4779 | on | 09/09/1937 | HTN | Heaton (New) | on | 28/03/1943 | GHD | on | 06/05/1946 | HTN | Heaton |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 4780 | on | 31/08/1937 | YK | York (North) (New) | on | 28/03/1943 | GHD | on | 06/02/1949 | HTN | Heaton |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 4781 | on | 03/09/1937 | HTN | Heaton (New) | on | 28/03/1943 | GHD | on | 06/02/1949 | HTN | Heaton |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 4782 | on | 10/09/1937 | YK | York (North) (New) | on | 28/03/1943 | GHD | on | 06/02/1949 | HTN | Heaton |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 4783 | on | 18/09/1937 | HTN | Heaton (New) | on | 28/03/1943 | GHD | on | 03/11/1945 | HTN | Heaton |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 4804 | on | 27/09/1938 | HTN | Heaton | on | 28/03/1943 | GHD | on | 06/02/1949 | HTN | Heaton |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 4806 | on | 23/09/1938 | YK | York (North) (New) | on | 28/03/1943 | GHD | on | 06/02/1949 | HTN | Heaton |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 4831 | on | 30/09/1939 | HTN | Heaton | on | 28/03/1943 | GHD | on | 06/02/1949 | HTN | Heaton |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 4839 | on | 19/08/1939 | HTN | Heaton | on | 28/03/1943 | GHD | on | 06/02/1949 | HTN | Heaton |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 4854 | on | 20/10/1939 | HTN | Heaton (New) | on | 28/03/1943 | GHD | on | 15/04/1956 | 52B | Heaton |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 4855 | on | 27/10/1939 | HTN | Heaton (New) | on | 28/03/1943 | GHD | on | 19/11/1950 | 52B | Heaton |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 4856 | on | 10/11/1939 | HTN | Heaton (New) | on | 28/03/1943 | GHD | on | 19/11/1950 | 52B | Heaton |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 4857 | on | 18/11/1939 | HTN | Heaton (New) | on | 28/03/1943 | GHD | on | 06/05/1946 | HTN | Heaton |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 4858 | on | 30/11/1939 | HTN | Heaton (New) | on | 28/03/1943 | GHD | on | 06/02/1949 | HTN | Heaton |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 4859 | on | 07/12/1939 | HTN | Heaton (New) | on | 28/03/1943 | GHD | on | 13/10/1945 | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 4862 | on | 29/12/1939 | HTN | Heaton (New) | on | 28/03/1943 | GHD | on | 06/05/1946 | HTN | Heaton |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 4866 | on | 26/01/1940 | HTN | Heaton (New) | on | 28/03/1943 | GHD | on | 03/11/1945 | HTN | Heaton |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 4869 | on | 22/02/1940 | HTN | Heaton (New) | on | 28/03/1943 | GHD | on | 13/10/1945 | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 4881 | on | 10/05/1940 | YK | York (North) (New) | on | 28/03/1943 | GHD | on | 06/02/1949 | HTN | Heaton |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 4890 | on | 07/09/1941 | HTN | Heaton (New) | on | 28/03/1943 | GHD | on | 14/02/1944 | TWD | Tweedmouth |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 4894 | on | 15/11/1941 | HTN | Heaton (New) | on | 28/03/1943 | GHD | on | 02/12/1962 | 56B | Ardsley |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 3642 | on | 21/02/1942 | HTN | Heaton (New) | on | 28/03/1943 | GHD | on | 13/12/1959 | 52B | Heaton |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 3646 | on | 17/04/1942 | HTN | Heaton (New) | on | 28/03/1943 | GHD | on | 13/10/1946 | HTN | Heaton |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 3651 | on | 18/06/1942 | HTN | Heaton (New) | on | 28/03/1943 | GHD | on | 13/10/1946 | HTN | Heaton |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 3675 | on | 12/01/1943 | HTN | Heaton (New) | on | 28/03/1943 | GHD | on | 24/11/1944 | DAR | Darlington |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 3676 | on | 26/01/1943 | HTN | Heaton (New) | on | 28/03/1943 | GHD | on | 08/05/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 2599 | on | 28/03/1943 | HTN | Heaton | on | 03/05/1943 | GHD | on | 03/11/1945 | HTN | Heaton |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 2503 | on | 04/01/1943 | HTN | Heaton | on | 03/05/1943 | GHD | on | 22/02/1953 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | 4493 | on | 25/02/1938 | KX | Kings Cross | on | 31/08/1943 | GHD | on | 10/10/1943 | KX | Kings Cross |
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | 4499 | on | 31/08/1943 | KX | Kings Cross | on | 10/10/1943 | GHD | on | 04/05/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 2596 | on | 28/03/1943 | HTN | Heaton | on | 14/02/1944 | GHD | on | 31/08/1944 | HTN | Heaton |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 4890 | on | 14/02/1944 | TWD | Tweedmouth | on | 24/04/1944 | GHD | on | 13/10/1945 | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 8309 | on | 13/05/1944 | DAR | Darlington (New) | on | 03/06/1944 | GHD | on | 18/08/1944 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 2579 | on | 03/11/1924 | HTN | Heaton (New) | on | 31/08/1944 | GHD | on | 03/11/1945 | HTN | Heaton |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 2597 | on | 28/03/1943 | HTN | Heaton | on | 30/11/1944 | GHD | on | 06/02/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0T | 5087 | on | 17/09/1944 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 13/12/1944 | GHD | on | 06/02/1949 | SEL | Selby |
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0T | 5044 | on | 17/09/1944 | SEL | Selby | on | 13/12/1944 | GHD | on | 06/02/1949 | SEL | Selby |
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | 2511 | on | 03/05/1943 | HTN | Heaton | on | 06/01/1945 | GHD | on | 28/10/1963 | 64A | St Margarets |
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | 2003 | on | 17/12/1944 | KX | Kings Cross | on | 02/02/1945 | GHD | on | 20/03/1945 | HAY | Haymarket |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 2578 | on | 06/01/1945 | HTN | Heaton | on | 28/05/1945 | GHD | on | 30/05/1948 | CAR | Carlisle Canal |
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | 4465 | on | 30/11/1944 | HTN | Heaton | on | 01/10/1945 | GHD | on | 20/03/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 2595 | on | 28/03/1943 | HTN | Heaton | on | 03/11/1945 | GHD | on | 04/09/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 2501 | on | 28/03/1943 | HTN | Heaton | on | 03/11/1945 | GHD | on | 01/08/1947 | KX | Kings Cross |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 2505 | on | 28/03/1943 | HTN | Heaton | on | 03/11/1945 | GHD | on | 20/09/1953 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | 4463 | on | 03/05/1943 | HTN | Heaton | on | 03/11/1945 | GHD | on | 19/06/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 2573 | on | 28/03/1943 | HTN | Heaton | on | 03/11/1945 | GHD | on | 06/02/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 2580 | on | 28/03/1943 | HTN | Heaton | on | 03/11/1945 | GHD | on | 06/02/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 577 | on | 27/09/1945 | NEV | Neville Hill | on | 06/05/1946 | GHD | on | 22/03/1953 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | 538 | on | 18/04/1938 | YK | York (North) | on | 06/05/1946 | GHD | on | 12/12/1948 | DAR | Darlington |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 539 | on | 29/09/1945 | NEV | Neville Hill | on | 06/05/1946 | GHD | on | 27/01/1952 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 546 | on | 29/09/1945 | NEV | Neville Hill | on | 06/05/1946 | GHD | on | 13/02/1955 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | 500 | on | 24/05/1946 (New) | GHD | on | 07/06/1946 | KX | Kings Cross | ||||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | 511 | on | 20/07/1946 (New) | GHD | on | 08/09/1946 | HTN | Heaton | ||||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | 512 | on | 24/08/1946 (New) | GHD | on | 08/09/1946 | HTN | Heaton | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1100 | on | 26/11/1946 (New) | GHD | on | 10/02/1957 | 52C | Blaydon | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1011 | on | 30/11/1946 (New) | GHD | on | 23/09/1956 | 56B | Ardsley | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1012 | on | 30/11/1946 (New) | GHD | on | 17/07/1960 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1013 | on | 14/12/1946 (New) | GHD | on | 23/09/1956 | 56B | Ardsley | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1014 | on | 23/12/1946 (New) | GHD | on | 17/01/1954 | 52D | Tweedmouth | ||||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | 518 | on | 28/12/1946 (New) | GHD | on | 25/02/1960 | 52B | Heaton | ||||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | 521 | on | 08/05/1947 (New) | GHD | on | 22/05/1960 | 52B | Heaton | ||||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | 522 | on | 19/06/1947 (New) | GHD | on | 16/08/1947 | YK | York (North) | ||||
Steam | A1/1 | 4-6-2 | 113 | on | 07/10/1945 | KX | Kings Cross | on | 24/07/1947 | GHD | on | 02/09/1947 | HAY | Haymarket |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 36 | on | 01/08/1947 | KX | Kings Cross | on | 09/09/1947 | GHD | on | 06/02/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1238 | on | 26/09/1947 (New) | GHD | on | 10/02/1957 | 52C | Blaydon | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 2736 | on | 01/01/1948 | GHD | w/e | 09/10/1948 | YK | York (North) | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 2738 | on | 01/01/1948 | GHD | w/e | 02/10/1948 | SBK | Starbeck | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 2739 | on | 01/01/1948 | GHD | w/e | 21/08/1948 | NEV | Neville Hill | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 2742 | on | 01/01/1948 | GHD | w/e | 13/11/1948 | YK | York (North) | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 2745 | on | 01/01/1948 | GHD | w/e | 13/11/1948 | YK | York (North) | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 2747 | on | 01/01/1948 | GHD | w/e | 08/01/1949 | BLA | Blaydon | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 2749 | H | 12/1935 | NEV | Neville Hill | on | 01/01/1948 | GHD | w/e | 21/08/1948 | SCA | Scarborough |
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 2750 | on | 01/01/1948 | GHD | w/e | 18/03/1950 | 53D | Bridlington | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 2764 | on | 01/01/1948 | GHD | w/e | 17/09/1949 | SCA | Scarborough | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 2766 | on | 01/01/1948 | GHD | w/e | 18/03/1950 | 53D | Bridlington | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 2771 | on | 01/01/1948 | GHD | w/e | 08/01/1949 | BLA | Blaydon | ||||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 8234 | on | 01/01/1948 | GHD | w/e | 02/10/1948 | HTN | Heaton | ||||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 8247 | on | 01/01/1948 | GHD | w/e | 23/07/1950 | 52B | Heaton | ||||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 8251 | on | 01/01/1948 | GHD | 4w/e | 19/12/1953 | 52B | Heaton | ||||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 8262 | on | 01/01/1948 | GHD | w/e | 09/10/1948 | HTN | Heaton | ||||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 8265 | on | 01/01/1948 | GHD | w/e | 19/06/1948 | HTN | Heaton | ||||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 8267 | on | 01/01/1948 | GHD | w/e | 09/10/1948 | HTN | Heaton | ||||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 8270 | on | 01/01/1948 | GHD | on | 21/11/1955 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 8283 | on | 01/01/1948 | GHD | on | 30/07/1959 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 8309 | on | 01/01/1948 | GHD | w/e | 18/04/1959 | 50A | York (North) | ||||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 8314 | on | 01/01/1948 | GHD | w/e | 23/01/1960 | 52D | Tweedmouth | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 8674 | on | 01/01/1948 | GHD | on | 16/10/1961 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 8680 | on | 01/01/1948 | GHD | on | 16/10/1961 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 8693 | on | 01/01/1948 | GHD | on | 24/08/1961 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 8702 | on | 01/01/1948 | GHD | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 52C | Blaydon | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 8720 | on | 01/01/1948 | GHD | w/e | 14/05/1960 | 52D | Tweedmouth | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 8723 | on | 01/01/1948 | GHD | on | 23/09/1963 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 1875 | on | 01/01/1948 | GHD | w/e | 05/06/1948 | MAR | March | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 1878 | on | 01/01/1948 | GHD | w/e | 12/02/1949 | HTN | Heaton | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 1881 | on | 01/01/1948 | GHD | w/e | 12/02/1949 | HTN | Heaton | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 1897 | on | 01/01/1948 | GHD | w/e | 12/02/1949 | HTN | Heaton | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 1904 | on | 01/01/1948 | GHD | w/e | 05/06/1948 | MAR | March | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 1928 | on | 01/01/1948 | GHD | w/e | 12/02/1949 | HTN | Heaton | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 1930 | on | 01/01/1948 | GHD | 4w/e | 19/01/1952 | 52D | Tweedmouth | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 1985 | on | 01/01/1948 | GHD | w/e | 12/02/1949 | HTN | Heaton | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 1986 | on | 01/01/1948 | GHD | w/e | 12/02/1949 | HTN | Heaton | ||||
Steam | N10 | 0-6-2T | 9090 | on | 01/01/1948 | GHD | on | 19/11/1956 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | N10 | 0-6-2T | 9091 | on | 01/01/1948 | GHD | on | 26/11/1956 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | N10 | 0-6-2T | 9092 | on | 01/01/1948 | GHD | m/e | 12/1949 | BOR | Borough Gardens | ||||
Steam | N10 | 0-6-2T | 9093 | on | 01/01/1948 | GHD | w/e | 24/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Steam | N10 | 0-6-2T | 9097 | on | 01/01/1948 | GHD | on | 09/04/1962 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | N10 | 0-6-2T | 9099 | on | 01/01/1948 | GHD | w/e | 24/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Steam | N10 | 0-6-2T | 9100 | on | 01/01/1948 | GHD | on | 25/11/1957 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | N10 | 0-6-2T | 9102 | on | 01/01/1948 | GHD | w/e | 24/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Steam | N10 | 0-6-2T | 69103 | on | 01/01/1948 | GHD | m/e | 11/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | N10 | 0-6-2T | 9105 | on | 01/01/1948 | GHD | w/e | 25/09/1948 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Steam | N10 | 0-6-2T | 9106 | on | 01/01/1948 | GHD | w/e | 25/09/1948 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Steam | N10 | 0-6-2T | 9107 | on | 01/01/1948 | GHD | w/e | 24/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Steam | N10 | 0-6-2T | 9109 | on | 01/01/1948 | GHD | on | 09/04/1962 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 7634 | on | 01/01/1948 | GHD | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 52C | Blaydon | ||||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 7682 | on | 01/01/1948 | GHD | w/e | 31/05/1950 | 51E | Stockton | ||||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 7683 | on | 01/01/1948 | GHD | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 52C | Blaydon | ||||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 7687 | on | 01/01/1948 | GHD | 5w/e | 18/12/1954 | 52C | Blaydon | ||||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 7688 | on | 01/01/1948 | GHD | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 64B | Haymarket | ||||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 7689 | on | 01/01/1948 | GHD | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 64B | Haymarket | ||||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 7690 | on | 01/01/1948 | GHD | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 52B | Heaton | ||||
Steam | Y1 | 0-4-0T | 8141 | on | 01/01/1948 | GHD | on | 04/02/1952 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Y1 | 0-4-0T | 8146 | on | 01/01/1948 | GHD | on | 05/04/1954 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Y3 | 0-4-0T | 68154 | on | 01/01/1948 | GHD | m/e | 10/1953 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Y3 | 0-4-0T | 8160 | on | 01/01/1948 | GHD | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Steam | Y3 | 0-4-0T | 8180 | on | 01/01/1948 | GHD | 5w/e | 24/07/1954 | 50C | Selby | ||||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | 527 | on | 30/01/1948 (New) | GHD | on | 26/06/1949 | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | 528 | on | 21/02/1948 (New) | GHD | on | 26/06/1949 | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | 531 | on | 12/03/1948 (New) | GHD | on | 07/08/1949 | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60091 | on | 26/10/1928 | CAR | Carlisle Canal | on | 30/05/1948 | GHD | w/e | 05/06/1948 | GHD | Gateshead |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60091 | on | 30/05/1948 | GHD | Gateshead | w/e | 05/06/1948 | GHD | on | 13/06/1948 | HTN | Heaton |
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 7656 | on | 01/01/1948 | NEV | Neville Hill | w/e | 05/06/1948 | GHD | w/e | 13/11/1948 | BLA | Blaydon |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60082 | on | 30/11/1924 | HTN | Heaton (New) | on | 13/06/1948 | GHD | on | 14/09/1952 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | 60538 | on | 18/06/1948 (New) | GHD | on | 22/05/1960 | 52B | Heaton | ||||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | 60115 | on | 03/09/1948 (New) | GHD | on | 20/11/1960 | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 68732 | on | 01/01/1948 | HTN | Heaton | w/e | 02/10/1948 | GHD | w/e | 28/02/1959 | 52C | Blaydon |
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 68675 | on | 01/01/1948 | HTN | Heaton | w/e | 09/10/1948 | GHD | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 51F | West Auckland |
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 68744 | on | 01/01/1948 | HTN | Heaton | w/e | 09/10/1948 | GHD | w/e | 11/07/1959 | 51C | West Hartlepool |
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | 60132 | on | 18/10/1948 (New) | GHD | on | 15/05/1960 | 52B | Heaton | ||||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | 60135 | on | 18/11/1948 (New) | GHD | on | 20/11/1960 | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | 60137 | on | 03/12/1948 (New) | GHD | on | 15/05/1960 | 52B | Heaton | ||||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | 60142 | on | 02/02/1949 (New) | GHD | on | 11/09/1960 | 52B | Heaton | ||||
Steam | N10 | 0-6-2T | 9105 | w/e | 25/09/1948 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 12/02/1949 | GHD | w/e | 24/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | 60143 | on | 22/02/1949 (New) | GHD | on | 15/05/1960 | 52B | Heaton | ||||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | 60124 | on | 23/03/1949 (New) | GHD | on | 11/09/1960 | 52B | Heaton | ||||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | 60145 | on | 23/03/1949 (New) | GHD | on | 20/11/1960 | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | 7653 | m/e | 08/1923 | Withdrawn | w/e | 09/04/1949 (R) | GHD | |||||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 67642 | on | 01/01/1948 | HTN | Heaton | w/e | 09/04/1949 | GHD | w/e | 31/05/1950 | 52B | Heaton |
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | 60147 | on | 13/04/1949 (New) | GHD | on | 11/09/1960 | 52B | Heaton | ||||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | 60151 | on | 30/06/1949 (New) | GHD | on | 15/05/1960 | 52B | Heaton | ||||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | 60150 | on | 15/06/1949 | HTN | Heaton (New) | on | 10/07/1949 | GHD | w/e | 16/07/1949 | GHD | Gateshead |
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | 60150 | on | 10/07/1949 | GHD | Gateshead | w/e | 16/07/1949 | GHD | on | 20/11/1960 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | 60129 | on | 15/06/1949 | YK | York (North) (New) | on | 04/09/1949 | GHD | w/e | 10/09/1949 | GHD | Gateshead |
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | 60129 | on | 04/09/1949 | GHD | Gateshead | w/e | 10/09/1949 | GHD | on | 11/09/1960 | 52B | Heaton |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64701 | on | 16/07/1943 | BLA | Blaydon | on | 18/09/1949 | GHD | w/e | 24/09/1949 | GHD | Gateshead |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4704 | on | 25/11/1927 | BLA | Blaydon | on | 18/09/1949 | GHD | w/e | 24/09/1949 | GHD | Gateshead |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64707 | on | 03/08/1943 | BLA | Blaydon | on | 18/09/1949 | GHD | w/e | 24/09/1949 | GHD | Gateshead |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64853 | on | 24/08/1938 | BLA | Blaydon | on | 18/09/1949 | GHD | w/e | 24/09/1949 | GHD | Gateshead |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64871 | on | 20/12/1935 | BLA | Blaydon (New) | on | 18/09/1949 | GHD | w/e | 24/09/1949 | GHD | Gateshead |
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | 60154 | on | 23/09/1949 (New) | GHD | on | 20/11/1960 | 50A | York (North) | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64701 | on | 18/09/1949 | GHD | Gateshead | w/e | 24/09/1949 | GHD | on | 07/07/1957 | 52B | Heaton |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4704 | on | 18/09/1949 | GHD | Gateshead | w/e | 24/09/1949 | GHD | on | 01/11/1959 | 52G | Sunderland |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64707 | on | 18/09/1949 | GHD | Gateshead | w/e | 24/09/1949 | GHD | on | 04/01/1953 | 54C | Borough Gardens |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64853 | on | 18/09/1949 | GHD | Gateshead | w/e | 24/09/1949 | GHD | on | 18/10/1953 | 52B | Heaton |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64871 | on | 18/09/1949 | GHD | Gateshead | w/e | 24/09/1949 | GHD | on | 07/07/1957 | 52B | Heaton |
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | 60155 | on | 29/09/1949 (New) | GHD | on | 11/09/1960 | 52B | Heaton | ||||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67320 | on | 01/01/1948 | SBH | Blyth (South) | w/e | 31/05/1950 | 52A | 4w/e | 30/06/1950 | 52A | Gateshead |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67325 | on | 01/01/1948 | BLA | Blaydon | w/e | 31/05/1950 | 52A | 4w/e | 30/06/1950 | 52A | Gateshead |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67329 | on | 01/01/1948 | BLA | Blaydon | w/e | 31/05/1950 | 52A | 4w/e | 30/06/1950 | 52A | Gateshead |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 7309 | on | 01/01/1948 | DAR | Darlington | 4w/e | 30/06/1950 | 52A | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 52c | Alston |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67320 | w/e | 31/05/1950 | 52A | Gateshead | 4w/e | 30/06/1950 | 52A | 5w/e | 24/04/1954 | 52C | Blaydon |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67325 | w/e | 31/05/1950 | 52A | Gateshead | 4w/e | 30/06/1950 | 52A | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 52C | Blaydon |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67329 | w/e | 31/05/1950 | 52A | Gateshead | 4w/e | 30/06/1950 | 52A | 5w/e | 24/04/1954 | 52C | Blaydon |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64869 | w/e | 20/11/1948 | BLA | Blaydon | on | 09/07/1950 | 52A | on | 08/10/1961 | 52F | Blyth (North) |
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 67647 | 4w/e | 30/06/1950 | 51D | Middlesbrough | w/e | 01/10/1950 | 52A | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 52A | Gateshead |
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 67682 | 4w/e | 30/06/1950 | 51E | Stockton | w/e | 01/10/1950 | 52A | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 52A | Gateshead |
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 67647 | w/e | 01/10/1950 | 52A | Gateshead | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 52A | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 51D | Middlesbrough |
