Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 683 Today
» 4601 Yesterday
» 683 Week
» 54137 Month
» 400561 Year
» 3427414 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8604 |
15/09/1964 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
15/09/1964 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
15/09/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8604 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 8021 Allocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
10/04/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E) |
|
|
28/05/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
24/06/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
30/12/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To North Eastern Region (91N) |
|
|
24/02/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
09/05/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
12/06/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
04/10/1971 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 8604 |
|
|
04/1972 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: St Rollox, Glasgow |
|
|