Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 4235 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17641 Week
» 70657 Month
» 190184 Year
» 3217037 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5149 |
07/02/1961 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
24 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Derby Works |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4610 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box |
|
To Service |
07/02/1961 to Gateshead (52A) |
Withdrawn |
09/10/1972 off Haymarket (64B) |
Time in Service |
11 yrs, 8 mths , 2 dys |
Cut Up |
04/1973 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green all over with a narrow white band around the bottom of the bodywork |
07/02/1961 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
07/02/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/02/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5149 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Gateshead (52A) Livery applied: Green all over with a narrow white band around the bottom of the bodywork |
|
|
28/09/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
16/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
30/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
09/10/1972 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 5149 from Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
04/1973 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: St Rollox, Glasgow |
|
|