Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 7 Online
» 785 Today
» 4601 Yesterday
» 785 Week
» 54239 Month
» 400663 Year
» 3427516 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1979 |
11/12/1965 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47277 |
03/10/1973 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
11/12/1965 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 15/02/1969 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1973 |
|
Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1974 |
|
Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
|
|
28/01/1977 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
11/12/1965 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
by 15/02/1969 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
by 06/1973 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 06/1974 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
28/01/1977 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/12/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1979 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Gateshead (52A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
24/02/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Knottingley (55G) |
|
|
15/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
06/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
03/10/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47277 |
|
|
06/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
28/01/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
04/2000 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Raxstar: at Immingham MPD |
|
|
14/07/2000 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47277 |
|
|