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 67682 | w/e | 01/10/1950 | 52A | Gateshead | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 52A | 5w/e | 22/01/1955 | 52C | Blaydon |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64852 | on | 19/06/1943 | BLA | Blaydon | on | 04/03/1951 | 52A | w/e | 10/03/1951 | 52A | Gateshead |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64865 | w/e | 13/11/1948 | HTN | Heaton | on | 04/03/1951 | 52A | w/e | 10/03/1951 | 52A | Gateshead |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60942 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 52B | Heaton | on | 04/03/1951 | 52A | w/e | 10/03/1951 | 52A | Gateshead |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64852 | on | 04/03/1951 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 10/03/1951 | 52A | on | 05/11/1961 | 52B | Heaton |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64865 | on | 04/03/1951 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 10/03/1951 | 52A | on | 03/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60942 | on | 04/03/1951 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 10/03/1951 | 52A | on | 09/09/1951 | 52B | Heaton |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61024 | on | 12/04/1947 | TWD | Tweedmouth (New) | on | 01/07/1951 | 52A | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 52A | Gateshead |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61199 | on | 04/06/1947 | TWD | Tweedmouth (New) | on | 01/07/1951 | 52A | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 52A | Gateshead |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60802 | on | 13/10/1946 | HTN | Heaton | on | 01/07/1951 | 52A | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 52A | Gateshead |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60809 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | HTN | Heaton | on | 01/07/1951 | 52A | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 52A | Gateshead |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60810 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | HTN | Heaton | on | 01/07/1951 | 52A | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 52A | Gateshead |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60860 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | HTN | Heaton | on | 01/07/1951 | 52A | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 52A | Gateshead |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60944 | on | 13/10/1946 | HTN | Heaton | on | 01/07/1951 | 52A | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 52A | Gateshead |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60949 | on | 13/10/1946 | HTN | Heaton | on | 01/07/1951 | 52A | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 52A | Gateshead |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61024 | on | 01/07/1951 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 52A | on | 02/09/1951 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61199 | on | 01/07/1951 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 52A | on | 25/09/1955 | 52D | Tweedmouth |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67244 | on | 01/01/1948 | SBH | Blyth (South) | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 52A | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 52A | Gateshead |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60802 | on | 01/07/1951 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 52A | on | 15/04/1956 | 52B | Heaton |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60809 | on | 01/07/1951 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 52A | on | 15/04/1956 | 52B | Heaton |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60810 | on | 01/07/1951 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 52A | on | 09/09/1951 | 52B | Heaton |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60860 | on | 01/07/1951 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 52A | on | 09/09/1951 | 52B | Heaton |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60944 | on | 01/07/1951 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 52A | on | 09/09/1951 | 52B | Heaton |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60949 | on | 01/07/1951 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 52A | on | 10/09/1961 | 52D | Tweedmouth |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67244 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 52A | Gateshead | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 52A | w/e | 17/11/1952 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | 60122 | on | 24/12/1948 | KX | Kings Cross (New) | on | 09/09/1951 | 52A | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 35B | Grantham |
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 67647 | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 51E | Stockton | w/e | 29/09/1951 | 52A | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 52A | Gateshead |
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 67647 | w/e | 29/09/1951 | 52A | Gateshead | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 52A | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 52B | Heaton |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60070 | on | 12/12/1948 | DAR | Darlington | on | 27/01/1952 | 52A | on | 30/08/1953 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60076 | on | 19/12/1948 | DAR | Darlington | on | 27/01/1952 | 52A | on | 16/03/1952 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60071 | on | 27/01/1952 | 51A | Darlington | on | 16/03/1952 | 52A | on | 05/09/1954 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67252 | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 52B | Heaton | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 52A | 5w/e | 21/06/1952 | 52A | Gateshead |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67270 | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 52B | Heaton | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 52A | 5w/e | 21/06/1952 | 52A | Gateshead |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67252 | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 52A | Gateshead | 5w/e | 21/06/1952 | 52A | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 52B | Heaton |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67270 | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 52A | Gateshead | 5w/e | 21/06/1952 | 52A | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 52B | Heaton |
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | 60515 | on | 19/10/1946 | HTN | Heaton (New) | on | 06/07/1952 | 52A | on | 14/12/1952 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | 60516 | on | 02/11/1946 | HTN | Heaton (New) | on | 06/07/1952 | 52A | on | 22/05/1960 | 52B | Heaton |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61021 | w/e | 13/11/1948 | DAR | Darlington | on | 06/07/1952 | 52A | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 52A | Gateshead |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61023 | w/e | 13/11/1948 | DAR | Darlington | on | 06/07/1952 | 52A | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 52A | Gateshead |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60868 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | HTN | Heaton | on | 06/07/1952 | 52A | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 52A | Gateshead |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60885 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 52B | Heaton | on | 06/07/1952 | 52A | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 52A | Gateshead |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60886 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 52B | Heaton | on | 06/07/1952 | 52A | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 52A | Gateshead |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60887 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 52B | Heaton | on | 06/07/1952 | 52A | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 52A | Gateshead |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60945 | on | 04/02/1950 | 52B | Heaton | on | 06/07/1952 | 52A | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 52A | Gateshead |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60947 | on | 03/11/1945 | HTN | Heaton | on | 06/07/1952 | 52A | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 52A | Gateshead |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60952 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | HTN | Heaton | on | 06/07/1952 | 52A | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 52A | Gateshead |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60957 | on | 06/05/1946 | HTN | Heaton | on | 06/07/1952 | 52A | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 52A | Gateshead |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61021 | on | 06/07/1952 | 52A | Gateshead | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 52A | on | 14/09/1952 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61023 | on | 06/07/1952 | 52A | Gateshead | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 52A | on | 14/09/1952 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | N10 | 0-6-2T | 69095 | on | 01/01/1948 | BLA | Blaydon | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 52A | 4w/e | 19/07/1952 | 52A | Gateshead |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60868 | on | 06/07/1952 | 52A | Gateshead | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 52A | on | 03/01/1960 | 52B | Heaton |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60885 | on | 06/07/1952 | 52A | Gateshead | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 52A | on | 15/11/1953 | 52B | Heaton |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60886 | on | 06/07/1952 | 52A | Gateshead | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 52A | on | 15/11/1953 | 52B | Heaton |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60887 | on | 06/07/1952 | 52A | Gateshead | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 52A | on | 01/03/1953 | 52B | Heaton |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60945 | on | 06/07/1952 | 52A | Gateshead | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 52A | on | 15/11/1953 | 52B | Heaton |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60947 | on | 06/07/1952 | 52A | Gateshead | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 52A | on | 10/09/1961 | 52D | Tweedmouth |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60952 | on | 06/07/1952 | 52A | Gateshead | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 52A | on | 15/11/1953 | 52B | Heaton |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60957 | on | 06/07/1952 | 52A | Gateshead | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 52A | on | 15/04/1956 | 52B | Heaton |
Steam | N10 | 0-6-2T | 69095 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 52A | Gateshead | 4w/e | 19/07/1952 | 52A | on | 25/10/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60060 | on | 27/01/1952 | 51A | Darlington | on | 17/08/1952 | 52A | on | 08/05/1955 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60076 | on | 16/03/1952 | 51A | Darlington | on | 14/09/1952 | 52A | on | 12/02/1956 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67296 | on | 01/01/1948 | RBY | 4w/e | 20/09/1952 | 52A | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 52A | Gateshead | |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67296 | 4w/e | 20/09/1952 | 52A | Gateshead | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 52A | 4w/e | 20/03/1954 | 52F | Blyth (North) |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76024 | m/e | 01/1953 (New) | 52A | 5w/e | 21/03/1953 | 52C | Blaydon | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64929 | w/e | 22/05/1948 | BOR | Borough Gardens | on | 04/01/1953 | 52A | on | 16/06/1957 | 52d | Alnmouth |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60075 | on | 17/08/1952 | 51A | Darlington | on | 22/02/1953 | 52A | on | 31/10/1954 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60082 | on | 14/09/1952 | 51A | Darlington | on | 22/03/1953 | 52A | on | 06/05/1956 | 52B | Heaton |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60801 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 52D | Tweedmouth | on | 07/06/1953 | 52A | on | 15/11/1953 | 52B | Heaton |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60807 | on | 12/04/1953 | 52D | Tweedmouth | on | 07/06/1953 | 52A | on | 03/01/1960 | 52B | Heaton |
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 62349 | w/e | 29/10/1949 | ALN | 4w/e | 20/06/1953 | 52A | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 52D | Tweedmouth | |
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 62360 | w/e | 08/01/1949 | ALN | 4w/e | 20/06/1953 | 52A | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 52D | Tweedmouth | |
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 62371 | 5w/e | 21/03/1953 | 52D | Tweedmouth | 4w/e | 20/06/1953 | 52A | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 52D | Tweedmouth |
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 62375 | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 52D | Tweedmouth | 4w/e | 20/06/1953 | 52A | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 52D | Tweedmouth |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61022 | on | 19/07/1953 | 52B | Heaton | on | 26/07/1953 | 52A | on | 10/09/1961 | 52H | Tyne Dock |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60038 | on | 22/02/1953 | 51A | Darlington | on | 30/08/1953 | 52A | on | 19/08/1956 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60042 | on | 22/03/1953 | 51A | Darlington | on | 20/09/1953 | 52A | on | 07/03/1954 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 68272 | 5w/e | 17/01/1953 | 52B | Heaton | 4w/e | 19/12/1953 | 52A | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61019 | w/e | 08/01/1949 | TWO | on | 17/01/1954 | 52A | on | 10/02/1957 | 52C | Blaydon | |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60070 | on | 30/08/1953 | 51A | Darlington | on | 28/02/1954 | 52A | on | 05/05/1957 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60045 | on | 28/02/1954 | 51A | Darlington | on | 07/03/1954 | 52A | on | 21/03/1954 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60040 | on | 20/09/1953 | 51A | Darlington | on | 21/03/1954 | 52A | on | 07/08/1955 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67259 | on | 01/01/1948 | BLA | Blaydon | 5w/e | 24/04/1954 | 52A | 5w/e | 18/12/1954 | 52C | Blaydon |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67315 | 4w/e | 20/06/1953 | 52C | Blaydon | 5w/e | 24/04/1954 | 52A | 5w/e | 24/07/1954 | 54A | Sunderland |
Steam | Y3 | 0-4-0T | 68159 | on | 01/01/1948 | NLN | Northallerton | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 52A | on | 04/03/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 62352 | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 52D | Tweedmouth | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 52A | on | 29/06/1954 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 62360 | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 52D | Tweedmouth | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 52A | 4w/e | 23/10/1954 | 52D | Tweedmouth |
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 62375 | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 52D | Tweedmouth | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 52A | 4w/e | 23/10/1954 | 52D | Tweedmouth |
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 62380 | on | 01/01/1948 | TWD | Tweedmouth | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 52A | on | 23/09/1954 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 62396 | 5w/e | 21/03/1953 | 52D | Tweedmouth | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 52A | 4w/e | 23/10/1954 | 52D | Tweedmouth |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60042 | on | 07/03/1954 | 51A | Darlington | on | 05/09/1954 | 52A | on | 11/11/1956 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67265 | w/e | 09/04/1949 | HEX | 4w/e | 23/10/1954 | 52A | 4w/e | 19/03/1955 | 52C | Blaydon | |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60045 | on | 21/03/1954 | 51A | Darlington | on | 26/10/1954 | 52A | on | 13/11/1955 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42072 | 5w/e | 08/10/1951 | 74B | Ramsgate | 4w/e | 13/11/1954 | 52A | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42073 | 6w/e | 13/08/1952 | 74A | Ashford | 5w/e | 18/12/1954 | 52A | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42093 | 9w/e | 30/06/1952 | 75E | Three Bridges | 5w/e | 18/12/1954 | 52A | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42094 | 5w/e | 08/10/1951 | 74A | Ashford | 5w/e | 18/12/1954 | 52A | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67320 | 5w/e | 24/04/1954 | 52C | Blaydon | 5w/e | 18/12/1954 | 52A | 4w/e | 19/03/1955 | 52C | Blaydon |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60071 | on | 05/09/1954 | 51A | Darlington | on | 13/02/1955 | 52A | on | 27/05/1956 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76046 | m/e | 03/1955 (New) | 52A | 5w/e | 23/07/1955 | 52C | Blaydon | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76049 | on | 01/04/1955 (New) | 52A | 5w/e | 18/06/1955 | 52C | Blaydon | ||||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60075 | on | 31/10/1954 | 51A | Darlington | on | 08/05/1955 | 52A | on | 18/06/1961 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60833 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | HTN | Heaton | on | 29/05/1955 | 52A | on | 03/01/1960 | 52B | Heaton |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60078 | on | 13/02/1955 | 51A | Darlington | on | 07/08/1955 | 52A | on | 09/09/1962 | 52B | Heaton |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60887 | on | 01/03/1953 | 52B | Heaton | on | 25/09/1955 | 52A | on | 15/09/1957 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67254 | 4w/e | 20/06/1953 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 52A | on | 03/12/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67318 | 4w/e | 20/03/1954 | 51A | Darlington | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 52A | on | 05/03/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 68267 | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 52C | Blaydon | 3w/e | 12/11/1955 | 52A | on | 14/11/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60060 | on | 08/05/1955 | 51A | Darlington | on | 13/11/1955 | 52A | on | 26/05/1957 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76045 | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 52C | Blaydon | 5w/e | 21/01/1956 | 52A | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 51F | West Auckland |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76049 | 5w/e | 18/06/1955 | 52C | Blaydon | 5w/e | 21/01/1956 | 52A | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 51F | West Auckland |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60040 | on | 07/08/1955 | 51A | Darlington | on | 12/02/1956 | 52A | on | 03/11/1957 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60883 | on | 15/04/1956 | 52B | Heaton | on | 06/05/1956 | 52A | on | 09/09/1956 | 64A | St Margarets |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60045 | on | 13/11/1955 | 51A | Darlington | on | 27/05/1956 | 52A | on | 04/05/1958 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43055 | 5w/e | 18/06/1955 | 51H | Kirkby Stephen | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 52A | 4w/e | 15/12/1956 | 52B | Heaton |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43075 | 5w/e | 18/06/1955 | 51F | West Auckland | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 52A | 4w/e | 15/12/1956 | 52B | Heaton |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43101 | 3w/e | 12/11/1955 | 51H | Kirkby Stephen | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 52A | 4w/e | 15/12/1956 | 52B | Heaton |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60076 | on | 12/02/1956 | 51A | Darlington | on | 19/08/1956 | 52A | on | 01/12/1957 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60848 | w/e | 17/12/1949 | STM | St Margarets | on | 09/09/1956 | 52A | on | 15/09/1957 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60071 | on | 27/05/1956 | 51A | Darlington | on | 11/11/1956 | 52A | on | 24/02/1957 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73161 | m/e | 02/1957 (New) | 52A | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 55E | Normanton | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 68731 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 52C | Blaydon | 4w/e | 16/02/1957 | 52A | w/e | 22/08/1959 | 52H | Tyne Dock |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60038 | on | 19/08/1956 | 51A | Darlington | on | 24/02/1957 | 52A | on | 21/02/1960 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 67639 | 4w/e | 23/10/1954 | 52C | Blaydon | 5w/e | 20/04/1957 | 52A | on | 22/10/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 67657 | on | 01/01/1948 | NEV | Neville Hill | 5w/e | 20/04/1957 | 52A | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 64B | Haymarket |
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 67673 | 4w/e | 17/11/1956 | 52C | Blaydon | 5w/e | 20/04/1957 | 52A | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | 54A | Sunderland |
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 67687 | 5w/e | 18/12/1954 | 52C | Blaydon | 5w/e | 20/04/1957 | 52A | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 64B | Haymarket |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60042 | on | 11/11/1956 | 51A | Darlington | on | 05/05/1957 | 52A | on | 09/09/1962 | 52B | Heaton |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60071 | on | 24/02/1957 | 51A | Darlington | on | 26/05/1957 | 52A | on | 06/12/1959 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60805 | on | 27/12/1953 | 52D | Tweedmouth | on | 16/06/1957 | 52A | on | 03/01/1960 | 52B | Heaton |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60809 | on | 15/04/1956 | 52B | Heaton | on | 16/06/1957 | 52A | on | 13/12/1959 | 52B | Heaton |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60860 | on | 12/04/1953 | 52D | Tweedmouth | on | 16/06/1957 | 52A | on | 03/01/1960 | 52B | Heaton |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60942 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 52B | Heaton | on | 16/06/1957 | 52A | on | 02/12/1962 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60053 | on | 02/05/1954 | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | on | 15/09/1957 | 52A | on | 07/12/1958 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60058 | on | 13/06/1954 | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | on | 15/09/1957 | 52A | on | 16/11/1958 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61065 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill | on | 15/09/1957 | 52A | on | 14/09/1958 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61256 | on | 17/11/1947 | NEV | Neville Hill (New) | on | 15/09/1957 | 52A | on | 14/09/1958 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60070 | on | 05/05/1957 | 51A | Darlington | on | 03/11/1957 | 52A | on | 07/06/1959 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 67645 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | HTN | Heaton | 4w/e | 09/11/1957 | 52A | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | 54A | Sunderland |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60060 | on | 26/05/1957 | 51A | Darlington | on | 01/12/1957 | 52A | on | 18/12/1960 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65687 | 5w/e | 19/01/1957 | 52C | Blaydon | 4w/e | 14/12/1957 | 52A | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 52F | Blyth (North) |
Steam | N10 | 0-6-2T | 69102 | 5w/e | 23/07/1955 | 54B | Tyne Dock | 4w/e | 14/12/1957 | 52A | on | 09/02/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60051 | on | 15/09/1957 | 52B | Heaton | on | 05/01/1958 | 52A | on | 08/06/1958 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60052 | on | 15/09/1957 | 52B | Heaton | on | 05/01/1958 | 52A | on | 19/06/1960 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 68263 | 4w/e | 25/09/1954 | 52B | Heaton | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | 52A | w/e | 02/05/1959 | 52B | Heaton |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60040 | on | 03/11/1957 | 51A | Darlington | on | 04/05/1958 | 52A | on | 06/12/1959 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60076 | on | 01/12/1957 | 51A | Darlington | on | 08/06/1958 | 52A | on | 18/12/1960 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60904 | on | 03/04/1940 | YK | York (North) (New) | on | 08/06/1958 | 52A | on | 03/01/1960 | 52B | Heaton |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60929 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 50A | York (North) | on | 08/06/1958 | 52A | on | 10/09/1961 | 52D | Tweedmouth |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60934 | on | 07/01/1942 | YK | York (North) (New) | on | 08/06/1958 | 52A | on | 10/09/1961 | 52D | Tweedmouth |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60952 | on | 15/09/1957 | 50A | York (North) | on | 08/06/1958 | 52A | on | 02/12/1962 | 56B | Ardsley |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60091 | w/e | 19/06/1948 | HTN | Heaton | on | 06/07/1958 | 52A | on | 07/06/1959 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60979 | on | 10/06/1956 | 52B | Heaton | on | 06/07/1958 | 52A | on | 01/10/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60045 | on | 04/05/1958 | 51A | Darlington | on | 16/11/1958 | 52A | on | 09/09/1962 | 52B | Heaton |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60051 | on | 08/06/1958 | 51A | Darlington | on | 07/12/1958 | 52A | on | 19/06/1960 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65675 | 4w/e | 16/02/1957 | 52C | Blaydon | w/e | 20/12/1958 | 52A | on | 02/03/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2048 | on | 23/12/1958 (New) | 52A | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 52C | Blaydon | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 69027 | m/e | 05/1951 | 52B | Heaton (New) | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 52A | on | 22/10/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 67637 | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | 54A | Sunderland | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 52A | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 52B | Heaton |
