|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 29/06/1937 | 16/08/1937 | 49 days | General | Boiler number 2306 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 15/05/1939 | 26/06/1939 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 2625 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 06/02/1941 | 1 day | Unclassified | Tender only |
|||
Darlington Works | 27/09/1941 | 31/10/1941 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 2623 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/11/1941 | 11/11/1941 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 07/07/1944 | 12/08/1944 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 4905 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 09/11/1946 | 23/11/1946 | 15 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4865 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 24/05/1947 | 27/09/1947 | 127 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 19/04/1950 | 13/05/1950 | 25 days | Light Intermediate | Renumbered to BR 64865 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 27/01/1953 | 18/04/1953 | 82 days | General | Boiler number 27463 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 26/08/1954 | 09/10/1954 | 45 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Gateshead Works | 11/11/1954 | 15/11/1954 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 19/04/1960 | 11/06/1960 | 54 days | General | Boiler number 27660 (Diagram 97) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
24/08/1947 | Cowlairs Works | On 24/8 the following withdrawn locos. were in the Works yard: 'Dl' 2212, 'D29' 2415 and 'D31' 2068, the last two having been stripped; whilst those seen here newly painted were: 'D29' 2411 (green), 'J37' 4617 and 'J39' 4704. Locos. awaiting works, some of which had been stripped were: 'J39' 4711, 4817/40/49/65, 4919/22/28/42; 'K2' 1732/46/51/68/91; 'K3' 1879; 'D1' 2216; 'Dll' 2691; 'J38' 5909; 'J36' 5223/61; 'J35' 4503; 'J37' 4546/48/65/67, 4607/15; 'D31' 2059; 'D34' 2489; 'C15' 7453/65/66, 'N14' 9121; 'N15' 9191, 9214. The Erecting Shop was full and included: 'K2' 1720/34/52; 'K3' 1855; 'J39' 4912/16; 'J38' 5901/12; 'Dll' 2684/87 and 'Y9' 8120/22. | SLS/194710 |
07/09/1947 | Eastfield MPD | Nos. 4852 an 4927 (both BLA) were observed here on 7/9, awaiting shops. Further locos. ex Works that have been noted here during September are: Nos. *1734/*1782, 1855, 2476/89, *2684/*2687, 2702, 4548, 4636, 4840/49, 4916/19/23/28, 5901/8/9/12, 7453/66, 7600, 8122, 8328, 8468/80, 9133, 9214/16 an 9564, whilst those observed on 1/10 were: *1732, 2455/73, 4578, 4865, 4922 an 9160 . *Painted green. On 11/10 'J83' No. 8474 was on shed, being ex Works and painted green. This engine now has a Gresham and Craven type 'P' solid jet ejector and an old (trigger) pattern steam brake valve. 'J37' No. 4546 has L.M.S. type water gauge frames with Dewrance protectors. | SLS/194711 |
30/04/1950 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works during April: These included Nos. 60529, 61103/72, 61738/68, 61854, 61909/83, 62423, 2430, 62436, 2475, 62479, 3143, 4544, 64593, 64849/54, 4865/68, 64899, 4917, 65921, 7469, 8458, 8550, 9151/62, 69174, 9182, 69553, 90071, 90306, ex-L.M.S. 2835, 42909/18, ex-W.D. 77087, 77107, 77302/99. | SLS/195006 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
20/11/1935 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1474 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1651 Allocated to Darlington (DAR) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
29/06/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/06/1937. Dep: 16/08/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2306 (Diagram 97) |
||
15/05/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/05/1939. Dep: 26/06/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2625 (Diagram 97) |
||
06/02/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/02/1941. Work undertaken: Tender only |
||
27/09/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/09/1941. Dep: 31/10/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2623 (Diagram 97) |
||
03/11/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/11/1941. Dep: 11/11/1941. | ||
07/07/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 07/07/1944. Dep: 12/08/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4905 (Diagram 97) |
||
09/11/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/11/1946. Dep: 23/11/1946. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 4865 |
||
24/05/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 24/05/1947. Dep: 27/09/1947. | ||
15/02/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
21/02/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
07/11/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
13/11/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
19/04/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 19/04/1950. Dep: 13/05/1950. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 64865 |
||
04/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
10/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
27/01/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 27/01/1953. Dep: 18/04/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27463 (Diagram 97) |
||
26/08/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 26/08/1954. Dep: 09/10/1954. | ||
11/11/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/11/1954. Dep: 15/11/1954. | ||
19/04/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 19/04/1960. Dep: 11/06/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27660 (Diagram 97) |
||
03/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64865 from Gateshead (52A) | ||
08/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |