Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 540 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18343 Week
» 71359 Month
» 190886 Year
» 3217739 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Haymarket
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Haymarket |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | HAY | 1875 | 31/01/1949 | 64B | 01/02/1949 | 05/05/1973 | HA | 06/05/1973 | |
|
Big 4 Company |
LNER |
1947 Directions |
The shed is on the north side of the line west of the station. The
yard is visible from the line.
Tum left outside Haymarket Station into Haymarket Terrace (main
road). Continue along West Coates, and turn sharp left into Russell
Road. A drive leads to the shed from the right hand side of this road.
Walking time 10 minutes.
A tram service labelled Corstorphine (No. 1 or 12) operates between
Princess Street (outside Waverley and Princes Street Stations) to the
end of Russell Road.
|
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to HAY | 01/02/1949 | Change of code to 64B | 06/05/1973 | Change of code to HA |
|
|
|