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 69001 | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 52C | Blaydon | w/e | 28/02/1959 | 52A | on | 23/09/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65656 | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 52B | Heaton | w/e | 14/03/1959 | 52A | on | 14/08/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65700 | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 51C | West Hartlepool | w/e | 28/03/1959 | 52A | on | 22/08/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2055 | on | 01/05/1959 (New) | 52A | w/e | 25/03/1961 | 52E | Percy Main | ||||
Steam | N10 | 0-6-2T | 69101 | 4w/e | 19/07/1958 | 54B | Tyne Dock | w/e | 02/05/1959 | 52A | on | 09/04/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | N10 | 0-6-2T | 69105 | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 54B | Tyne Dock | w/e | 02/05/1959 | 52A | on | 16/06/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2056 | on | 09/05/1959 (New) | 52A | on | 15/06/1980 | Withdrawn | |||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2057 | on | 15/05/1959 (New) | 52A | 4w/e | 04/11/1967 | 51L | Thornaby | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2058 | on | 23/05/1959 (New) | 52A | w/e | 19/11/1966 | 12C | Barrow in Furness | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2059 | on | 29/05/1959 (New) | 52A | w/e | 19/11/1966 | 12C | Barrow in Furness | ||||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60053 | on | 07/12/1958 | 51A | Darlington | on | 07/06/1959 | 52A | on | 18/06/1961 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60058 | on | 16/11/1958 | 51A | Darlington | on | 07/06/1959 | 52A | on | 17/12/1961 | 51A | Darlington |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2060 | on | 10/06/1959 (New) | 52A | w/e | 20/03/1971 | 30E | Colchester | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61014 | on | 17/01/1954 | 52D | Tweedmouth | on | 14/06/1959 | 52A | on | 10/09/1961 | 52H | Tyne Dock |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61238 | on | 10/02/1957 | 52C | Blaydon | on | 14/06/1959 | 52A | on | 10/09/1961 | 52H | Tyne Dock |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64700 | on | 04/01/1953 | 54C | Borough Gardens | on | 14/06/1959 | 52A | on | 01/11/1959 | 52G | Sunderland |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64707 | on | 04/01/1953 | 54C | Borough Gardens | on | 14/06/1959 | 52A | on | 13/11/1960 | 52G | Sunderland |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64710 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 54C | Borough Gardens | on | 14/06/1959 | 52A | on | 01/11/1959 | 52G | Sunderland |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64713 | on | 16/06/1957 | 52B | Heaton | on | 14/06/1959 | 52A | on | 15/01/1961 | 52F | Blyth (North) |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64812 | on | 07/06/1953 | 52C | Blaydon | on | 14/06/1959 | 52A | on | 26/02/1961 | 52H | Tyne Dock |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64814 | on | 03/01/1930 | BLA | Blaydon (New) | on | 14/06/1959 | 52A | on | 15/01/1961 | 52F | Blyth (North) |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64846 | w/e | 28/01/1950 | BOR | Borough Gardens | on | 14/06/1959 | 52A | on | 15/01/1961 | 52F | Blyth (North) |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64851 | on | 04/01/1953 | 54C | Borough Gardens | on | 14/06/1959 | 52A | on | 26/02/1961 | 52H | Tyne Dock |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64854 | on | 04/01/1953 | 54C | Borough Gardens | on | 14/06/1959 | 52A | on | 11/09/1960 | 52G | Sunderland |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64921 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 54C | Borough Gardens | on | 14/06/1959 | 52A | on | 26/02/1961 | 52H | Tyne Dock |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64936 | w/e | 21/02/1948 | BOR | Borough Gardens | on | 14/06/1959 | 52A | on | 03/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2061 | on | 20/06/1959 (New) | 52A | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13324 | w/e | 13/12/1958 | 52B | Heaton | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 52A | w/e | 08/06/1963 | 52E | Percy Main |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3455 | w/e | 13/12/1958 | 52B | Heaton | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 52A | 4w/e | 14/08/1965 | 52E | Percy Main |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76024 | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 51F | West Auckland | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 52A | w/e | 28/11/1959 | 52B | Heaton |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65712 | 4w/e | 23/10/1954 | 54C | Borough Gardens | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 52A | on | 22/08/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65702 | 4w/e | 13/11/1954 | 54C | Borough Gardens | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 52A | on | 01/10/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65728 | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 54C | Borough Gardens | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 52A | on | 23/04/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 68694 | 5w/e | 24/04/1954 | 54C | Borough Gardens | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 52A | on | 24/11/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 68695 | 5w/e | 19/01/1957 | 54C | Borough Gardens | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 52A | on | 02/04/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 68697 | 4w/e | 20/02/1954 | 54C | Borough Gardens | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 52A | w/e | 01/02/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 68705 | on | 01/01/1948 | BOR | Borough Gardens | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 52A | w/e | 22/08/1959 | 53E | Goole |
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 68728 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | BOR | Borough Gardens | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 52A | on | 02/10/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 68730 | w/e | 06/11/1948 | BOR | Borough Gardens | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 52A | w/e | 22/08/1959 | 52H | Tyne Dock |
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 68737 | on | 01/01/1948 | BOR | Borough Gardens | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 52A | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 51C | West Hartlepool |
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 69017 | m/e | 01/1951 | DAR | Darlington (New) | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 52A | w/e | 11/07/1959 | 51C | West Hartlepool |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64978 | on | 18/11/1956 | 51F | West Auckland | on | 23/08/1959 | 52A | on | 03/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64860 | on | 07/08/1955 | 50C | Selby | on | 30/08/1959 | 52A | on | 03/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64938 | on | 14/06/1959 | 50C | Selby | on | 30/08/1959 | 52A | on | 16/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | 77011 | on | 17/12/1955 | 52c | Alston | on | 27/09/1959 | 52A | on | 11/09/1960 | 52H | Tyne Dock |
Steam | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | 77014 | w/e | 16/06/1956 | 52C | Blaydon | on | 27/09/1959 | 52A | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 52H | Tyne Dock |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D237 | on | 09/10/1959 (New) | 52A | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 51L | Thornaby | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D238 | on | 12/10/1959 (New) | 52A | 4w/e | 27/03/1965 | 51L | Thornaby | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D239 | on | 19/10/1959 (New) | 52A | 4w/e | 27/03/1965 | 51L | Thornaby | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D240 | on | 23/10/1959 (New) | 52A | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 51L | Thornaby | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D241 | on | 26/10/1959 (New) | 52A | 4w/e | 26/02/1966 | 55H | Neville Hill | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61019 | on | 10/02/1957 | 52C | Blaydon | on | 01/11/1959 | 52A | on | 11/09/1960 | 52C | Blaydon |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61100 | on | 10/02/1957 | 52C | Blaydon | on | 01/11/1959 | 52A | on | 13/08/1961 | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D242 | on | 02/11/1959 (New) | 52A | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 56B | Healey Mills | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D243 | on | 06/11/1959 (New) | 52A | 4w/e | 29/01/1966 | 50A | York (North) | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D244 | on | 09/11/1959 (New) | 52A | 4w/e | 29/01/1966 | 50A | York (North) | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D245 | on | 16/11/1959 (New) | 52A | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 56B | Healey Mills | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D246 | on | 20/11/1959 (New) | 52A | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 51L | Thornaby | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D247 | on | 23/11/1959 (New) | 52A | 4w/e | 22/04/1967 | 56B | Healey Mills | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D248 | on | 27/11/1959 (New) | 52A | w/e | 12/12/1959 | 34B | Hornsey | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D249 | on | 30/11/1959 (New) | 52A | 4w/e | 26/02/1966 | 55H | Neville Hill | ||||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60091 | on | 07/06/1959 | 51A | Darlington | on | 06/12/1959 | 52A | on | 17/12/1961 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60070 | on | 07/06/1959 | 51A | Darlington | on | 06/12/1959 | 52A | on | 12/06/1960 | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D250 | on | 07/12/1959 (New) | 52A | w/e | 30/01/1960 | 50A | York (North) | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D256 | w/e | 13/02/1960 | 64B | Haymarket | w/e | 26/03/1960 | 52A | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D257 | w/e | 19/03/1960 | 50A | York (North) | w/e | 26/03/1960 | 52A | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 50A | York (North) |
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5096 | on | 09/04/1960 (New) | 52A | w/e | 23/02/1963 | 50A | York (North) | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D270 | on | 11/04/1960 (New) | 52A | 4w/e | 26/02/1966 | 55H | Neville Hill | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D271 | on | 20/04/1960 (New) | 52A | 4w/e | 29/01/1966 | 50A | York (North) | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D272 | on | 25/04/1960 (New) | 52A | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 50A | York (North) | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D273 | on | 02/05/1960 (New) | 52A | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 51L | Thornaby | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5097 | on | 05/05/1960 (New) | 52A | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D274 | on | 09/05/1960 (New) | 52A | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 50A | York (North) | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D278 | on | 08/06/1960 (New) | 52A | w/e | 11/11/1961 | 50A | York (North) | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D277 | on | 30/05/1960 | 50A | York (North) (New) | w/e | 11/06/1960 | 52A | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 50A | York (North) |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D279 | on | 13/06/1960 (New) | 52A | w/e | 22/11/1969 | 55B | York (North) | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D280 | on | 17/06/1960 (New) | 52A | 4w/e | 26/02/1966 | 55H | Neville Hill | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43126 | w/e | 25/07/1959 | 52B | Heaton | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 52A | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 52G | Sunderland |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60040 | on | 06/12/1959 | 51A | Darlington | on | 19/06/1960 | 52A | on | 24/06/1962 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60071 | on | 06/12/1959 | 51A | Darlington | on | 19/06/1960 | 52A | on | 09/09/1962 | 52B | Heaton |
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5100 | on | 25/06/1960 (New) | 52A | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 12C | Carlisle Canal | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5101 | on | 09/07/1960 (New) | 52A | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2147 | w/e | 04/06/1960 | 52E | Percy Main | w/e | 16/07/1960 | 52A | on | 05/09/1975 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2148 | w/e | 04/06/1960 | 52E | Percy Main | w/e | 16/07/1960 | 52A | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2149 | on | 30/05/1960 | 52E | Percy Main (New) | w/e | 16/07/1960 | 52A | w/e | 21/12/1963 | 51C | West Hartlepool |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3938 | on | 04/03/1960 | 52E | Percy Main (New) | w/e | 16/07/1960 | 52A | w/e | 08/06/1963 | 52E | Percy Main |
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5102 | on | 16/07/1960 (New) | 52A | w/e | 11/05/1974 | IS | Inverness | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D286 | on | 25/07/1960 (New) | 52A | 4w/e | 26/02/1966 | 55H | Neville Hill | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5103 | on | 06/08/1960 (New) | 52A | w/e | 11/05/1974 | IS | Inverness | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5104 | on | 27/08/1960 (New) | 52A | w/e | 11/05/1974 | IS | Inverness | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5105 | on | 10/09/1960 (New) | 52A | w/e | 11/05/1974 | ED | Eastfield | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5106 | on | 24/09/1960 (New) | 52A | w/e | 11/05/1974 | ED | Eastfield | ||||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65726 | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 52G | Sunderland | w/e | 24/09/1960 | 52A | on | 18/06/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65645 | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 54B | Tyne Dock | w/e | 01/10/1960 | 52A | on | 23/04/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5107 | on | 08/10/1960 (New) | 52A | w/e | 06/04/1974 | HA | Haymarket | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D250 | w/e | 30/01/1960 | 50A | York (North) | w/e | 15/10/1960 | 52A | w/e | 11/05/1963 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D251 | on | 30/12/1959 | 50A | York (North) (New) | w/e | 15/10/1960 | 52A | w/e | 18/05/1963 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5108 | on | 22/10/1960 (New) | 52A | on | 18/04/1966 | D05 | Stoke Division | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2162 | w/e | 08/10/1960 | 52E | Percy Main | w/e | 05/11/1960 | 52A | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5109 | on | 05/11/1960 (New) | 52A | w/e | 06/04/1974 | HA | Haymarket | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5110 | on | 16/11/1960 (New) | 52A | w/e | 11/05/1974 | HA | Haymarket | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2104 | w/e | 15/10/1960 | 52E | Percy Main | w/e | 19/11/1960 | 52A | w/e | 26/11/1960 | 52B | Heaton |
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5111 | on | 26/11/1960 (New) | 52A | w/e | 09/03/1974 | HA | Haymarket | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5147 | on | 17/12/1960 (New) | 52A | 4w/e | 02/12/1967 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60051 | on | 19/06/1960 | 51A | Darlington | on | 18/12/1960 | 52A | on | 09/09/1962 | 52B | Heaton |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60052 | on | 19/06/1960 | 51A | Darlington | on | 18/12/1960 | 52A | on | 09/09/1962 | 52B | Heaton |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2310 | on | 22/12/1960 (New) | 52A | on | 15/01/1961 | SBH | Blyth (South) | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5148 | on | 23/12/1960 (New) | 52A | w/e | 28/09/1968 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2311 | on | 30/12/1960 (New) | 52A | on | 29/01/1961 | 52H | Tyne Dock | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5112 | on | 30/12/1960 (New) | 52A | w/e | 16/12/1961 | 51L | Thornaby | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2312 | on | 05/01/1961 (New) | 52A | on | 29/01/1961 | 52H | Tyne Dock | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61016 | on | 05/05/1957 | 50B | Neville Hill | on | 15/01/1961 | 52A | on | 13/08/1961 | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61038 | on | 05/05/1957 | 50B | Neville Hill | on | 15/01/1961 | 52A | on | 30/04/1961 | 52G | Sunderland |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61237 | on | 24/09/1947 | NEV | Neville Hill (New) | on | 15/01/1961 | 52A | on | 30/04/1961 | 52G | Sunderland |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2313 | on | 17/01/1961 (New) | 52A | on | 29/01/1961 | 52H | Tyne Dock | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2314 | on | 27/01/1961 (New) | 52A | on | 29/01/1961 | 52H | Tyne Dock | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5113 | on | 28/01/1961 (New) | 52A | w/e | 16/12/1961 | 51L | Thornaby | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5149 | on | 07/02/1961 (New) | 52A | w/e | 28/09/1968 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5150 | on | 27/02/1961 (New) | 52A | w/e | 28/09/1968 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||||
Diesel | 55 | Co-Co | D9002 | on | 19/03/1961 (New) | 52A | on | 02/01/1982 | Withdrawn | |||||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | D2615 | on | 08/03/1961 | 52E | Percy Main (New) | w/e | 25/03/1961 | 52A | w/e | 16/12/1961 | 52D | Tweedmouth |
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | D2616 | on | 17/03/1961 | 52E | Percy Main (New) | w/e | 25/03/1961 | 52A | w/e | 29/07/1961 | 50D | Goole |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3073 | on | 19/12/1953 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates (New) | w/e | 08/04/1961 | 52A | w/e | 15/02/1964 | 52E | Percy Main |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2325 | on | 29/04/1961 (New) | 52A | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46471 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 52F | Blyth (North) | w/e | 29/04/1961 | 52A | w/e | 17/02/1962 | 52D | Tweedmouth |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46473 | w/e | 08/04/1961 | 52F | Blyth (North) | w/e | 29/04/1961 | 52A | w/e | 17/02/1962 | 52D | Tweedmouth |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3072 | 4w/e | 19/03/1955 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 20/05/1961 | 52A | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 52H | Tyne Dock |
Diesel | 55 | Co-Co | D9005 | on | 25/05/1961 (New) | 52A | on | 08/02/1981 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43126 | w/e | 11/02/1961 | 52B | Heaton | w/e | 03/06/1961 | 52A | w/e | 26/08/1961 | 52F | Blyth (North) |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60060 | on | 18/12/1960 | 51A | Darlington | on | 18/06/1961 | 52A | on | 09/09/1962 | 52B | Heaton |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60076 | on | 18/12/1960 | 51A | Darlington | on | 18/06/1961 | 52A | on | 09/09/1962 | 52B | Heaton |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2330 | on | 29/06/1961 (New) | 52A | w/e | 23/05/1964 | 52E | Percy Main | ||||
Diesel | 55 | Co-Co | D9008 | on | 07/07/1961 (New) | 52A | on | 31/12/1981 | Withdrawn | |||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D248 | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 34G | Finsbury Park | w/e | 08/07/1961 | 52A | 4w/e | 22/04/1967 | 56B | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2333 | on | 20/07/1961 (New) | 52A | w/e | 08/06/1963 | 52E | Percy Main | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 68736 | w/e | 27/12/1958 | 50A | York (North) | w/e | 22/07/1961 | 52A | on | 07/10/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 55 | Co-Co | D9011 | on | 24/08/1961 (New) | 52A | on | 08/11/1981 | Withdrawn | |||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3076 | w/e | 08/04/1961 | 52G | Sunderland | w/e | 26/08/1961 | 52A | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 50A | York (North) |
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | D14 | w/e | 25/02/1961 | 55H | Neville Hill | w/e | 02/09/1961 | 52A | w/e | 09/09/1961 | 55H | Neville Hill |
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | D18 | w/e | 08/04/1961 | 55H | Neville Hill | w/e | 02/09/1961 | 52A | w/e | 09/09/1961 | 55H | Neville Hill |
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | D22 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 17A | Derby | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 52A | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 55H | Neville Hill |
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | D24 | w/e | 05/08/1961 | 17A | Derby | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 52A | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 55H | Neville Hill |
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | D30 | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 55H | Neville Hill | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 52A | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 55H | Neville Hill |
Diesel | 55 | Co-Co | D9014 | on | 29/09/1961 (New) | 52A | on | 22/11/1981 | Withdrawn | |||||
Diesel | 55 | Co-Co | D9017 | on | 09/11/1961 (New) | 52A | on | 31/12/1981 | Withdrawn | |||||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | D2594 | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 52D | Tweedmouth | w/e | 16/12/1961 | 52A | w/e | 24/08/1963 | 52D | Tweedmouth |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5156 | on | 17/06/1961 | 51L | Thornaby (New) | w/e | 16/12/1961 | 52A | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5157 | on | 07/07/1961 | 51L | Thornaby (New) | w/e | 16/12/1961 | 52A | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60053 | on | 18/06/1961 | 51A | Darlington | on | 17/12/1961 | 52A | on | 09/09/1962 | 52B | Heaton |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60075 | on | 18/06/1961 | 51A | Darlington | on | 17/12/1961 | 52A | on | 24/06/1962 | 51A | Darlington |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | D146 | on | 15/12/1961 | 17A | Derby (New) | w/e | 23/12/1961 | 52A | w/e | 12/05/1962 | 17A | Derby |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | D148 | on | 22/12/1961 | 17A | Derby (New) | w/e | 10/02/1962 | 52A | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 17A | Derby |
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 68016 | w/e | 26/08/1961 | 52H | Tyne Dock | w/e | 24/03/1962 | 52A | w/e | 07/04/1962 | 52H | Tyne Dock |
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 68054 | w/e | 09/09/1961 | 52H | Tyne Dock | w/e | 24/03/1962 | 52A | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 52H | Tyne Dock |
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 68059 | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 54B | Tyne Dock | w/e | 24/03/1962 | 52A | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 52H | Tyne Dock |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60082 | on | 16/07/1961 | 52B | Heaton | on | 25/03/1962 | 52A | on | 09/09/1962 | 52B | Heaton |
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 69004 | w/e | 03/03/1962 | 51A | Darlington | w/e | 31/03/1962 | 52A | on | 23/09/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 69025 | w/e | 07/10/1961 | 52H | Tyne Dock | w/e | 31/03/1962 | 52A | on | 28/12/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 68031 | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 54B | Tyne Dock | w/e | 07/04/1962 | 52A | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 52H | Tyne Dock |
