Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 598 Today
» 4601 Yesterday
» 598 Week
» 54052 Month
» 400476 Year
» 3427329 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
76049 |
on |
01/04/1955 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/04/1955 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 76049 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
18/06/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blaydon (52C) |
|
|
21/01/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
16/06/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to West Auckland (51F) |
|
|
02/11/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hawick (64G) |
|
|
30/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) |
|
|
24/01/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 76049 |
|
|
29/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bathgate (64F) |
|
|
05/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw |
|
|