Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 787 Today
» 4601 Yesterday
» 787 Week
» 54241 Month
» 400665 Year
» 3427518 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6804 |
11/01/1963 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37104 |
02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
37 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheel Arrangement |
Co-Co |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Clayton RO2500/03 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Split Headcode Boxes Nose end Gangway |
|
To Service |
11/01/1963 to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
Withdrawn |
14/07/2000 |
Time in Service |
37 yrs, 6 mths , 3 dys |
Cut Up |
m/e 04/2000 |
Cut At |
Raxstar (at Immingham MPD) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
11/01/1963 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 12/1976 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
11/01/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 12/1976 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/01/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6804 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
26/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
23/01/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
12/01/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37104 |
|
|
12/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
04/2000 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Raxstar: at Immingham MPD |
|
|
14/07/2000 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 37104 |
|
|