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 68053 | on | 01/01/1948 | WHL | West Hartlepool | w/e | 07/04/1962 | 52A | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 52H | Tyne Dock |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62006 | on | 31/01/1954 | 52C | Blaydon | on | 06/05/1962 | 52A | on | 23/09/1962 | 52B | Heaton |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62021 | on | 02/08/1949 | BLA | Blaydon (New) | on | 06/05/1962 | 52A | on | 25/11/1962 | 52d | Alnmouth |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62024 | on | 08/08/1949 | BLA | Blaydon (New) | on | 06/05/1962 | 52A | on | 28/02/1965 | 52F | Blyth (North) |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62026 | on | 11/08/1949 | BLA | Blaydon (New) | on | 06/05/1962 | 52A | on | 28/02/1965 | 52G | Sunderland |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62028 | on | 17/08/1949 | BLA | Blaydon (New) | on | 06/05/1962 | 52A | on | 08/09/1963 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62029 | on | 19/08/1949 | BLA | Blaydon (New) | on | 06/05/1962 | 52A | on | 08/09/1963 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62030 | on | 22/08/1949 | BLA | Blaydon (New) | on | 06/05/1962 | 52A | on | 04/11/1962 | 52d | Alnmouth |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | D166 | on | 09/05/1962 (New) | 52A | 4w/e | 25/05/1968 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5100 | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 12C | Carlisle Canal | w/e | 12/05/1962 | 52A | w/e | 30/03/1963 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62010 | on | 21/01/1962 | 52F | Blyth (North) | on | 20/05/1962 | 52A | on | 08/09/1963 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62025 | on | 21/01/1962 | 52F | Blyth (North) | on | 20/05/1962 | 52A | on | 23/09/1962 | 52B | Heaton |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D392 | on | 30/05/1962 (New) | 52A | w/e | 06/04/1963 | 51L | Thornaby | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | D167 | on | 31/05/1962 (New) | 52A | 4w/e | 25/05/1968 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | D168 | on | 31/05/1962 (New) | 52A | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | D169 | on | 07/06/1962 (New) | 52A | on | 29/11/1963 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D393 | on | 07/06/1962 (New) | 52A | w/e | 13/04/1963 | 51L | Thornaby | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D394 | on | 13/06/1962 (New) | 52A | w/e | 20/04/1963 | 51L | Thornaby | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | D170 | on | 21/06/1962 (New) | 52A | 2w/e | 11/07/1970 | 64B | Haymarket | ||||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 68029 | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 54B | Tyne Dock | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 52A | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 52H | Tyne Dock |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60091 | on | 17/12/1961 | 51A | Darlington | on | 24/06/1962 | 52A | on | 09/09/1962 | 52B | Heaton |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60058 | on | 17/12/1961 | 51A | Darlington | on | 24/06/1962 | 52A | on | 09/09/1962 | 52B | Heaton |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D395 | on | 27/06/1962 (New) | 52A | w/e | 27/04/1963 | 51L | Thornaby | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | D172 | on | 02/07/1962 (New) | 52A | on | 01/11/1984 | Withdrawn | |||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D396 | on | 04/07/1962 (New) | 52A | w/e | 04/05/1963 | 51L | Thornaby | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | D171 | on | 06/07/1962 (New) | 52A | on | 02/11/1980 | Withdrawn | |||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | D173 | on | 13/07/1962 (New) | 52A | w/e | 04/08/1962 | 8A | Edge Hill | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | D174 | on | 13/07/1962 (New) | 52A | w/e | 01/05/1965 | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D397 | on | 18/07/1962 (New) | 52A | w/e | 16/03/1963 | 51L | Thornaby | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | D175 | on | 03/08/1962 (New) | 52A | on | 29/11/1981 | GD | Gateshead | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | D176 | on | 14/08/1962 (New) | 52A | w/e | 31/10/1970 | 64B | Haymarket | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D398 | on | 15/08/1962 (New) | 52A | w/e | 29/09/1962 | 51L | Thornaby | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | D177 | on | 24/08/1962 (New) | 52A | on | 26/10/1980 | Withdrawn | |||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D399 | on | 05/09/1962 (New) | 52A | w/e | 29/09/1962 | 51L | Thornaby | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | D178 | on | 14/09/1962 (New) | 52A | on | 01/11/1981 | Withdrawn | |||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | D180 | on | 14/09/1962 (New) | 52A | on | 09/11/1981 | Withdrawn | |||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | D173 | w/e | 04/08/1962 | 8A | Edge Hill | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 52A | on | 02/05/1982 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | D179 | on | 21/09/1962 (New) | 52A | w/e | 10/10/1970 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | D181 | on | 22/09/1962 (New) | 52A | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | D182 | on | 27/09/1962 (New) | 52A | on | 01/11/1984 | Withdrawn | |||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | D183 | on | 04/10/1962 (New) | 52A | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | D184 | on | 15/10/1962 (New) | 52A | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | D185 | on | 16/10/1962 (New) | 52A | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | D186 | on | 09/11/1962 (New) | 52A | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | D187 | on | 23/11/1962 (New) | 52A | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6784 | on | 12/12/1962 (New) | 52A | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | 50A | York (North) | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | D188 | on | 17/12/1962 (New) | 52A | w/e | 12/10/1968 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6785 | on | 19/12/1962 (New) | 52A | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | 50A | York (North) | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6786 | on | 28/12/1962 (New) | 52A | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | 50A | York (North) | ||||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 67628 | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 52B | Heaton | w/e | 29/12/1962 | 52A | on | 24/11/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 67643 | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 52B | Heaton | w/e | 29/12/1962 | 52A | on | 02/11/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 67662 | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 52B | Heaton | w/e | 29/12/1962 | 52A | w/e | 14/01/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 67678 | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 52B | Heaton | w/e | 29/12/1962 | 52A | on | 02/11/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6787 | on | 31/12/1962 (New) | 52A | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | 50A | York (North) | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6788 | on | 14/01/1963 (New) | 52A | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | 50A | York (North) | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6789 | on | 18/01/1963 (New) | 52A | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | 50A | York (North) | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | D189 | on | 26/01/1963 (New) | 52A | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | D190 | on | 26/01/1963 (New) | 52A | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | D191 | on | 26/01/1963 (New) | 52A | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | D192 | on | 26/01/1963 (New) | 52A | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | D193 | on | 26/01/1963 (New) | 52A | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 67645 | on | 29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | w/e | 26/01/1963 (R) | 52A | |||||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 67654 | on | 01/01/1948 | HTN | Heaton | w/e | 26/01/1963 | 52A | on | 23/09/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6790 | on | 28/01/1963 (New) | 52A | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | 50A | York (North) | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6791 | on | 31/01/1963 (New) | 52A | 4w/e | 05/11/1966 | 50A | York (North) | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5179 | on | 11/02/1963 (New) | 52A | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6792 | on | 13/02/1963 (New) | 52A | 4w/e | 05/11/1966 | 50A | York (North) | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5180 | on | 19/02/1963 (New) | 52A | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6793 | on | 20/02/1963 (New) | 52A | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | 50A | York (North) | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6794 | on | 27/02/1963 (New) | 52A | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5181 | on | 04/03/1963 (New) | 52A | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6795 | on | 08/03/1963 (New) | 52A | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | 50A | York (North) | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60812 | on | 03/11/1945 | HTN | Heaton | on | 16/03/1963 | 52A | on | 09/07/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5182 | on | 19/03/1963 (New) | 52A | on | 18/04/1966 | D05 | Stoke Division | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2164 | w/e | 26/11/1960 | 52G | Sunderland | w/e | 08/06/1963 | 52A | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2247 | w/e | 13/12/1958 | 52F | Blyth (North) | w/e | 08/06/1963 | 52A | w/e | 18/07/1964 | 55H | Neville Hill |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3072 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 52H | Tyne Dock | w/e | 08/06/1963 | 52A | 4w/e | 29/01/1966 | 52E | Percy Main |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3241 | w/e | 04/03/1961 | 52G | Sunderland | w/e | 08/06/1963 | 52A | 4w/e | 11/09/1965 | 52E | Percy Main |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3316 | w/e | 13/12/1958 | 52B | Heaton | w/e | 08/06/1963 | 52A | 4w/e | 14/08/1965 | 52E | Percy Main |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3317 | w/e | 13/12/1958 | 52B | Heaton | w/e | 08/06/1963 | 52A | w/e | 19/07/1969 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3321 | w/e | 13/12/1958 | 52B | Heaton | w/e | 08/06/1963 | 52A | 4w/e | 14/08/1965 | 52E | Percy Main |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3943 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 52B | Heaton | w/e | 08/06/1963 | 52A | 4w/e | 02/12/1967 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D250 | w/e | 11/05/1963 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 15/06/1963 | 52A | 4w/e | 26/02/1966 | 55H | Neville Hill |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D251 | w/e | 18/05/1963 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 15/06/1963 | 52A | 4w/e | 09/09/1967 | 50A | York (North) |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D256 | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 15/06/1963 | 52A | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 50A | York (North) |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D392 | w/e | 06/04/1963 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 15/06/1963 | 52A | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D393 | w/e | 13/04/1963 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 15/06/1963 | 52A | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D394 | w/e | 20/04/1963 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 15/06/1963 | 52A | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D395 | w/e | 27/04/1963 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 15/06/1963 | 52A | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D396 | w/e | 04/05/1963 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 15/06/1963 | 52A | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D397 | w/e | 16/03/1963 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 15/06/1963 | 52A | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D398 | w/e | 29/09/1962 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 15/06/1963 | 52A | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D399 | w/e | 29/09/1962 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 15/06/1963 | 52A | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5177 | on | 04/02/1963 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) (New) | w/e | 15/06/1963 | 52A | 4w/e | 06/11/1965 | 50A | York (North) |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5178 | on | 08/02/1963 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) (New) | w/e | 15/06/1963 | 52A | 4w/e | 06/11/1965 | 50A | York (North) |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2314 | on | 02/06/1963 | 52E | Percy Main | on | 16/06/1963 | 52A | on | 13/02/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60091 | on | 09/09/1962 | 52B | Heaton | on | 16/06/1963 | 52A | on | 12/10/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60092 | on | 11/06/1961 | 56B | Ardsley | on | 16/06/1963 | 52A | on | 12/10/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60085 | on | 31/08/1944 | HTN | Heaton | on | 16/06/1963 | 52A | on | 12/10/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60088 | on | 16/07/1961 | 52B | Heaton | on | 16/06/1963 | 52A | on | 14/10/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60036 | on | 10/09/1961 | 56B | Ardsley | on | 16/06/1963 | 52A | on | 15/12/1963 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60040 | on | 09/12/1962 | 52B | Heaton | on | 16/06/1963 | 52A | on | 06/07/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60045 | on | 02/06/1963 | 52B | Heaton | on | 16/06/1963 | 52A | on | 15/12/1963 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60052 | on | 02/06/1963 | 52B | Heaton | on | 16/06/1963 | 52A | on | 25/08/1963 | 64A | St Margarets |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60060 | on | 09/09/1962 | 52B | Heaton | on | 16/06/1963 | 52A | on | 23/09/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60071 | on | 09/09/1962 | 52B | Heaton | on | 16/06/1963 | 52A | on | 12/10/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60073 | on | 06/05/1946 | HTN | Heaton | on | 16/06/1963 | 52A | on | 19/08/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60082 | on | 09/09/1962 | 52B | Heaton | on | 16/06/1963 | 52A | on | 02/09/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60083 | on | 26/10/1940 | HTN | Heaton | on | 16/06/1963 | 52A | on | 18/05/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61019 | on | 24/02/1963 | 52B | Heaton | on | 16/06/1963 | 52A | on | 03/10/1965 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61022 | on | 24/02/1963 | 52B | Heaton | on | 16/06/1963 | 52A | on | 31/01/1965 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61035 | on | 10/02/1963 | 52B | Heaton | on | 16/06/1963 | 52A | on | 03/10/1965 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61038 | on | 24/02/1963 | 52B | Heaton | on | 16/06/1963 | 52A | on | 01/05/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61322 | on | 09/09/1962 | 52B | Heaton | on | 16/06/1963 | 52A | on | 31/10/1965 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60835 | on | 12/04/1953 | 52B | Heaton | on | 16/06/1963 | 52A | on | 30/06/1963 | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60865 | on | 30/12/1962 | 52B | Heaton | on | 16/06/1963 | 52A | on | 14/06/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60868 | on | 03/01/1960 | 52B | Heaton | on | 16/06/1963 | 52A | on | 10/10/1965 | 64A | St Margarets |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60891 | on | 06/05/1946 | HTN | Heaton | on | 16/06/1963 | 52A | on | 12/10/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60904 | on | 03/01/1960 | 52B | Heaton | on | 16/06/1963 | 52A | on | 09/07/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60910 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | HTN | Heaton | on | 16/06/1963 | 52A | on | 15/04/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60913 | on | 13/01/1963 | 52B | Heaton | on | 16/06/1963 | 52A | on | 12/10/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60922 | on | 09/09/1956 | 52B | Heaton | on | 16/06/1963 | 52A | on | 09/07/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60940 | on | 13/12/1959 | 52B | Heaton | on | 16/06/1963 | 52A | on | 11/10/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60944 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 52B | Heaton | on | 16/06/1963 | 52A | on | 20/09/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60962 | on | 10/06/1956 | 52B | Heaton | on | 16/06/1963 | 52A | on | 20/09/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60976 | on | 14/09/1958 | 52B | Heaton | on | 16/06/1963 | 52A | on | 10/10/1965 | 64A | St Margarets |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3940 | on | 16/03/1960 | 50A | York (North) (New) | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 52A | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 52E | Percy Main |
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 69008 | w/e | 07/10/1961 | 52B | Heaton | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 52A | w/e | 09/12/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 69024 | w/e | 07/10/1961 | 52B | Heaton | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 52A | on | 23/09/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 69028 | m/e | 05/1951 | 52B | Heaton (New) | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 52A | on | 26/10/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 67620 | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 52B | Heaton | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 52A | on | 24/11/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 67636 | on | 01/01/1948 | BLA | Blaydon | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 52A | on | 02/11/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 67642 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 52B | Heaton | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 52A | on | 04/06/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 67646 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | HTN | Heaton | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 52A | on | 24/11/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 67651 | on | 01/01/1948 | HTN | Heaton | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 52A | on | 19/05/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 67652 | on | 01/01/1948 | HTN | Heaton | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 52A | w/e | 23/12/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 67656 | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 52B | Heaton | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 52A | w/e | 23/12/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 67658 | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 52B | Heaton | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 52A | on | 23/09/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 67683 | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 52B | Heaton | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 52A | on | 23/09/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 67690 | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 52B | Heaton | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 52A | w/e | 24/10/1964 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 67691 | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 52B | Heaton | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 52A | on | 24/11/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | D2615 | w/e | 16/12/1961 | 52D | Tweedmouth | w/e | 24/08/1963 | 52A | w/e | 25/01/1964 | XX | |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2103 | on | 27/08/1960 | 50A | York (North) (New) | w/e | 21/09/1963 | 52A | w/e | 20/11/1971 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2110 | on | 18/11/1960 | 50A | York (North) (New) | w/e | 21/09/1963 | 52A | on | 02/02/1976 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2163 | w/e | 08/06/1963 | 52E | Percy Main | w/e | 21/09/1963 | 52A | on | 14/01/1976 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 67640 | w/e | 25/11/1961 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 28/09/1963 | 52A | on | 02/11/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60084 | w/e | 10/09/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill | on | 08/12/1963 | 52A | on | 23/11/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60070 | on | 16/06/1963 | 55H | Neville Hill | on | 08/12/1963 | 52A | on | 04/05/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60080 | on | 16/06/1963 | 55H | Neville Hill | on | 08/12/1963 | 52A | on | 12/10/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60051 | on | 02/06/1963 | 51A | Darlington | on | 15/12/1963 | 52A | on | 23/11/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60075 | on | 02/06/1963 | 51A | Darlington | on | 15/12/1963 | 52A | on | 13/01/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 67638 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 21/12/1963 | 52A | on | 02/11/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 67684 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 21/12/1963 | 52A | on | 02/11/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 69016 | w/e | 05/10/1963 | 51C | West Hartlepool | w/e | 04/01/1964 | 52A | on | 26/10/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2249 | w/e | 08/06/1963 | 52E | Percy Main | w/e | 15/02/1964 | 52A | w/e | 23/05/1964 | 52E | Percy Main |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1575 | on | 20/04/1964 (New) | 52A | w/e | 29/05/1965 | 31B | March | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | D189 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 52A | 4w/e | 02/12/1967 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | D190 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 52A | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | D191 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 52A | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | D192 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 52A | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1574 | on | 25/04/1964 (New) | 52A | w/e | 13/02/1965 | 41A | Tinsley | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1576 | on | 25/04/1964 (New) | 52A | w/e | 10/07/1965 | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1577 | on | 25/04/1964 (New) | 52A | w/e | 12/10/1968 | 64B | Haymarket | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1579 | on | 01/05/1964 (New) | 52A | w/e | 01/02/1969 | 51L | Thornaby | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1578 | on | 02/05/1964 (New) | 52A | w/e | 12/10/1968 | 64B | Haymarket | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1580 | on | 08/05/1964 (New) | 52A | w/e | 12/10/1968 | 64B | Haymarket | ||||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | D8592 | on | 12/05/1964 (New) | 52A | w/e | 12/06/1971 | 64B | Haymarket | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1581 | on | 16/05/1964 (New) | 52A | w/e | 12/10/1968 | 64B | Haymarket | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1582 | on | 16/05/1964 (New) | 52A | w/e | 25/01/1969 | 51L | Thornaby | ||||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | D8593 | on | 28/05/1964 (New) | 52A | w/e | 12/06/1971 | 64B | Haymarket | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5112 | w/e | 16/12/1961 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 52A | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5113 | w/e | 16/12/1961 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 52A | 4w/e | 04/11/1967 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6755 | on | 21/09/1962 | 51L | Thornaby (New) | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 52A | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6756 | on | 28/09/1962 | 51L | Thornaby (New) | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 52A | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | D8594 | on | 03/07/1964 (New) | 52A | w/e | 29/05/1971 | 64B | Haymarket | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60859 | on | 11/09/1960 | 51L | Thornaby | on | 05/07/1964 | 52A | on | 20/09/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60946 | on | 13/09/1959 | 51L | Thornaby | on | 05/07/1964 | 52A | on | 11/10/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60952 | on | 26/01/1964 | 51L | Thornaby | on | 05/07/1964 | 52A | on | 11/10/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2311 | on | 02/06/1963 | 52E | Percy Main | on | 12/07/1964 | 52A | on | 13/02/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2047 | w/e | 08/06/1963 | 52E | Percy Main | w/e | 18/07/1964 | 52A | 4w/e | 20/07/1968 | 55B | York (North) |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2330 | w/e | 23/05/1964 | 52E | Percy Main | w/e | 18/07/1964 | 52A | on | 07/1969 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | D8595 | on | 21/07/1964 (New) | 52A | on | 22/12/1968 | Withdrawn | |||||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | D8597 | on | 21/07/1964 (New) | 52A | w/e | 29/05/1971 | 64B | Haymarket | ||||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | D8596 | on | 28/07/1964 (New) | 52A | on | 22/12/1968 | Withdrawn | |||||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | D8598 | on | 06/08/1964 (New) | 52A | w/e | 29/05/1971 | 64B | Haymarket | ||||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | D8600 | on | 06/08/1964 (New) | 52A | 4w/e | 27/04/1968 | 51L | Thornaby | ||||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | D8599 | on | 28/08/1964 (New) | 52A | 4w/e | 27/04/1968 | 51L | Thornaby | ||||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | D8601 | on | 02/09/1964 (New) | 52A | 4w/e | 24/02/1968 | 51L | Thornaby | ||||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | D8603 | on | 07/09/1964 (New) | 52A | 4w/e | 27/04/1968 | 51L | Thornaby | ||||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | D8602 | on | 09/09/1964 (New) | 52A | 4w/e | 24/02/1968 | 51L | Thornaby | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D392 | w/e | 15/06/1963 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 52A | 4w/e | 29/01/1966 | 50A | York (North) |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D393 | w/e | 15/06/1963 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 52A | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 56B | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D394 | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 52A | 4w/e | 29/01/1966 | 50A | York (North) |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D395 | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 52A | 4w/e | 29/01/1966 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | 60116 | on | 09/09/1962 | 52D | Tweedmouth | on | 18/10/1964 | 52A | on | 14/06/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | 60127 | on | 09/09/1962 | 52D | Tweedmouth | on | 18/10/1964 | 52A | on | 14/06/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | 60151 | on | 09/09/1962 | 52D | Tweedmouth | on | 18/10/1964 | 52A | on | 11/07/1965 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | 60142 | on | 09/09/1962 | 52D | Tweedmouth | on | 25/10/1964 | 52A | on | 14/06/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | 60117 | on | 06/09/1964 | 56B | Ardsley | on | 06/12/1964 | 52A | on | 03/01/1965 | 56B | Ardsley |
