|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 22/12/1925 | 23/12/1925 | 2 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 29/04/1926 | 03/06/1926 | 36 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 04/10/1927 | 30/10/1927 | 27 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 11/11/1928 | 14/02/1929 | 96 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 07/05/1929 | 04/06/1929 | 29 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 09/09/1929 | 07/10/1929 | 29 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 17/02/1931 | 10/04/1931 | 53 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 01/03/1933 | 12/04/1933 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 3624 (Diagram 18) Steam Brakes fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 20/05/1933 | 29/05/1933 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 12/09/1934 | 31/10/1934 | 50 days | Light Repair | After collision |
||
Darlington Works | 30/01/1935 | 03/04/1935 | 64 days | General | Boiler number 3620 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 10/09/1936 | 28/11/1936 | 80 days | General | Boiler number 3627 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/11/1938 | 21/12/1938 | 44 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 09/09/1940 | 16/10/1940 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 3617 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 22/10/1940 | 22/10/1940 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 30/07/1941 | 27/08/1941 | 29 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 08/05/1942 | 21/05/1942 | 14 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 29/07/1942 | 12/08/1942 | 15 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 02/09/1942 | 09/10/1942 | 38 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 02/07/1943 | 16/08/1943 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 3618 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 04/09/1943 | 14/09/1943 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 08/01/1944 | 12/01/1944 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 27/02/1945 | 13/04/1945 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 3862 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 07/05/1945 | 18/05/1945 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 13/06/1945 | 13/07/1945 | 31 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 11/03/1947 | 19/04/1947 | 40 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 30/04/1947 | 07/05/1947 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 17/04/1948 | 14/05/1948 | 28 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 69836 |
||
Darlington Works | 05/01/1949 | 19/03/1949 | 74 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 29/03/1949 | 26/04/1949 | 29 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 03/05/1949 | 14/05/1949 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 31/05/1949 | 22/06/1949 | 23 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 21/03/1951 | 26/04/1951 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 22371 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 07/04/1952 | 08/04/1952 | 2 days | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 15/05/1953 | 13/06/1953 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 22359 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 15/06/1953 | 17/06/1953 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 24/03/1955 | 30/04/1955 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 22389 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/08/1958 | 20/08/1958 | 1 day | No repairs |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/04/1949 | Darlington Works | New work April: Nos. 60146 an 60147. Locomotives awaiting Works during April included: Nos. 888, 1035, 61199, 1224, 1405, 61625, 1668, 2726, 62753. 2760, 3044, 3260, 3275, 63286, 5044/68, 5109, 65633/50, 5653, 65684, 5858, 65868, 7278, 7675, 67729 (light re-pair), 67739 (damaged), 8156, 69842, Class '8' W.D. 77037, 77178 an 79206. Broken up: Nos. 63286, 3316, 65633/84. Locomotives ex Works during April included: Nos. 60816, 61023, 61215/40/57, 61422, 61434 (rebuilt), 61648, 62700/03/64/67, 63348/80/92, 63411, 65110, 65739, 65821/44, 67722 (light repair), 68015/27, 68409/14/32, 68705, 69107, 69391, 69835/36/88, Class '8' W.D. 90382, 90449 (light repair) and 90460. |
SLS/194906 |
31/05/1949 | Darlington Works | New Work May: Class 'A.1' Nos. 60148 an 60149. No. 60150 was ex the Paint Shop on 14/6, painted green. Locomotives awaiting Works durine May included: Nos. 812, 61069. 1407/15, 61600/61. 62709, 2726/41/56, 5109, 5675, 5784/87, 67317, 7609/19/20, 67708, 67741 (light repair), 8159, 9377, 69824/34/36, Class '8' 79184 an 90001. To scrap yard: Nos. 2377 (frames only), 3275/77, 3300/05/07/34, 65107, 5114, 5602, 65629 an 5703. Locomotives ex Works during May included: Nos. 60955, 61035. 61100 (unlined), 61199, 61224, 62397, 62745/53, 63351/95, 63440, 65040/47/89/92, 65110, 65653/55/59, 65730, 65848, 67319/31, 68061, 69106/11, Class '8' 90662/74. Nos. 60083/86 an 60127 have been noted here painted in the new blue colours with the crest on the tender. | SLS/194907 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/12/1925 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1766 Built at Hawthorn Leslie, Works Number 3622 Allocated to Darlington (DAR) Diagram 18 boiler fitted |
||
14/12/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
22/12/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/12/1925. Dep: 23/12/1925. | ||
