|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 19/11/1943 | 18/12/1943 | 30 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/12/1945 | 19/01/1946 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/07/1947 | 20/09/1947 | 58 days | General | Boiler number 3144 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/12/1948 | 17/01/1949 | 36 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 60952 |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/08/1949 | 15/10/1949 | 54 days | General | Boiler number 10507 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/05/1951 | 09/06/1951 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 29493 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/06/1951 | 21/06/1951 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 19/05/1952 | 21/05/1952 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 08/04/1953 | 14/05/1953 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 29458 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 05/01/1955 | 17/02/1955 | 44 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 16/09/1955 | 15/10/1955 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 29505 (Diagram 109) |
||
Gateshead Works | 24/11/1955 | 30/11/1955 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 06/06/1957 | 09/07/1957 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 29468 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 27/10/1958 | 30/10/1958 | 4 days | Unclassified | Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 04/05/1959 | 06/05/1959 | 3 days | Unclassified | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 12/06/1959 | 30/07/1959 | 49 days | General | Boiler number 29473 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 23/10/1961 | 25/11/1961 | 34 days | Unclassified | Boiler number 29377 (Diagram 109) Smith speedometer fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 06/12/1961 | 15/12/1961 | 10 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/12/1948 | Darlington Works | Locomotives awaiting Works during December included:-Nos. 952, 1437, 1625/41, 2378, 2970 (the last 'C.7'), 3368, 5639, 5650 (badly damaged at Jervaulx), 5693, 5759/97, 5807, 7278, 7651, 8010/37, 8155, 8292, 9792, 9892, 60510, 62732/33, 65056, 67704/05/10/19/23, 69910/33, 'Austerity' 70877, 77414/69. Locomotives ex Works during December included:-Nos. 60918/42/70, 61432, 61601/29/30/51, 62344/65, 62728/31/54, 63352, 63423, 65033, 65856, 67283, 67342, 67636/39/87, 67701, 68016 (altered bunker), 68264/75, 68436, 68696, 68745, 69102, 69794, 69842/79/89, 'Austerity' 77329. Locomotives broken up: Nos. 2390 an 3327. The two Class 'V.2's' which have hitherto been used as main line pilots, have now been replaced by Class 'A.3' Nos. 70 an 76. | SLS/194902 |
11/11/1961 | Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: D17, D249/51/79, D3317 D4079-81, D5102/49/68-73, 43141, 60859/64/91, 60952, 61020/4, 61129/92, 61218/89, 61382, 63405, 68025, 90067, 90333/44/63, 90445, 92194/5. Works Yard: D245/74, D2246, D3228, 12113, 46450/80, 60856, 60916/23/48, 61008, 61216/20/57, 63342/59, 63419/69, 65099, 65769, 65821/60, 67647, 67762, 68007/50, 69008, 78026, 80069, 90009, 90450, 92183. Stripping Shop: 61415/47. Outside Stripping Shop: 60939, 63435, 65691. Crossing: D272, D351 D3140, D4078, D5096, D5101/67, 60806. Scrap Yard: 61411-4/9/22/3/31/6/60, 65741, 67707/13/7/22/75/94, 68675/92, 68702 intact. | SLS/196201 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
18/07/1942 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3654 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1891 Allocated to Gateshead (GHD) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
19/11/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/11/1943. Dep: 18/12/1943. | ||
15/12/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/12/1945. Dep: 19/01/1946. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 852 but not taken up | ||
10/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 952 | ||
25/07/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/07/1947. Dep: 20/09/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3144 (Diagram 109) |
||
13/12/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/12/1948. Dep: 17/01/1949. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 60952 |
||
06/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
12/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
23/08/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/08/1949. Dep: 15/10/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 10507 (Diagram 109) |
||
11/05/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1951. Dep: 09/06/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29493 (Diagram 109) |
||
11/06/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/06/1951. Dep: 21/06/1951. | ||
19/05/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/05/1952. Dep: 21/05/1952. | ||
06/07/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
12/07/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
08/04/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/04/1953. Dep: 14/05/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29458 (Diagram 109) |
||
15/11/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
05/01/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 05/01/1955. Dep: 17/02/1955. | ||
16/09/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/09/1955. Dep: 15/10/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29505 (Diagram 109) |
||
24/11/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/11/1955. Dep: 30/11/1955. | ||
06/06/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1957. Dep: 09/07/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29468 (Diagram 109) |
||
15/09/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
08/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
27/10/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/10/1958. Dep: 30/10/1958. Work undertaken: Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
04/05/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/05/1959. Dep: 06/05/1959. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
12/06/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/06/1959. Dep: 30/07/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29473 (Diagram 109) |
||
23/10/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/10/1961. Dep: 25/11/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29377 (Diagram 109) Smith speedometer fitted |
||
06/12/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/12/1961. Dep: 15/12/1961. | ||
02/12/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (56B) | ||
26/01/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) | ||
05/07/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
11/10/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60952 from Gateshead (52A) | ||
11/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by Ellis Metals: Derwenthaugh Road, Swalwell |