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | 60129 | on | 09/09/1962 | 52D | Tweedmouth | on | 06/12/1964 | 52A | on | 11/07/1965 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | 60132 | on | 09/09/1962 | 52D | Tweedmouth | on | 06/12/1964 | 52A | on | 14/06/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | 60148 | on | 06/09/1964 | 56B | Ardsley | on | 06/12/1964 | 52A | on | 03/01/1965 | 56B | Ardsley |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60901 | on | 16/06/1963 | 51C | West Hartlepool | on | 13/12/1964 | 52A | on | 14/06/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2312 | on | 02/06/1963 | 52E | Percy Main | on | 10/01/1965 | 52A | on | 13/02/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2334 | w/e | 08/06/1963 | 52E | Percy Main | 4w/e | 30/01/1965 | 52A | 4w/e | 24/02/1968 | 51A | Darlington |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D390 | on | 09/05/1962 | 50A | York (North) (New) | 4w/e | 27/03/1965 | 52A | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 56B | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D391 | on | 16/05/1962 | 50A | York (North) (New) | 4w/e | 27/03/1965 | 52A | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 56B | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D396 | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 51L | Thornaby | 4w/e | 27/03/1965 | 52A | 4w/e | 29/01/1966 | 50A | York (North) |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D397 | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 51L | Thornaby | 4w/e | 27/03/1965 | 52A | 4w/e | 09/10/1965 | 50A | York (North) |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D398 | w/e | 31/10/1964 | 50A | York (North) | 4w/e | 27/03/1965 | 52A | 4w/e | 09/10/1965 | 50A | York (North) |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1547 | on | 24/10/1963 | 34G | Finsbury Park (New) | w/e | 01/05/1965 | 52A | w/e | 22/05/1965 | 34G | Finsbury Park |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1543 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 34G | Finsbury Park | 4w/e | 22/05/1965 | 52A | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 34G | Finsbury Park |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | D174 | w/e | 01/05/1965 | 34G | Finsbury Park | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 52A | w/e | 10/10/1970 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1889 | on | 23/07/1965 | 41A | Tinsley (New) | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 52A | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3073 | w/e | 15/02/1964 | 52E | Percy Main | 4w/e | 14/08/1965 | 52A | w/e | 10/04/1971 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3243 | w/e | 08/06/1963 | 52E | Percy Main | 4w/e | 14/08/1965 | 52A | w/e | 22/01/1972 | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3674 | w/e | 08/06/1963 | 52E | Percy Main | 4w/e | 14/08/1965 | 52A | m/e | 09/1977 | To Store | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3322 | w/e | 08/06/1963 | 52E | Percy Main | 4w/e | 11/09/1965 | 52A | w/e | 17/07/1971 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1868 | w/e | 25/09/1965 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 52A | 4w/e | 09/10/1965 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1868 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 52A | Gateshead | 4w/e | 09/10/1965 | 52A | 4w/e | 29/01/1966 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3875 | on | 26/03/1960 | 51L | Thornaby (New) | 4w/e | 09/10/1965 | 52A | 4w/e | 06/11/1965 | 52E | Percy Main |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1978 | on | 04/12/1965 (New) | 52A | w/e | 09/11/1968 | 41A | Tinsley | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1977 | on | 11/12/1965 (New) | 52A | w/e | 09/11/1968 | 41A | Tinsley | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1979 | on | 11/12/1965 (New) | 52A | 4w/e | 24/02/1968 | 55G | Knottingley | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1980 | on | 16/12/1965 (New) | 52A | w/e | 09/11/1968 | 41A | Tinsley | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1981 | on | 18/12/1965 (New) | 52A | w/e | 09/11/1968 | 41A | Tinsley | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1982 | on | 23/12/1965 (New) | 52A | w/e | 08/03/1969 | 41A | Tinsley | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1983 | on | 30/12/1965 (New) | 52A | w/e | 08/03/1969 | 41A | Tinsley | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1984 | on | 08/01/1966 (New) | 52A | w/e | 08/03/1969 | 41A | Tinsley | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1985 | on | 17/01/1966 (New) | 52A | w/e | 21/03/1970 | 41A | Tinsley | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1986 | on | 21/01/1966 (New) | 52A | w/e | 21/03/1970 | 41A | Tinsley | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1987 | on | 29/01/1966 (New) | 52A | w/e | 21/03/1970 | 41A | Tinsley | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3078 | w/e | 08/06/1963 | 52E | Percy Main | 4w/e | 29/01/1966 | 52A | w/e | 24/10/1970 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1988 | on | 26/02/1966 (New) | 52A | w/e | 21/03/1970 | 41A | Tinsley | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1989 | on | 26/02/1966 (New) | 52A | 4w/e | 10/09/1966 | 50A | York (North) | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2310 | on | 02/06/1963 | 52E | Percy Main | on | 27/02/1966 | 52A | on | 01/02/1969 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2313 | on | 02/06/1963 | 52E | Percy Main | on | 27/02/1966 | 52A | on | 28/08/1966 | To Store | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1570 | on | 31/03/1964 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) (New) | 4w/e | 23/04/1966 | 52A | w/e | 25/05/1968 | 30A | Stratford |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1573 | on | 11/04/1964 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) (New) | 4w/e | 23/04/1966 | 52A | w/e | 12/10/1968 | 64B | Haymarket |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1765 | 4w/e | 19/06/1965 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | 4w/e | 23/04/1966 | 52A | w/e | 28/10/1967 | 34G | Finsbury Park |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1766 | 4w/e | 27/03/1965 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | 4w/e | 23/04/1966 | 52A | w/e | 28/10/1967 | 34G | Finsbury Park |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6819 | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | 50A | York (North) | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | 52A | w/e | 15/02/1969 | 30A | Stratford |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6820 | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | 50A | York (North) | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | 52A | on | 15/05/1968 | CF | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6823 | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | 50A | York (North) | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | 52A | w/e | 09/11/1968 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6824 | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | 50A | York (North) | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | 52A | w/e | 12/10/1968 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6825 | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | 50A | York (North) | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | 52A | w/e | 19/10/1968 | 30A | Stratford |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6826 | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | 50A | York (North) | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | 52A | w/e | 17/05/1969 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6827 | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | 50A | York (North) | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | 52A | w/e | 16/11/1968 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6828 | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | 50A | York (North) | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | 52A | w/e | 31/01/1970 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6830 | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | 50A | York (North) | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | 52A | w/e | 19/07/1969 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | D8588 | on | 20/03/1964 | 51L | Thornaby (New) | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | 52A | w/e | 01/05/1971 | 64B | Haymarket |
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | D8589 | on | 04/05/1964 | 51L | Thornaby (New) | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | 52A | on | 06/07/1970 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | D8590 | on | 12/05/1964 | 51L | Thornaby (New) | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | 52A | on | 27/03/1971 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | D8591 | on | 08/07/1964 | 51L | Thornaby (New) | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | 52A | on | 22/12/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1767 | w/e | 10/07/1965 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | 4w/e | 10/09/1966 | 52A | w/e | 28/10/1967 | 34G | Finsbury Park |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6831 | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | 50A | York (North) | 2w/e | 30/10/1966 | 52A | w/e | 21/09/1968 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6832 | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | 50A | York (North) | 2w/e | 30/10/1966 | 52A | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 56B | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6833 | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | 50A | York (North) | 2w/e | 30/10/1966 | 52A | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 56B | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6829 | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | 51L | Thornaby | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 52A | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 56B | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6873 | on | 12/09/1963 | 87E | Landore (New) | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 52A | w/e | 02/12/1972 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6893 | q/e | 15/01/1967 | 87E | Landore | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 52A | w/e | 31/01/1970 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2313 | on | 28/08/1966 | 98S | on | 29/01/1967 | 52A | on | 05/02/1967 | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street | |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2108 | on | 29/10/1960 | 51A | Darlington (New) | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | 52A | on | 18/11/1976 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6874 | on | 15/09/1963 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | 52A | w/e | 12/04/1969 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D249 | 4w/e | 26/02/1966 | 50A | York (North) | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | 4w/e | 22/04/1967 | 56B | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D250 | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | 56B | Healey Mills | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | 4w/e | 22/04/1967 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D278 | w/e | 11/11/1961 | 50A | York (North) | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | 4w/e | 09/09/1967 | 50A | York (North) |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D280 | 4w/e | 26/02/1966 | 50A | York (North) | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | w/e | 08/07/1972 | 55B | York (North) |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D281 | on | 20/06/1960 | 50A | York (North) (New) | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | w/e | 30/05/1970 | 55B | York (North) |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D282 | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | 56B | Healey Mills | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | w/e | 08/05/1971 | 55B | York (North) |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D283 | on | 04/07/1960 | 50A | York (North) (New) | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | w/e | 08/05/1971 | 55B | York (North) |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D284 | on | 11/07/1960 | 50A | York (North) (New) | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | w/e | 06/05/1972 | 55B | York (North) |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D285 | on | 18/07/1960 | 50A | York (North) (New) | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | 50A | York (North) |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D286 | 4w/e | 26/02/1966 | 50A | York (North) | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | 50A | York (North) |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1100 | on | 01/08/1966 | 50A | York (North) (New) | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | w/e | 24/10/1970 | 55B | York (North) |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1989 | 4w/e | 10/09/1966 | 50A | York (North) | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | w/e | 07/10/1972 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1990 | on | 26/02/1966 | 50A | York (North) (New) | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | w/e | 07/10/1972 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1991 | on | 02/03/1966 | 50A | York (North) (New) | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | w/e | 07/10/1972 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1992 | on | 15/03/1966 | 50A | York (North) (New) | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | w/e | 07/10/1972 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1993 | on | 26/03/1966 | 50A | York (North) (New) | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | w/e | 04/11/1972 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1998 | on | 14/06/1966 | 50A | York (North) (New) | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | w/e | 09/11/1968 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1999 | on | 25/06/1966 | 50A | York (North) (New) | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | w/e | 09/11/1968 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2052 | 4w/e | 13/08/1966 | 50A | York (North) | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | on | 07/05/1972 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2053 | 4w/e | 13/08/1966 | 50A | York (North) | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | on | 07/05/1972 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2071 | w/e | 18/07/1964 | 55F | Manningham | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | on | 07/05/1972 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2074 | w/e | 12/09/1964 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | on | 07/05/1972 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2230 | on | 16/01/1956 | 51C | West Hartlepool (New) | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | on | 28/03/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2232 | 4w/e | 23/04/1966 | 51C | West Hartlepool | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | on | 28/03/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6894 | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | Gateshead | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6894 | q/e | 15/01/1967 | 87E | Landore | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6894 | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | Gateshead | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | w/e | 31/01/1970 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6895 | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | Gateshead | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6895 | q/e | 15/01/1967 | 87E | Landore | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6895 | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | Gateshead | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | w/e | 31/01/1970 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6896 | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | Gateshead | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6896 | q/e | 15/01/1967 | 87E | Landore | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6896 | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | Gateshead | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | w/e | 11/04/1970 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6897 | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | Gateshead | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6897 | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6897 | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | Gateshead | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | w/e | 31/01/1970 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6898 | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | Gateshead | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6898 | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6898 | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | Gateshead | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | w/e | 31/01/1970 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6899 | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | Gateshead | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6899 | on | 10/10/1963 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6899 | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | Gateshead | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | w/e | 31/01/1970 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6900 | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | Gateshead | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6900 | on | 15/10/1963 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6900 | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | Gateshead | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | TE | Thornaby |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6901 | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | Gateshead | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6901 | on | 18/10/1963 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6901 | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | Gateshead | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | w/e | 14/11/1970 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6902 | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | Gateshead | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6902 | on | 23/10/1963 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6902 | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | Gateshead | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | w/e | 31/01/1970 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D250 | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 52A | Gateshead | 4w/e | 22/04/1967 | 52A | 4w/e | 20/05/1967 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D250 | 4w/e | 22/04/1967 | 52A | Gateshead | 4w/e | 20/05/1967 | 52A | 4w/e | 09/09/1967 | 50A | York (North) |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6787 | 4w/e | 20/05/1967 | 51L | Thornaby | 4w/e | 17/06/1967 | 52A | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | D8018 | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 66A | Polmadie | w/e | 24/06/1967 | 52A | 4w/e | 22/06/1968 | 55B | York (North) |
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | D8019 | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 66A | Polmadie | w/e | 24/06/1967 | 52A | w/e | 17/08/1968 | 30A | Stratford |
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | D8028 | 8w/e | 26/03/1966 | 64B | Haymarket | w/e | 24/06/1967 | 52A | w/e | 10/10/1970 | 40B | Immingham |
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | D8604 | w/e | 28/05/1966 | 64B | Haymarket | 2w/e | 24/06/1967 | 52A | 5w/e | 30/12/1967 | 91N | To North Eastern Region |
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | D8605 | w/e | 28/05/1966 | 64B | Haymarket | 2w/e | 24/06/1967 | 52A | 5w/e | 30/12/1967 | 91N | To North Eastern Region |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5166 | on | 02/11/1961 | 51L | Thornaby (New) | 4w/e | 15/07/1967 | 52A | 4w/e | 02/12/1967 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5167 | on | 25/11/1961 | 51L | Thornaby (New) | 4w/e | 15/07/1967 | 52A | 4w/e | 02/12/1967 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5168 | on | 01/12/1961 | 51L | Thornaby (New) | 4w/e | 15/07/1967 | 52A | 4w/e | 02/12/1967 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5169 | on | 15/12/1961 | 51L | Thornaby (New) | 4w/e | 15/07/1967 | 52A | 4w/e | 02/12/1967 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6780 | w/e | 15/06/1963 | 51L | Thornaby | 4w/e | 15/07/1967 | 52A | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6786 | 4w/e | 20/05/1967 | 51L | Thornaby | 4w/e | 15/07/1967 | 52A | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | D8020 | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 66A | Polmadie | 4w/e | 15/07/1967 | 52A | w/e | 10/10/1970 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | D8027 | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 66A | Polmadie | 4w/e | 15/07/1967 | 52A | w/e | 06/06/1970 | 55B | York (North) |
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | D8022 | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 66A | Polmadie | 4w/e | 29/07/1967 | 52A | w/e | 10/10/1970 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | D8025 | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 66A | Polmadie | 4w/e | 29/07/1967 | 52A | w/e | 10/10/1970 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6945 | m/e | 08/1967 | 56B | Healey Mills | m/e | 08/1967 | 52A | 4w/e | 27/01/1968 | 55C | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | D8021 | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 66A | Polmadie | 4w/e | 12/08/1967 | 52A | w/e | 10/10/1970 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | D8029 | 8w/e | 26/03/1966 | 64B | Haymarket | 2w/e | 26/08/1967 | 52A | w/e | 18/04/1970 | 55B | York (North) |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6799 | w/e | 09/09/1967 | 91N | To North Eastern Region | 4w/e | 09/09/1967 | 52A | w/e | 11/11/1972 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | D8045 | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 40B | Immingham | w/e | 09/09/1967 | 52A | m/e | 30/09/1967 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | D8046 | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 40B | Immingham | w/e | 09/09/1967 | 52A | m/e | 30/09/1967 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | D8047 | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 40B | Immingham | w/e | 09/09/1967 | 52A | m/e | 30/09/1967 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | D8048 | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 40B | Immingham | w/e | 09/09/1967 | 52A | m/e | 30/09/1967 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6796 | w/e | 09/09/1967 | 41C | Wath | m/e | 30/09/1967 | 52A | m/e | 30/09/1967 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6797 | w/e | 09/09/1967 | 41A | Tinsley | m/e | 30/09/1967 | 52A | 4w/e | 04/11/1967 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6798 | w/e | 09/09/1967 | 41C | Wath | m/e | 30/09/1967 | 52A | 4w/e | 04/11/1967 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | D8023 | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 66A | Polmadie | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | 52A | w/e | 10/10/1970 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | D8024 | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 66A | Polmadie | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | 52A | w/e | 27/06/1970 | 55B | York (North) |
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | D8026 | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 66A | Polmadie | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | 52A | w/e | 10/10/1970 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | D8045 | w/e | 09/09/1967 | 52A | Gateshead | m/e | 30/09/1967 | 52A | w/e | 18/11/1967 | D16 | Nottingham Division |
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | D8046 | w/e | 09/09/1967 | 52A | Gateshead | m/e | 30/09/1967 | 52A | w/e | 18/11/1967 | D16 | Nottingham Division |
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | D8047 | w/e | 09/09/1967 | 52A | Gateshead | m/e | 30/09/1967 | 52A | w/e | 18/11/1967 | D16 | Nottingham Division |
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | D8048 | w/e | 09/09/1967 | 52A | Gateshead | m/e | 30/09/1967 | 52A | w/e | 18/11/1967 | D16 | Nottingham Division |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1101 | on | 12/08/1966 | 50A | York (North) (New) | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | 52A | 4w/e | 20/07/1968 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1102 | on | 09/09/1966 | 50A | York (North) (New) | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | 52A | 4w/e | 20/07/1968 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5151 | on | 15/04/1961 | 51L | Thornaby (New) | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | 52A | w/e | 02/12/1967 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1571 | w/e | 12/02/1966 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 28/10/1967 | 52A | w/e | 25/05/1968 | 30A | Stratford |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1103 | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | 4w/e | 04/11/1967 | 52A | 4w/e | 25/05/1968 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1104 | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | 4w/e | 04/11/1967 | 52A | 4w/e | 25/05/1968 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5172 | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | 4w/e | 04/11/1967 | 52A | 4w/e | 30/12/1967 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6821 | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 56B | Healey Mills | 4w/e | 04/11/1967 | 52A | w/e | 21/09/1968 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6822 | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 56B | Healey Mills | 4w/e | 04/11/1967 | 52A | w/e | 09/11/1968 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6798 | 4w/e | 04/11/1967 | 51L | Thornaby | 4w/e | 02/12/1967 | 52A | w/e | 31/01/1970 | 55C | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6832 | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 56B | Healey Mills | 4w/e | 02/12/1967 | 52A | w/e | 05/04/1969 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6833 | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 56B | Healey Mills | 4w/e | 02/12/1967 | 52A | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 30A | Stratford |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6834 | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 56B | Healey Mills | 4w/e | 02/12/1967 | 52A | w/e | 05/04/1969 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6796 | m/e | 30/09/1967 | 51L | Thornaby | 4w/e | 27/01/1968 | 52A | w/e | 11/11/1972 | 55C | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6797 | 4w/e | 04/11/1967 | 51L | Thornaby | 4w/e | 27/01/1968 | 52A | w/e | 08/05/1971 | 55C | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6829 | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 56B | Healey Mills | 4w/e | 27/01/1968 | 52A | w/e | 28/12/1968 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D368 | on | 01/12/1961 | 64B | Haymarket (New) | 5w/e | 30/03/1968 | 52A | 4w/e | 27/04/1968 | 64B | Haymarket |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D237 | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 51L | Thornaby | 4w/e | 25/05/1968 | 52A | w/e | 12/08/1972 | 55C | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D238 | 4w/e | 27/03/1965 | 51L | Thornaby | 4w/e | 25/05/1968 | 52A | w/e | 12/08/1972 | 55C | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D239 | 4w/e | 27/03/1965 | 51L | Thornaby | 4w/e | 25/05/1968 | 52A | w/e | 12/10/1968 | 55C | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D285 | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | 50A | York (North) | 4w/e | 25/05/1968 | 52A | w/e | 06/05/1972 | 55B | York (North) |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D286 | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | 50A | York (North) | 4w/e | 25/05/1968 | 52A | w/e | 06/05/1972 | 55B | York (North) |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3926 | 9w/e | 26/11/1966 | 67C | Ayr | 4w/e | 25/05/1968 | 52A | w/e | 13/12/1975 | SF | Stratford |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6871 | 4w/e | 31/12/1966 | 56B | Healey Mills | 4w/e | 25/05/1968 | 52A | w/e | 17/05/1969 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6872 | on | 06/09/1963 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 4w/e | 25/05/1968 | 52A | w/e | 15/03/1969 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3915 | on | 02/12/1960 | 66A | Polmadie (New) | 4w/e | 22/06/1968 | 52A | 4w/e | 20/07/1968 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1570 | w/e | 25/05/1968 | 30A | Stratford | 4w/e | 20/07/1968 | 52A | w/e | 03/08/1968 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1571 | w/e | 25/05/1968 | 30A | Stratford | 4w/e | 20/07/1968 | 52A | w/e | 12/10/1968 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2066 | on | 17/08/1959 | 50A | York (North) (New) | 4w/e | 20/07/1968 | 52A | on | 08/01/1988 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2094 | w/e | 09/07/1960 | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street | 4w/e | 20/07/1968 | 52A | on | 08/01/1988 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2222 | w/e | 27/07/1963 | 31B | March | 4w/e | 20/07/1968 | 52A | on | 28/10/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2229 | w/e | 05/10/1963 | 31B | March | 4w/e | 20/07/1968 | 52A | on | 31/12/1969 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2237 | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 31B | March | 4w/e | 20/07/1968 | 52A | on | 31/10/1969 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2243 | 4w/e | 24/02/1968 | 51L | Thornaby | 4w/e | 20/07/1968 | 52A | w/e | 21/09/1968 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2298 | w/e | 13/11/1965 | 40A | Lincoln | w/e | 20/07/1968 | 52A | on | 28/12/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2299 | w/e | 02/03/1968 | 40A | Lincoln | w/e | 20/07/1968 | 52A | on | 11/01/1970 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3915 | 4w/e | 20/07/1968 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 07/09/1968 | 52A | on | 11/07/1990 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2317 | 4w/e | 20/07/1968 | 51A | Darlington | w/e | 14/09/1968 | 52A | on | 30/09/1969 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2078 | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 21/09/1968 | 52A | on | 08/01/1988 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6794 | 4w/e | 27/04/1968 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 21/09/1968 | 52A | w/e | 11/04/1970 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6795 | 4w/e | 27/04/1968 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 21/09/1968 | 52A | w/e | 02/12/1972 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7586 | 4w/e | 25/05/1968 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 28/09/1968 | 52A | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7593 | w/e | 16/03/1968 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 28/09/1968 | 52A | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7596 | 4w/e | 25/05/1968 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 28/09/1968 | 52A | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D277 | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 50A | York (North) | w/e | 12/10/1968 | 52A | w/e | 22/11/1969 | 55B | York (North) |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D278 | 4w/e | 09/09/1967 | 50A | York (North) | w/e | 12/10/1968 | 52A | w/e | 22/11/1969 | 55B | York (North) |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1108 | 4w/e | 22/06/1968 | 55B | York (North) | w/e | 12/10/1968 | 52A | w/e | 11/10/1969 | 55B | York (North) |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1109 | on | 28/01/1967 | 50A | York (North) (New) | w/e | 12/10/1968 | 52A | w/e | 11/10/1969 | 55B | York (North) |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1969 | on | 22/10/1965 | 64B | Haymarket (New) | w/e | 12/10/1968 | 52A | w/e | 11/10/1969 | 64B | Haymarket |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1970 | on | 22/10/1965 | 64B | Haymarket (New) | w/e | 12/10/1968 | 52A | w/e | 11/10/1969 | 64B | Haymarket |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1971 | on | 30/10/1965 | 64B | Haymarket (New) | w/e | 12/10/1968 | 52A | w/e | 11/10/1969 | 64B | Haymarket |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1972 | on | 06/11/1965 | 64B | Haymarket (New) | w/e | 12/10/1968 | 52A | w/e | 11/10/1969 | 64B | Haymarket |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1973 | on | 10/11/1965 | 64B | Haymarket (New) | w/e | 12/10/1968 | 52A | w/e | 11/10/1969 | 64B | Haymarket |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6791 | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 12/10/1968 | 52A | w/e | 31/01/1970 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6793 | 4w/e | 25/05/1968 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 12/10/1968 | 52A | w/e | 26/10/1974 | TE | Thornaby |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6711 | on | 03/03/1961 | 30A | Stratford (New) | w/e | 19/10/1968 | 52A | w/e | 26/10/1968 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6792 | 4w/e | 25/05/1968 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 26/10/1968 | 52A | w/e | 26/10/1974 | TE | Thornaby |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6911 | on | 02/12/1963 | 87E | Landore (New) | w/e | 26/10/1968 | 52A | w/e | 31/01/1970 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1529 | w/e | 12/10/1968 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 09/11/1968 | 52A | w/e | 28/06/1969 | 40B | Immingham |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1539 | w/e | 10/06/1967 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 09/11/1968 | 52A | w/e | 11/10/1969 | 40B | Immingham |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1570 | w/e | 03/08/1968 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 09/11/1968 | 52A | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | 55B | York (North) |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1571 | w/e | 12/10/1968 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 09/11/1968 | 52A | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | 55B | York (North) |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1572 | w/e | 12/10/1968 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 09/11/1968 | 52A | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | 55B | York (North) |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1574 | w/e | 12/10/1968 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 09/11/1968 | 52A | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | 55B | York (North) |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6951 | w/e | 12/10/1968 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 16/11/1968 | 52A | w/e | 28/10/1972 | 55C | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6952 | w/e | 12/10/1968 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 16/11/1968 | 52A | w/e | 28/10/1972 | 55C | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2156 | w/e | 20/08/1960 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 28/12/1968 | 52A | on | 22/11/1975 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6787 | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 28/12/1968 | 52A | 2w/e | 11/01/1975 | TE | Thornaby |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2049 | 4w/e | 19/06/1965 | 52D | Tweedmouth | w/e | 11/01/1969 | 52A | w/e | 29/03/1969 | 50D | Goole |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1102 | 4w/e | 20/07/1968 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 25/01/1969 | 52A | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | YK | York (North) |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1101 | 4w/e | 20/07/1968 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 01/02/1969 | 52A | 2w/e | 11/10/1975 | HO | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6818 | w/e | 09/03/1968 | 30A | Stratford | w/e | 15/02/1969 | 52A | w/e | 12/08/1972 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | D8599 | 4w/e | 27/04/1968 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 08/03/1969 | 52A | w/e | 01/05/1971 | 64B | Haymarket |
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | D8600 | 4w/e | 27/04/1968 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 08/03/1969 | 52A | w/e | 01/05/1971 | 64B | Haymarket |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6785 | 4w/e | 20/05/1967 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 15/03/1969 | 52A | w/e | 26/07/1969 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | D164 | w/e | 16/12/1967 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 29/03/1969 | 52A | m/e | 11/1978 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1110 | on | 28/01/1967 | 50A | York (North) (New) | w/e | 29/03/1969 | 52A | w/e | 11/10/1969 | 55B | York (North) |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1111 | on | 25/02/1967 | 50A | York (North) (New) | w/e | 29/03/1969 | 52A | w/e | 11/10/1969 | 55B | York (North) |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1536 | w/e | 12/10/1968 | 55B | York (North) | w/e | 29/03/1969 | 52A | w/e | 11/10/1969 | 40B | Immingham |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1537 | w/e | 12/10/1968 | 55B | York (North) | w/e | 29/03/1969 | 52A | w/e | 26/07/1969 | 40B | Immingham |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6711 | w/e | 26/10/1968 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 05/04/1969 | 52A | w/e | 31/01/1970 | 55C | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6712 | w/e | 19/10/1968 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 05/04/1969 | 52A | w/e | 31/01/1970 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6780 | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 12/04/1969 | 52A | w/e | 26/07/1969 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1984 | w/e | 08/03/1969 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 17/05/1969 | 52A | w/e | 21/03/1970 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6779 | w/e | 15/08/1964 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 17/05/1969 | 52A | w/e | 26/07/1969 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6786 | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 19/07/1969 | 52A | w/e | 31/01/1970 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6832 | w/e | 05/04/1969 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 26/07/1969 | 52A | w/e | 31/01/1970 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6871 | w/e | 17/05/1969 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 26/07/1969 | 52A | w/e | 31/01/1970 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6874 | w/e | 12/04/1969 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 26/07/1969 | 52A | w/e | 31/01/1970 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6912 | w/e | 19/04/1969 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 26/07/1969 | 52A | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | TE | Thornaby |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6913 | w/e | 26/04/1969 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 26/07/1969 | 52A | w/e | 11/04/1970 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6935 | w/e | 26/04/1969 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 26/07/1969 | 52A | w/e | 31/01/1970 | 55C | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1995 | w/e | 25/11/1967 | 34G | Finsbury Park | w/e | 09/08/1969 | 52A | w/e | 04/11/1972 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1996 | w/e | 25/11/1967 | 34G | Finsbury Park | w/e | 09/08/1969 | 52A | w/e | 18/11/1972 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1997 | w/e | 25/11/1967 | 34G | Finsbury Park | w/e | 09/08/1969 | 52A | w/e | 02/12/1972 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1998 | w/e | 29/03/1969 | 34G | Finsbury Park | w/e | 09/08/1969 | 52A | 2w/e | 30/12/1972 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1999 | w/e | 05/04/1969 | 34G | Finsbury Park | w/e | 09/08/1969 | 52A | w/e | 04/08/1973 | TI | Tinsley |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2095 | w/e | 14/12/1968 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 30/08/1969 | 52A | w/e | 18/07/1970 | 51A | Darlington |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2170 | w/e | 23/11/1968 | 55H | Neville Hill | w/e | 30/08/1969 | 52A | on | 08/11/1981 | BC | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D239 | w/e | 12/10/1968 | 55C | Healey Mills | w/e | 11/10/1969 | 52A | w/e | 27/01/1973 | 55C | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D240 | w/e | 12/10/1968 | 55C | Healey Mills | w/e | 11/10/1969 | 52A | w/e | 14/03/1970 | 55C | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D270 | 4w/e | 26/02/1966 | 50A | York (North) | w/e | 11/10/1969 | 52A | w/e | 06/05/1972 | 55B | York (North) |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D273 | w/e | 12/10/1968 | 55C | Healey Mills | w/e | 11/10/1969 | 52A | w/e | 06/05/1972 | 55B | York (North) |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D345 | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 56B | Healey Mills | w/e | 11/10/1969 | 52A | w/e | 29/02/1976 | HM | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D346 | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 56B | Healey Mills | w/e | 22/11/1969 | 52A | w/e | 29/02/1976 | HM | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D347 | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | 56B | Healey Mills | w/e | 22/11/1969 | 52A | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 55C | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D353 | w/e | 17/05/1969 | 55B | York (North) | w/e | 22/11/1969 | 52A | m/e | 10/1977 | TE | Thornaby |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2064 | 4w/e | 24/02/1968 | 51A | Darlington | w/e | 13/12/1969 | 52A | on | 21/06/1981 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1573 | w/e | 11/10/1969 | 40B | Immingham | w/e | 10/01/1970 | 52A | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | 55B | York (North) |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6748 | w/e | 11/10/1969 | 55C | Healey Mills | w/e | 31/01/1970 | 52A | w/e | 09/03/1974 | IM | Immingham |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6757 | on | 05/10/1962 | 51L | Thornaby (New) | w/e | 31/01/1970 | 52A | w/e | 19/05/1973 | TE | Thornaby |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6758 | 4w/e | 27/01/1968 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 31/01/1970 | 52A | on | 04/10/1987 | TI | Tinsley |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6759 | on | 12/10/1962 | 51L | Thornaby (New) | w/e | 31/01/1970 | 52A | w/e | 06/11/1971 | 30A | Stratford |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6760 | on | 19/10/1962 | 51L | Thornaby (New) | w/e | 31/01/1970 | 52A | w/e | 12/08/1972 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6761 | on | 24/10/1962 | 51L | Thornaby (New) | w/e | 31/01/1970 | 52A | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6762 | on | 26/10/1962 | 51L | Thornaby (New) | w/e | 31/01/1970 | 52A | on | 13/03/1989 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6763 | on | 07/11/1962 | 51L | Thornaby (New) | w/e | 31/01/1970 | 52A | on | 31/01/1999 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6764 | on | 07/11/1962 | 51L | Thornaby (New) | w/e | 31/01/1970 | 52A | w/e | 28/10/1972 | 31B | March |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6765 | on | 14/11/1962 | 51L | Thornaby (New) | w/e | 31/01/1970 | 52A | on | 31/10/2007 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6766 | on | 16/11/1962 | 51L | Thornaby (New) | w/e | 31/01/1970 | 52A | on | 15/08/1997 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6768 | on | 23/11/1962 | 51L | Thornaby (New) | w/e | 31/01/1970 | 52A | w/e | 08/07/1972 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6772 | on | 04/09/1962 | 51L | Thornaby (New) | w/e | 31/01/1970 | 52A | w/e | 02/12/1972 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6820 | w/e | 16/11/1968 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 31/01/1970 | 52A | w/e | 10/10/1970 | 30A | Stratford |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6917 | 4w/e | 04/11/1967 | 56B | Healey Mills | w/e | 31/01/1970 | 52A | w/e | 01/05/1971 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6928 | 4w/e | 04/11/1967 | 56B | Healey Mills | w/e | 31/01/1970 | 52A | w/e | 09/02/1974 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3729 | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | 64H | Leith Central | w/e | 28/02/1970 | 52A | on | 31/01/1994 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D355 | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | 56B | Healey Mills | w/e | 14/03/1970 | 52A | w/e | 08/05/1971 | 55C | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6712 | w/e | 31/01/1970 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 14/03/1970 | 52A | w/e | 10/10/1970 | 30A | Stratford |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6756 | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 14/03/1970 | 52A | w/e | 08/05/1971 | 31B | March |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1103 | w/e | 12/10/1968 | 34G | Finsbury Park | w/e | 21/03/1970 | 52A | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | YK | York (North) |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1104 | w/e | 12/10/1968 | 34G | Finsbury Park | w/e | 21/03/1970 | 52A | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 34G | Finsbury Park |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1105 | w/e | 12/10/1968 | 34G | Finsbury Park | w/e | 21/03/1970 | 52A | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1106 | w/e | 12/10/1968 | 34G | Finsbury Park | w/e | 21/03/1970 | 52A | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | 40B | Immingham |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1107 | w/e | 12/10/1968 | 34G | Finsbury Park | w/e | 21/03/1970 | 52A | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | 40B | Immingham |
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | D3638 | w/e | 12/08/1967 | 36A | Doncaster | w/e | 21/03/1970 | 52A | on | 07/11/1970 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | D8601 | 4w/e | 24/02/1968 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 21/03/1970 | 52A | w/e | 12/06/1971 | 64B | Haymarket |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6767 | on | 21/11/1962 | 51L | Thornaby (New) | w/e | 11/04/1970 | 52A | w/e | 19/05/1973 | TE | Thornaby |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6770 | on | 17/08/1962 | 51L | Thornaby (New) | w/e | 11/04/1970 | 52A | w/e | 02/12/1972 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6771 | on | 22/08/1962 | 51L | Thornaby (New) | w/e | 11/04/1970 | 52A | on | 30/06/2004 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | D8019 | w/e | 11/10/1969 | 55B | York (North) | w/e | 18/04/1970 | 52A | w/e | 10/10/1970 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | D8602 | 4w/e | 24/02/1968 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 09/05/1970 | 52A | w/e | 01/05/1971 | 64B | Haymarket |
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | D8603 | 4w/e | 27/04/1968 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 09/05/1970 | 52A | w/e | 01/05/1971 | 64B | Haymarket |
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | D8604 | 4w/e | 24/02/1968 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 09/05/1970 | 52A | w/e | 12/06/1971 | 64B | Haymarket |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D352 | w/e | 09/05/1970 | 55B | York (North) | w/e | 30/05/1970 | 52A | m/e | 10/1977 | TE | Thornaby |