07/02/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
03/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
29/04/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/04/1926. Dep: 03/06/1926. | ||
20/05/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
04/10/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/10/1927. Dep: 30/10/1927. | ||
28/05/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Saltburn (SALT) | ||
11/11/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1928. Dep: 14/02/1929. | ||
07/05/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/05/1929. Dep: 04/06/1929. | ||
09/09/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/09/1929. Dep: 07/10/1929. | ||
17/02/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/02/1931. Dep: 10/04/1931. | ||
01/03/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/03/1933. Dep: 12/04/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3624 (Diagram 18) Steam Brakes fitted |
||
20/05/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/05/1933. Dep: 29/05/1933. | ||
12/09/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/09/1934. Dep: 31/10/1934. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
30/01/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/01/1935. Dep: 03/04/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3620 (Diagram 18) |
||
10/09/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/09/1936. Dep: 28/11/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3627 (Diagram 18) |
||
08/11/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/11/1938. Dep: 21/12/1938. | ||
22/03/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
20/05/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middleton in Teesdale (Dar) | ||
11/09/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
09/09/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/09/1940. Dep: 16/10/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3617 (Diagram 18) |
||
22/10/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 22/10/1940. Dep: 22/10/1940. | ||
30/07/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/07/1941. Dep: 27/08/1941. | ||
08/05/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/05/1942. Dep: 21/05/1942. | ||
29/07/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/07/1942. Dep: 12/08/1942. | ||
02/09/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/09/1942. Dep: 09/10/1942. | ||
02/07/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/07/1943. Dep: 16/08/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3618 (Diagram 18) |
||
04/09/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/09/1943. Dep: 14/09/1943. | ||
29/10/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
08/01/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/01/1944. Dep: 12/01/1944. | ||
13/02/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
27/02/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/02/1945. Dep: 13/04/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3862 (Diagram 18) |
||
07/05/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/05/1945. Dep: 18/05/1945. | ||
13/06/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/06/1945. Dep: 13/07/1945. | ||
11/08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9836 | ||
11/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/03/1947. Dep: 19/04/1947. | ||
30/04/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/04/1947. Dep: 07/05/1947. | ||
17/04/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/04/1948. Dep: 14/05/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 69836 |
||
05/01/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/01/1949. Dep: 19/03/1949. | ||
13/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Saltburn (SALT) | ||
19/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Salisbury (SAL) | ||
29/03/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/03/1949. Dep: 26/04/1949. | ||
03/05/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/05/1949. Dep: 14/05/1949. | ||
31/05/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/05/1949. Dep: 22/06/1949. | ||
29/01/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
04/02/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
11/02/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) | ||
21/03/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/03/1951. Dep: 26/04/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22371 (Diagram 18) |
||
12/08/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
07/04/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 07/04/1952. Dep: 08/04/1952. | ||
06/07/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (53B) | ||
12/07/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (53B) | ||
15/05/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/05/1953. Dep: 13/06/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22359 (Diagram 18) |
||
15/06/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/06/1953. Dep: 17/06/1953. | ||
24/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1955. Dep: 30/04/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22389 (Diagram 18) |
||
16/06/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
15/09/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (53B) | ||
20/08/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 20/08/1958. Dep: 20/08/1958. | ||
25/08/1958 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69836 from Hull Botanic Gardens (53B) | ||
09/1958 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |