Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 599 Today
» 4601 Yesterday
» 599 Week
» 54053 Month
» 400477 Year
» 3427330 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D392 |
30/05/1962 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
40192 |
13/10/1973 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
40 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheel Arrangement |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4625 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box |
|
To Service |
30/05/1962 to Gateshead (52A) |
Withdrawn |
21/01/1985 |
Time in Service |
22 yrs, 7 mths , 22 dys |
Cut Up |
m/e 03/1985 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
Information |
Surplus to requirements, |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
30/05/1962 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 15/02/1969 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
13/10/1973 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
30/05/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 15/02/1969 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
13/10/1973 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
30/05/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D392 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Gateshead (52A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
06/04/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
15/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
10/10/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
29/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
08/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (56B) |
|
|
15/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
13/10/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
13/10/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40192 |
|
|
21/01/1985 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40192 |
|
|
03/1985 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|