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | D8018 | 4w/e | 22/06/1968 | 55B | York (North) | w/e | 06/06/1970 | 52A | w/e | 10/10/1970 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | D8031 | w/e | 01/11/1969 | 55B | York (North) | w/e | 27/06/1970 | 52A | w/e | 10/10/1970 | 40B | Immingham |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | D139 | w/e | 16/09/1967 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | 52A | w/e | 28/10/1972 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | D148 | w/e | 28/10/1967 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | 52A | w/e | 28/10/1972 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | D153 | m/e | 31/12/1967 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | 52A | w/e | 28/10/1972 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | D160 | w/e | 06/01/1968 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | 52A | w/e | 28/10/1972 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | D190 | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | 52A | on | 22/02/1981 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | D192 | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | 52A | w/e | 12/08/1972 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3677 | on | 18/06/1958 | 51A | Darlington (New) | w/e | 18/07/1970 | 52A | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 64H | Leith Central |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | D170 | 2w/e | 11/07/1970 | 64B | Haymarket | w/e | 10/10/1970 | 52A | on | 19/06/1983 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D240 | w/e | 14/03/1970 | 55C | Healey Mills | w/e | 10/10/1970 | 52A | w/e | 06/05/1972 | 55B | York (North) |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D271 | 4w/e | 29/01/1966 | 50A | York (North) | w/e | 10/10/1970 | 52A | w/e | 06/05/1972 | 55B | York (North) |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6741 | w/e | 11/10/1969 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 10/10/1970 | 52A | w/e | 08/05/1971 | 31B | March |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6746 | w/e | 12/08/1967 | 31B | March | w/e | 10/10/1970 | 52A | m/e | 02/1978 | TE | Thornaby |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1106 | w/e | 10/10/1970 | 55B | York (North) | w/e | 24/10/1970 | 52A | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3195 | w/e | 10/10/1970 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 24/10/1970 | 52A | on | 03/08/1980 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6742 | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 31B | March | w/e | 24/10/1970 | 52A | 3w/e | 04/01/1976 | HM | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6745 | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 31B | March | w/e | 24/10/1970 | 52A | 3w/e | 04/01/1976 | HM | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6913 | w/e | 11/04/1970 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 24/10/1970 | 52A | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | D166 | 4w/e | 25/05/1968 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 07/11/1970 | 52A | w/e | 20/11/1971 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2102 | 4w/e | 20/07/1968 | 51A | Darlington | w/e | 09/01/1971 | 52A | on | 10/02/1976 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | D3648 | w/e | 19/08/1967 | 36A | Doncaster | w/e | 09/01/1971 | 52A | on | 24/01/1971 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D257 | w/e | 29/08/1970 | 55B | York (North) | w/e | 23/01/1971 | 52A | w/e | 19/05/1973 | YK | York (North) |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6804 | on | 26/04/1964 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 23/01/1971 | 52A | w/e | 12/01/1974 | TI | Tinsley |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6860 | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 23/01/1971 | 52A | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 30A | Stratford |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D350 | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | 56B | Healey Mills | w/e | 30/01/1971 | 52A | w/e | 15/01/1978 | HA | Haymarket |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6828 | w/e | 30/01/1971 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 20/02/1971 | 52A | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 30A | Stratford |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6829 | w/e | 30/01/1971 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 20/02/1971 | 52A | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 30A | Stratford |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6830 | w/e | 30/01/1971 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 20/02/1971 | 52A | w/e | 03/04/1971 | 30A | Stratford |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | D176 | w/e | 31/10/1970 | 64B | Haymarket | w/e | 20/03/1971 | 52A | on | 23/10/1983 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | D183 | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 08/05/1971 | 52A | on | 06/05/1984 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5019 | w/e | 11/10/1969 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 08/05/1971 | 52A | w/e | 16/10/1971 | 66A | Polmadie |
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5090 | w/e | 06/12/1969 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 08/05/1971 | 52A | w/e | 16/10/1971 | 66A | Polmadie |
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5096 | 4w/e | 17/06/1967 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 08/05/1971 | 52A | w/e | 16/10/1971 | 66A | Polmadie |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5534 | w/e | 23/05/1970 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 15/05/1971 | 52A | w/e | 29/05/1971 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5548 | w/e | 10/01/1970 | 40B | Immingham | w/e | 29/05/1971 | 52A | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | D174 | w/e | 10/10/1970 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 52A | on | 02/11/1980 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | D179 | w/e | 10/10/1970 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 52A | on | 01/11/1981 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D256 | w/e | 29/08/1970 | 55B | York (North) | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 52A | w/e | 12/08/1972 | 55C | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D258 | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 50A | York (North) | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 52A | w/e | 06/05/1972 | 55B | York (North) |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1705 | w/e | 08/05/1971 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 52A | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 34G | Finsbury Park |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3934 | 5w/e | 30/09/1967 | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 52A | 4w/e | 30/10/1971 | 91E | To Eastern Region |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5527 | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 31B | March | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 52A | w/e | 12/08/1972 | 40B | Immingham |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5529 | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 31B | March | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 52A | w/e | 06/11/1971 | 30A | Stratford |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5531 | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 31B | March | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 52A | w/e | 12/08/1972 | 40B | Immingham |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5532 | w/e | 11/10/1969 | 31B | March | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 52A | w/e | 06/11/1971 | 30A | Stratford |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5533 | w/e | 11/10/1969 | 31B | March | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 52A | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 40B | Immingham |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5534 | w/e | 29/05/1971 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 52A | w/e | 06/05/1972 | 40B | Immingham |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5537 | w/e | 24/10/1970 | 31B | March | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 52A | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 40B | Immingham |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5696 | w/e | 23/05/1970 | 31B | March | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 52A | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6806 | on | 26/04/1964 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 52A | w/e | 09/03/1974 | TI | Tinsley |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6807 | on | 26/04/1964 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 52A | w/e | 09/03/1974 | TI | Tinsley |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3911 | on | 09/11/1960 | 66A | Polmadie (New) | 2w/e | 30/10/1971 | 52A | w/e | 26/08/1972 | 40B | Immingham |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3919 | 4w/e | 11/03/1961 | 66A | Polmadie | 2w/e | 30/10/1971 | 52A | w/e | 26/08/1972 | 40B | Immingham |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5168 | w/e | 07/11/1970 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 06/11/1971 | 52A | w/e | 06/05/1972 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5171 | w/e | 03/04/1971 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 06/11/1971 | 52A | w/e | 02/09/1972 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | D193 | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 20/11/1971 | 52A | w/e | 12/08/1972 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1936 | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 52A | w/e | 08/07/1972 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7586 | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 52A | w/e | 04/03/1972 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7593 | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 52A | 2w/e | 08/04/1972 | D16 | Nottingham Division |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7596 | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 52A | 2w/e | 08/04/1972 | D16 | Nottingham Division |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5691 | w/e | 05/03/1966 | 40B | Immingham | w/e | 04/03/1972 | 52A | 3w/e | 02/05/1976 | FP | Finsbury Park |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5169 | 4w/e | 30/12/1967 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | 2w/e | 08/04/1972 | 52A | w/e | 05/08/1972 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5170 | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | 2w/e | 08/04/1972 | 52A | w/e | 07/10/1972 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | D166 | w/e | 20/11/1971 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 06/05/1972 | 52A | on | 30/01/1983 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | D167 | 4w/e | 25/05/1968 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 06/05/1972 | 52A | on | 01/11/1981 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | D168 | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 06/05/1972 | 52A | on | 24/04/1983 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1524 | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 55B | York (North) | w/e | 06/05/1972 | 52A | w/e | 03/06/1972 | 40B | Immingham |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1767 | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | 40B | Immingham | w/e | 06/05/1972 | 52A | w/e | 24/06/1972 | 40B | Immingham |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1768 | w/e | 10/10/1970 | 40B | Immingham | w/e | 06/05/1972 | 52A | w/e | 10/06/1972 | 40B | Immingham |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1775 | w/e | 01/11/1969 | 40B | Immingham | w/e | 06/05/1972 | 52A | w/e | 19/08/1972 | 30A | Stratford |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1970 | w/e | 11/10/1969 | 64B | Haymarket | w/e | 06/05/1972 | 52A | w/e | 11/05/1974 | ED | Eastfield |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1986 | w/e | 21/03/1970 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 06/05/1972 | 52A | w/e | 02/09/1972 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1987 | w/e | 21/03/1970 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 06/05/1972 | 52A | w/e | 04/11/1972 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1988 | w/e | 21/03/1970 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 06/05/1972 | 52A | w/e | 16/09/1972 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2061 | 4w/e | 24/02/1968 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 06/05/1972 | 52A | on | 12/10/1980 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5856 | w/e | 17/05/1969 | 40B | Immingham | w/e | 06/05/1972 | 52A | w/e | 13/10/1973 | HO | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6741 | w/e | 08/05/1971 | 31B | March | w/e | 06/05/1972 | 52A | w/e | 19/05/1973 | TE | Thornaby |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1577 | w/e | 11/10/1969 | 40B | Immingham | w/e | 03/06/1972 | 52A | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | HO | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1578 | w/e | 11/10/1969 | 40B | Immingham | w/e | 10/06/1972 | 52A | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | HO | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1581 | w/e | 11/10/1969 | 40B | Immingham | w/e | 24/06/1972 | 52A | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | HO | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3182 | 5w/e | 01/04/1972 | 65A | Eastfield | w/e | 22/07/1972 | 52A | on | 15/08/1982 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3214 | 5w/e | 01/04/1972 | 67C | Ayr | w/e | 22/07/1972 | 52A | w/e | 26/08/1972 | 36A | Doncaster |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3215 | 5w/e | 30/12/1967 | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | w/e | 22/07/1972 | 52A | on | 17/07/1983 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3216 | 5w/e | 30/12/1967 | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | w/e | 22/07/1972 | 52A | on | 31/03/1984 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5807 | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 05/08/1972 | 52A | w/e | 12/08/1972 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5172 | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 12/08/1972 | 52A | w/e | 07/10/1972 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5173 | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 12/08/1972 | 52A | w/e | 07/10/1972 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5174 | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 12/08/1972 | 52A | w/e | 02/09/1972 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6731 | w/e | 31/01/1970 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 12/08/1972 | 52A | w/e | 07/10/1972 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1580 | w/e | 29/05/1971 | 30A | Stratford | w/e | 19/08/1972 | 52A | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | HO | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1536 | w/e | 11/10/1969 | 40B | Immingham | w/e | 02/09/1972 | 52A | on | 25/01/1989 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5811 | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 02/09/1972 | 52A | w/e | 07/10/1972 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5821 | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 02/09/1972 | 52A | on | 04/10/1987 | SF | Stratford |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1520 | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 16/09/1972 | 52A | on | 06/09/1981 | YK | York (North) |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1100 | w/e | 24/10/1970 | 55B | York (North) | w/e | 07/10/1972 | 52A | w/e | 08/03/1975 | HO | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1542 | w/e | 09/05/1970 | 55B | York (North) | w/e | 07/10/1972 | 52A | w/e | 29/02/1976 | YK | York (North) |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1545 | w/e | 07/11/1970 | 40B | Immingham | w/e | 07/10/1972 | 52A | w/e | 29/02/1976 | YK | York (North) |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6708 | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | 55C | Healey Mills | w/e | 07/10/1972 | 52A | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | TE | Thornaby |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6715 | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | 55C | Healey Mills | w/e | 07/10/1972 | 52A | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | MR | March |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6716 | w/e | 29/01/1972 | 55C | Healey Mills | w/e | 07/10/1972 | 52A | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | MR | March |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6784 | w/e | 11/10/1969 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 07/10/1972 | 52A | 2w/e | 11/01/1975 | TE | Thornaby |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6785 | 2w/e | 01/01/1972 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 07/10/1972 | 52A | w/e | 09/03/1974 | TE | Thornaby |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6794 | w/e | 11/04/1970 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 07/10/1972 | 52A | w/e | 11/11/1972 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1706 | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 40B | Immingham | w/e | 28/10/1972 | 52A | w/e | 09/12/1972 | 30A | Stratford |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1988 | w/e | 16/09/1972 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 28/10/1972 | 52A | w/e | 08/03/1975 | KY | Knottingley |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6777 | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 31B | March | w/e | 28/10/1972 | 52A | w/e | 02/12/1972 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6935 | w/e | 31/01/1970 | 55C | Healey Mills | w/e | 28/10/1972 | 52A | 2w/e | 10/08/1974 | LE | Landore |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6938 | w/e | 10/07/1971 | 55C | Healey Mills | w/e | 28/10/1972 | 52A | w/e | 11/05/1974 | TE | Thornaby |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1104 | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 34G | Finsbury Park | w/e | 04/11/1972 | 52A | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | YK | York (North) |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1105 | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 04/11/1972 | 52A | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | YK | York (North) |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1534 | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | 40B | Immingham | w/e | 04/11/1972 | 52A | m/e | 05/1977 | HO | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D351 | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | 56B | Healey Mills | w/e | 11/11/1972 | 52A | w/e | 15/01/1978 | HA | Haymarket |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D354 | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | 56B | Healey Mills | w/e | 11/11/1972 | 52A | on | 10/01/1982 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6794 | w/e | 07/10/1972 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 11/11/1972 | 52A | w/e | 06/01/1973 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6799 | 4w/e | 09/09/1967 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 11/11/1972 | 52A | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | MR | March |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1541 | w/e | 12/08/1972 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 18/11/1972 | 52A | on | 26/01/1987 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1550 | w/e | 29/05/1971 | 30A | Stratford | w/e | 02/12/1972 | 52A | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | HA | Haymarket |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6709 | w/e | 06/05/1972 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 02/12/1972 | 52A | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | TE | Thornaby |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6710 | w/e | 06/05/1972 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 02/12/1972 | 52A | w/e | 11/05/1974 | TE | Thornaby |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6732 | w/e | 08/05/1971 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 02/12/1972 | 52A | w/e | 09/03/1974 | TE | Thornaby |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6768 | w/e | 08/07/1972 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 02/12/1972 | 52A | on | 31/05/2005 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6776 | on | 08/10/1962 | 51L | Thornaby (New) | w/e | 02/12/1972 | 52A | on | 05/07/1981 | GD | Gateshead |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1527 | w/e | 25/11/1967 | 30A | Stratford | w/e | 09/12/1972 | 52A | on | 15/05/1988 | CD | Crewe Diesel |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1525 | w/e | 14/02/1970 | 30A | Stratford | 2w/e | 30/12/1972 | 52A | on | 15/05/1988 | CD | Crewe Diesel |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1518 | w/e | 12/08/1972 | 34G | Finsbury Park | w/e | 06/01/1973 | 52A | on | 11/02/1987 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1519 | w/e | 07/10/1972 | 34G | Finsbury Park | w/e | 06/01/1973 | 52A | on | 05/06/1987 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | D187 | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 27/01/1973 | 52A | on | 29/11/1981 | GD | Gateshead |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | D191 | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 27/01/1973 | 52A | on | 29/11/1981 | GD | Gateshead |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D349 | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | 56B | Healey Mills | 2w/e | 10/03/1973 | 52A | on | 23/08/1981 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D355 | w/e | 08/05/1971 | 55C | Healey Mills | 2w/e | 10/03/1973 | 52A | w/e | 19/05/1973 | HM | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | D181 | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 19/05/1973 | GD | on | 08/04/1984 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | D192 | w/e | 12/08/1972 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 19/05/1973 | GD | on | 31/10/1982 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | D193 | w/e | 12/08/1972 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 19/05/1973 | GD | on | 31/10/1982 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1998 | 2w/e | 30/12/1972 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 19/05/1973 | GD | w/e | 08/03/1975 | HO | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1965 | w/e | 10/02/1973 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 04/08/1973 | GD | w/e | 09/03/1974 | IM | Immingham |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1512 | w/e | 28/03/1970 | 34G | Finsbury Park | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | GD | 2w/e | 11/01/1975 | FP | Finsbury Park |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1513 | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 34G | Finsbury Park | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | GD | 2w/e | 11/01/1975 | FP | Finsbury Park |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1514 | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 34G | Finsbury Park | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | GD | 2w/e | 11/01/1975 | FP | Finsbury Park |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1515 | w/e | 04/11/1972 | 34G | Finsbury Park | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | GD | on | 07/03/1986 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1516 | w/e | 19/05/1973 | HO | Holbeck (MR) | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | GD | on | 15/05/1988 | IM | Immingham |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1517 | w/e | 19/05/1973 | HO | Holbeck (MR) | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | GD | on | 15/05/1988 | IM | Immingham |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1521 | w/e | 02/12/1972 | 30A | Stratford | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | GD | 2w/e | 30/11/1974 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1522 | w/e | 24/06/1972 | 30A | Stratford | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | GD | w/e | 09/11/1974 | CD | Crewe Diesel |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1523 | w/e | 24/06/1972 | 30A | Stratford | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | GD | 3w/e | 10/05/1975 | SF | Stratford |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1524 | w/e | 24/06/1972 | 30A | Stratford | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | GD | 3w/e | 10/05/1975 | SF | Stratford |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1526 | w/e | 14/02/1970 | 30A | Stratford | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | GD | 3w/e | 10/05/1975 | SF | Stratford |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1528 | w/e | 25/11/1967 | 30A | Stratford | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | GD | 2w/e | 30/11/1974 | SF | Stratford |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1963 | w/e | 27/01/1973 | 40B | Immingham | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | GD | w/e | 09/03/1974 | IM | Immingham |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6730 | w/e | 28/10/1972 | 55C | Healey Mills | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | GD | on | 01/12/1999 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6731 | w/e | 07/10/1972 | 51L | Thornaby | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | GD | w/e | 08/03/1975 | HM | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5820 | w/e | 19/05/1973 | HO | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 13/10/1973 | GD | 3w/e | 02/05/1976 | IM | Immingham |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37242 | w/e | 12/01/1974 | TI | Tinsley | w/e | 09/02/1974 | GD | w/e | 11/05/1974 | TE | Thornaby |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5590 | w/e | 08/10/1966 | 34G | Finsbury Park | w/e | 09/03/1974 | GD | w/e | 08/03/1975 | FP | Finsbury Park |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31173 | w/e | 19/05/1973 | FP | Finsbury Park | w/e | 09/03/1974 | GD | w/e | 08/03/1975 | FP | Finsbury Park |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5595 | w/e | 17/07/1965 | 34G | Finsbury Park | w/e | 09/03/1974 | GD | m/e | 05/1977 | HO | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31178 | w/e | 24/06/1972 | 34G | Finsbury Park | w/e | 09/03/1974 | GD | m/e | 05/1977 | HO | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37035 | w/e | 07/10/1972 | 31B | March | w/e | 09/03/1974 | GD | 2w/e | 01/03/1975 | MR | March |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37053 | w/e | 08/03/1969 | 31B | March | w/e | 09/03/1974 | GD | m/e | 02/1978 | TE | Thornaby |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37054 | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 31B | March | w/e | 09/03/1974 | GD | w/e | 01/02/1975 | MR | March |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37079 | w/e | 26/07/1969 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 09/03/1974 | GD | w/e | 18/10/1975 | TE | Thornaby |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37082 | w/e | 16/02/1974 | TE | Thornaby | w/e | 09/03/1974 | GD | w/e | 18/01/1975 | TE | Thornaby |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37100 | on | 26/04/1964 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 09/03/1974 | GD | w/e | 18/10/1975 | TE | Thornaby |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 40176 | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | Manchester Division | w/e | 11/05/1974 | GD | w/e | 29/02/1976 | HM | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47411 | w/e | 01/11/1969 | 34G | Finsbury Park | w/e | 11/05/1974 | GD | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | FP | Finsbury Park |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47412 | w/e | 13/12/1969 | 34G | Finsbury Park | w/e | 11/05/1974 | GD | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | FP | Finsbury Park |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31278 | w/e | 03/11/1973 | TI | Tinsley | w/e | 11/05/1974 | GD | 2w/e | 11/01/1975 | TE | Thornaby |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31287 | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 11/05/1974 | GD | 3w/e | 10/05/1975 | TE | Thornaby |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31290 | w/e | 03/11/1973 | TI | Tinsley | w/e | 11/05/1974 | GD | 2w/e | 11/01/1975 | TE | Thornaby |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08004 | w/e | 25/01/1969 | 8J | Allerton | w/e | 03/08/1974 | GD | 3w/e | 28/12/1974 | BG | Hull Botanic Gardens |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37048 | w/e | 09/03/1974 | IM | Immingham | w/e | 10/08/1974 | GD | m/e | 02/1978 | TE | Thornaby |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 40147 | w/e | 03/02/1973 | 55C | Healey Mills | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | GD | on | 07/09/1980 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47519 | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | YK | York (North) | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | GD | 2w/e | 11/10/1975 | HO | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47520 | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | YK | York (North) | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | GD | w/e | 08/03/1975 | YK | York (North) |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47521 | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | YK | York (North) | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | GD | w/e | 08/03/1975 | YK | York (North) |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47522 | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | YK | York (North) | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | GD | w/e | 08/03/1975 | YK | York (North) |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47542 | w/e | 24/11/1973 | CF | Cardiff Canton | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | GD | 2w/e | 11/01/1975 | HO | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37238 | w/e | 11/05/1974 | TE | Thornaby | w/e | 26/10/1974 | GD | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37250 | w/e | 09/03/1974 | TE | Thornaby | w/e | 26/10/1974 | GD | on | 04/09/1988 | ED | Eastfield |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47524 | w/e | 10/10/1970 | 55B | York (North) | 2w/e | 09/11/1974 | GD | w/e | 08/03/1975 | YK | York (North) |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47525 | w/e | 08/05/1971 | 55B | York (North) | 2w/e | 30/11/1974 | GD | w/e | 08/03/1975 | YK | York (North) |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47025 | w/e | 16/11/1974 | CF | Cardiff Canton | w/e | 07/12/1974 | GD | 2w/e | 11/01/1975 | HO | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47133 | 2w/e | 02/06/1973 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 07/12/1974 | GD | 2w/e | 11/01/1975 | HO | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47259 | w/e | 10/02/1973 | D02 | Birmingham Division | w/e | 07/12/1974 | GD | 2w/e | 11/01/1975 | HO | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 40050 | w/e | 15/06/1974 | YK | York (North) | 2w/e | 11/01/1975 | GD | on | 08/08/1983 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47528 | w/e | 08/05/1971 | 55B | York (North) | 2w/e | 11/01/1975 | GD | w/e | 08/03/1975 | YK | York (North) |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47051 | w/e | 12/01/1974 | HO | Holbeck (MR) | 2w/e | 11/01/1975 | GD | w/e | 28/02/1976 | CD | Crewe Diesel |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47052 | w/e | 12/10/1974 | HO | Holbeck (MR) | 2w/e | 11/01/1975 | GD | w/e | 08/03/1975 | TE | Thornaby |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47255 | 2w/e | 07/07/1973 | TI | Tinsley | 2w/e | 11/01/1975 | GD | w/e | 08/03/1975 | HO | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37080 | w/e | 26/07/1969 | 51L | Thornaby | 2w/e | 11/01/1975 | GD | w/e | 18/10/1975 | TE | Thornaby |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 40155 | w/e | 19/05/1973 | HM | Healey Mills | w/e | 18/01/1975 | GD | on | 22/01/1985 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37028 | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 31B | March | w/e | 01/02/1975 | GD | m/e | 02/1978 | HM | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37083 | w/e | 07/10/1972 | 31B | March | 2w/e | 01/03/1975 | GD | on | 14/07/2000 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 40053 | w/e | 27/02/1960 | 50A | York (North) | w/e | 08/03/1975 | GD | on | 18/06/1976 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 40054 | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 50A | York (North) | w/e | 08/03/1975 | GD | m/e | 05/1977 | YK | York (North) |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 40056 | w/e | 15/06/1974 | YK | York (North) | w/e | 08/03/1975 | GD | m/e | 05/1977 | YK | York (North) |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 40057 | w/e | 19/05/1973 | YK | York (North) | w/e | 08/03/1975 | GD | m/e | 05/1977 | YK | York (North) |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 40058 | w/e | 06/05/1972 | 55B | York (North) | w/e | 08/03/1975 | GD | m/e | 07/1977 | YK | York (North) |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 40059 | w/e | 03/02/1973 | 55B | York (North) | w/e | 08/03/1975 | GD | w/e | 29/02/1976 | HM | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 40067 | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | YK | York (North) | w/e | 08/03/1975 | GD | m/e | 07/1977 | YK | York (North) |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 40068 | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | YK | York (North) | w/e | 08/03/1975 | GD | m/e | 07/1977 | YK | York (North) |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 40069 | w/e | 19/05/1973 | YK | York (North) | w/e | 08/03/1975 | GD | m/e | 07/1977 | YK | York (North) |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 40070 | w/e | 03/02/1973 | 55B | York (North) | w/e | 08/03/1975 | GD | w/e | 29/02/1976 | HM | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37119 | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 08/03/1975 | GD | 2w/e | 11/10/1975 | TI | Tinsley |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37099 | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | TI | Tinsley | w/e | 08/03/1975 | GD | on | 06/09/1981 | ED | Eastfield |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37101 | w/e | 12/01/1974 | TI | Tinsley | w/e | 08/03/1975 | GD | 2w/e | 11/10/1975 | MR | March |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37102 | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | TI | Tinsley | w/e | 08/03/1975 | GD | 2w/e | 11/10/1975 | MR | March |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37106 | w/e | 09/03/1974 | TI | Tinsley | w/e | 08/03/1975 | GD | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37249 | 4w/e | 09/09/1967 | 56B | Healey Mills | w/e | 08/03/1975 | GD | w/e | 18/10/1975 | TE | Thornaby |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 40052 | 2w/e | 11/01/1975 | HM | Healey Mills | 3w/e | 10/05/1975 | GD | m/e | 05/1977 | YK | York (North) |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47050 | 2w/e | 11/01/1975 | TE | Thornaby | 3w/e | 10/05/1975 | GD | w/e | 28/02/1976 | CD | Crewe Diesel |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47052 | w/e | 08/03/1975 | TE | Thornaby | 3w/e | 10/05/1975 | GD | 3w/e | 12/07/1975 | TE | Thornaby |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37082 | w/e | 18/01/1975 | TE | Thornaby | 3w/e | 10/05/1975 | GD | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 03107 | w/e | 03/03/1962 | 51L | Thornaby | 2w/e | 31/05/1975 | GD | on | 09/08/1981 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08274 | on | 18/04/1957 | 62C | Dunfermline Upper (New) | 3w/e | 12/07/1975 | GD | 5w/e | 26/07/1975 | 91E | To Eastern Region |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08325 | 4w/e | 21/12/1957 | 65E | Kipps | 3w/e | 12/07/1975 | GD | 5w/e | 26/07/1975 | 91E | To Eastern Region |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08054 | w/e | 29/12/1973 | SF | Stratford | w/e | 06/09/1975 | GD | on | 16/02/1980 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08087 | w/e | 20/05/1972 | 30A | Stratford | w/e | 06/09/1975 | GD | on | 16/11/1979 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08081 | 3w/e | 12/07/1975 | SF | Stratford | w/e | 13/09/1975 | GD | on | 06/04/1980 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08044 | 2w/e | 11/01/1975 | HI | Hitchin (GNR) | w/e | 20/09/1975 | GD | on | 04/01/1978 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 40047 | 3w/e | 10/05/1975 | YK | York (North) | 2w/e | 11/10/1975 | GD | on | 13/11/1984 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 40048 | w/e | 01/05/1971 | 55C | Healey Mills | 2w/e | 11/10/1975 | GD | w/e | 01/02/1976 | HA | Haymarket |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 40071 | w/e | 03/02/1973 | 55B | York (North) | 2w/e | 11/10/1975 | GD | on | 07/09/1980 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 40074 | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 50A | York (North) | 2w/e | 11/10/1975 | GD | on | 09/03/1984 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 40077 | w/e | 22/11/1969 | 55B | York (North) | 2w/e | 11/10/1975 | GD | on | 17/06/1983 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08001 | w/e | 01/07/1972 | 40B | Immingham | w/e | 18/10/1975 | GD | on | 30/06/1978 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37195 | w/e | 31/01/1970 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 18/10/1975 | GD | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37199 | 3w/e | 10/05/1975 | TE | Thornaby | w/e | 18/10/1975 | GD | on | 01/10/2000 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37216 | 2w/e | 10/03/1973 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 18/10/1975 | GD | on | 28/02/2007 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37242 | w/e | 11/05/1974 | TE | Thornaby | w/e | 18/10/1975 | GD | on | 31/01/2006 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08888 | w/e | 20/09/1975 | TI | Tinsley | w/e | 01/11/1975 | GD | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08217 | 4w/e | 16/03/1963 | 66C | Hamilton (West) | w/e | 16/11/1975 | GD | on | 25/04/1982 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08671 | w/e | 20/05/1972 | 30A | Stratford | w/e | 13/12/1975 | GD | on | 07/11/1988 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08872 | w/e | 22/02/1969 | 34G | Finsbury Park | 3w/e | 04/01/1976 | GD | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37073 | w/e | 21/07/1973 | MC | March | 3w/e | 04/01/1976 | GD | on | 31/03/2003 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37078 | w/e | 27/10/1973 | MR | March | 3w/e | 04/01/1976 | GD | on | 26/07/1981 | TE | Thornaby |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 03069 | 4w/e | 27/03/1965 | 51A | Darlington | 2w/e | 25/01/1976 | GD | on | 27/11/1983 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 03079 | w/e | 23/01/1960 | 51A | Darlington | 2w/e | 22/02/1976 | GD | on | 03/06/1996 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 40085 | w/e | 06/05/1972 | 55B | York (North) | w/e | 29/02/1976 | GD | on | 30/03/1984 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 40086 | w/e | 06/05/1972 | 55B | York (North) | w/e | 29/02/1976 | GD | on | 23/01/1985 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47415 | 2w/e | 11/01/1975 | FP | Finsbury Park | 3w/e | 02/05/1976 | GD | on | 30/04/1987 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47430 | w/e | 29/02/1976 | YK | York (North) | 3w/e | 02/05/1976 | GD | on | 21/02/1992 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47431 | w/e | 29/02/1976 | YK | York (North) | 3w/e | 02/05/1976 | GD | m/e | 10/1977 | SF | Stratford |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31418 | w/e | 11/10/1975 | FP | Finsbury Park | 3w/e | 02/05/1976 | GD | on | 06/10/1995 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37057 | 3w/e | 10/05/1975 | MR | March | 3w/e | 02/05/1976 | GD | m/e | 02/1978 | TE | Thornaby |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37059 | 3w/e | 10/05/1975 | MR | March | 3w/e | 02/05/1976 | GD | on | 04/10/1987 | TI | Tinsley |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 46047 | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | CF | Cardiff Canton | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | GD | on | 02/09/1984 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 46048 | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | CF | Cardiff Canton | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | GD | on | 13/09/1981 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 46049 | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | CF | Cardiff Canton | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | GD | on | 12/12/1982 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 46051 | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | CF | Cardiff Canton | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | GD | on | 04/12/1983 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 46052 | w/e | 11/10/1975 | CF | Cardiff Canton | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | GD | on | 30/09/1984 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 03111 | on | 16/06/1976 | Withdrawn | on | 18/11/1976 (R) | GD | on | 27/07/1980 | Withdrawn | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47410 | w/e | 01/11/1969 | 34G | Finsbury Park | m/e | 05/1977 | GD | m/e | 07/1977 | FP | Finsbury Park |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47411 | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | FP | Finsbury Park | m/e | 05/1977 | GD | m/e | 07/1977 | FP | Finsbury Park |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47412 | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | FP | Finsbury Park | m/e | 05/1977 | GD | on | 12/05/1987 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47413 | 2w/e | 11/01/1975 | FP | Finsbury Park | m/e | 05/1977 | GD | on | 15/05/1988 | IM | Immingham |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08544 | w/e | 04/11/1972 | 34G | Finsbury Park | m/e | 05/1977 | GD | on | 17/07/1992 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31298 | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 41A | Tinsley | m/e | 05/1977 | GD | m/e | 07/1977 | TE | Thornaby |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 40057 | m/e | 05/1977 | YK | York (North) | m/e | 10/1977 | GD | on | 23/07/1984 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47518 | 2w/e | 11/10/1975 | HO | Holbeck (MR) | m/e | 10/1977 | GD | on | 04/10/1987 | CD | Crewe Diesel |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47519 | 2w/e | 11/10/1975 | HO | Holbeck (MR) | m/e | 10/1977 | GD | on | 15/05/1988 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47520 | 3w/e | 02/05/1976 | HO | Holbeck (MR) | m/e | 10/1977 | GD | on | 25/08/1998 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47521 | 3w/e | 02/05/1976 | HO | Holbeck (MR) | m/e | 10/1977 | GD | on | 21/04/1995 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47522 | 3w/e | 02/05/1976 | HO | Holbeck (MR) | m/e | 10/1977 | GD | on | 15/05/1988 | SF | Stratford |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47411 | m/e | 07/1977 | FP | Finsbury Park | m/e | 10/1977 | GD | on | 15/05/1988 | IM | Immingham |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37032 | w/e | 09/03/1974 | TE | Thornaby | m/e | 10/1977 | GD | on | 04/03/1994 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37055 | m/e | 07/1977 | MR | March | m/e | 10/1977 | GD | 4w/e | 29/01/1978 | IM | Immingham |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37056 | m/e | 07/1977 | MR | March | m/e | 10/1977 | GD | on | 01/11/2000 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08053 | m/e | 03/1977 | 98S | m/e | 12/1977 | GD | on | 01/03/1981 | Withdrawn | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 40152 | m/e | 10/1977 | TE | Thornaby | 4w/e | 29/01/1978 | GD | on | 21/01/1985 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 40153 | m/e | 10/1977 | TE | Thornaby | 4w/e | 29/01/1978 | GD | on | 12/09/1983 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47410 | m/e | 07/1977 | FP | Finsbury Park | 4w/e | 29/01/1978 | GD | on | 05/06/1987 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31184 | w/e | 08/03/1975 | FP | Finsbury Park | m/e | 02/1978 | GD | on | 05/06/1988 | TE | Thornaby |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31186 | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 34G | Finsbury Park | m/e | 02/1978 | GD | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31187 | on | 28/04/1960 | 34G | Finsbury Park (New) | m/e | 02/1978 | GD | on | 03/03/2000 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 31237 | w/e | 23/05/1976 | FP | Finsbury Park | m/e | 02/1978 | GD | on | 16/06/2000 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 40036 | 3w/e | 08/05/1976 | KD | Carlisle Kingmoor | on | 05/03/1978 | GD | on | 31/01/1982 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47045 | w/e | 02/05/1976 | ED | Eastfield | on | 21/12/1980 | GD | on | 04/10/1987 | IS | Inverness |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 37076 | w/e | 02/12/1972 | 52A | Gateshead | on | 05/07/1981 | GD | on | 26/07/1981 | TE | Thornaby |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 46001 | on | 14/12/1980 | Withdrawn | on | 13/09/1981 (R) | GD | |||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47421 | on | 06/09/1981 | YK | York (North) | m/e | 10/1981 | GD | on | 15/05/1988 | CD | Crewe Diesel |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47446 | 2w/e | 07/10/1972 | D05 | Stoke Division | on | 04/10/1981 | GD | on | 24/02/1992 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47473 | w/e | 21/09/1974 | BS | Bescot | on | 04/10/1981 | GD | on | 04/10/1987 | CD | Crewe Diesel |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47536 | w/e | 10/08/1974 | BS | Bescot | on | 04/10/1981 | GD | on | 04/10/1987 | CD | Crewe Diesel |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47213 | w/e | 10/01/1970 | 40B | Immingham | on | 04/10/1981 | GD | on | 04/10/1987 | TI | Tinsley |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47215 | w/e | 06/12/1969 | 40B | Immingham | on | 04/10/1981 | GD | on | 04/10/1987 | TI | Tinsley |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47217 | w/e | 11/10/1969 | 40B | Immingham | on | 04/10/1981 | GD | on | 30/06/2005 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47557 | on | 06/09/1981 | TO | Toton | on | 01/11/1981 | GD | on | 04/10/1987 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47552 | on | 06/09/1981 | SF | Stratford | on | 01/11/1981 | GD | on | 15/05/1988 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 47295 | m/e | 10/1977 | BS | Bescot | on | 01/11/1981 | GD | on | 04/10/1987 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 46006 | on | 14/12/1980 | Withdrawn | on | 22/11/1981 (R) | GD | on | 31/01/1982 | Withdrawn | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 46007 | on | 14/12/1980 | Withdrawn | on | 22/11/1981 (R) | GD | on | 07/02/1982 | Withdrawn | ||
Diesel | 56 | Co-Co | 56075 | on | 02/08/1981 | TI | Tinsley | on | 22/11/1981 | GD | on | 05/06/1988 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 56 | Co-Co | 56076 | on | 22/11/1981 | GD | on | 09/2008 | Withdrawn | |||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 46010 | on | 14/12/1980 | Withdrawn | on | 29/11/1981 (R) | GD | on | 04/11/1984 | Withdrawn | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 46017 | on | 14/12/1980 | Withdrawn | on | 29/11/1981 (R) | GD | on | 22/04/1984 | Withdrawn | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 46018 | on | 14/12/1980 | Withdrawn | on | 29/11/1981 (R) | GD | on | 18/12/1983 | Withdrawn | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 46021 | on | 14/12/1980 | Withdrawn | on | 29/11/1981 (R) | GD | on | 16/01/1983 | Withdrawn | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 46022 | on | 14/12/1980 | Withdrawn | on | 29/11/1981 (R) | GD | on | 28/03/1982 | Withdrawn | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 46025 | on | 14/12/1980 | Withdrawn | on | 29/11/1981 (R) | GD | on | 25/11/1984 | Withdrawn | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 46038 | on | 03/08/1962 | 52A | Gateshead (New) | on | 29/11/1981 | GD | on | 28/03/1982 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 46050 | w/e | 27/01/1973 | 52A | Gateshead | on | 29/11/1981 | GD | on | 26/10/1982 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 46054 | w/e | 27/01/1973 | 52A | Gateshead | on | 29/11/1981 | GD | on | 10/01/1982 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 56 | Co-Co | 56131 | on | 29/04/1984 (New) | GD | on | 04/10/1987 | TO | Toton | ||||
Diesel | 56 | Co-Co | 56132 | on | 10/06/1984 (New) | GD | on | 04/10/1987 | TO | Toton | ||||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | 97410 | on | 01/07/1987 | Withdrawn | m/e | 09/1987 (R) | GD | on | 15/05/1988 | TI | Tinsley | |
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | 97411 | on | 01/07/1987 | Withdrawn | m/e | 09/1987 (R) | GD | on | 15/05/1988 | TI | Tinsley | |
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | 97412 | on | 01/07/1987 | Withdrawn | m/e | 09/1987 (R) | GD | on | 15/05/1988 | TI | Tinsley | |
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | 97409 | on | 01/07/1987 | Withdrawn | m/e | 09/1987 (R) | GD | on | 15/05/1988 | TI | Tinsley | |
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | 97413 | on | 26/07/1987 | Withdrawn | m/e | 09/1987 (R) | GD | on | 15/05/1988 | TI | Tinsley | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08421 | m/e | 31/10/1979 | ML | Motherwell | on | 04/10/1987 | GD | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08507 | on | 26/04/1964 | 41A | Tinsley | on | 04/10/1987 | GD | on | 13/08/1993 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08515 | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | on | 04/10/1987 | GD | on | 20/01/1992 | Withdrawn |