Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 1007 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14413 Week
» 67429 Month
» 186956 Year
» 3213809 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Carlisle Canal
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Carlisle Canal |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | CAR | 1875 | 31/01/1950 | 12B | 01/06/1950 | 06/10/1951 | 68E | 07/10/1951 | 31/01/1958 | 12D | 01/02/1958 | 31/03/1958 | 12C | 01/04/1958 | 17/06/1963 |
|
Date Closed |
17/06/1963 |
Big 4 Company |
LNER |
1947 Directions |
The shed is on the west side of the Hawick line just north of the
junction of the Silloth line. The yard is not visible from the line.
Leave Carlisle Station by the main entrance and continue into Court
Square. Turn left into English Street, and fork left into Castle Street.
Turn left into Annetwell Street, and cross Caldew Bridge. Continue
along Bridge Street and Church Street. Fork right into Caldcotes, and
continue into Port Road and Newton Road. A broad cinder path leads
from the right hand side of this road (opposite Raffles Road) to the shed.
Walking time 35 minutes. A bus service labelled Raffles operates
between English Street, and the end of Raffles Road.
|
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to CAR | 01/06/1950 | Change of code to 12B | 07/10/1951 | Change of code to 68E | 01/02/1958 | Change of code to 12D | 01/04/1958 | Change of code to 12C | 17/06/1963 | Depot closed |
|
|
|