Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 599 Today
» 4601 Yesterday
» 599 Week
» 54053 Month
» 400477 Year
» 3427330 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D254 |
31/12/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
40054 |
02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
40 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheel Arrangement |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4625 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
31/12/1959 to York (North) (50A) |
Withdrawn |
31/12/1977 off York (North) (YK) |
Reason for Withdrawal |
Collision damage |
Time in Service |
18 yrs |
Cut Up |
m/e 09/1978 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) |
Information |
Surplus to requirements,poor condition,required for spares |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
31/12/1959 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 06/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
16/10/1971 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
31/12/1959 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
16/10/1971 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
31/12/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D254 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to York (North) (50A) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
16/01/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leith Central (64H) |
|
|
26/03/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
08/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (56B) |
|
|
28/01/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
16/10/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40054 |
|
|
08/03/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (GD) |
|
|
05/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (YK) |
|
|
31/12/1977 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40054 |
|
|
09/1978 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire |
|
|