Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1323 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14729 Week
» 67745 Month
» 187272 Year
» 3214125 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D171 |
06/07/1962 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
46034 |
02/02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
46 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Spanner Mk 3 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box split in two |
|
To Service |
06/07/1962 to Gateshead (52A) |
Withdrawn |
02/11/1980 |
Time in Service |
18 yrs, 3 mths , 27 dys |
Cut Up |
13/11/1982 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 30/12/1970 |
|
Allocations - WIP
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
52A |
|
Gateshead (New) |
on |
06/07/1962 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
02/11/1980 |
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 03/1978 |
|
Complete headcode assembly removed and replaced by two marker lights. |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
06/07/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
21/10/1964 |
Not severe |
|
Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows |
Not known |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/07/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D171 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
30/12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
02/02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 46034 |
|
|
03/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Complete headcode assembly removed and replaced by two marker lights. |
|
|
02/11/1980 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 46034 |
|
|
13/11/1982 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|