Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 3764 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17170 Week
» 70186 Month
» 189713 Year
» 3216566 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Gateshead
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Gateshead |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | GHD | 1875 | 31/01/1950 | 52A | 01/02/1950 | 05/05/1973 | GD | 06/05/1973 | |
|
Big 4 Company |
LNER |
1947 Directions |
The shed is on the north side of the line west of Gateshead West
Station. The yard is visible from the line.
From Gateshead East Station.
Turn left outside Gateshead East Station, and almost immediately
right into Half Moon Lane. Continue under a low railway bridge, '
and ascend a short flight of steps on the left-hand side, immediately
under the bridge. A paved path leads from the top of these steps past
the rear of Gateshead West Station, and bears right past the loco. works
to the shed. Walking time 5 minutes.
From Gateshead West Station.
Turn right outside Gateshead West Station into a narrow street,
and bear right almost immediately into Half Moon Lane. Follow
directions as from Gateshead East Station.
|
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to GHD | 01/02/1950 | Change of code to 52A | 06/05/1973 | Change of code to GD |
|
|
|