Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 534 Today
» 4601 Yesterday
» 534 Week
» 53988 Month
» 400412 Year
» 3427265 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1513 |
15/03/1963 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47414 |
01/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
15/03/1963 |
GFYE |
Two tone green with full yellow ends |
by 07/1969 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 02/1970 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 30/12/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
12/11/1969 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
15/03/1963 |
vd |
Vacuum brakes, Dual heat |
|
|
Webb |
12/11/1969 |
xd |
Dual brakes, Dual heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
16/11/1963 |
Not severe |
|
Train heating boiler burners |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
06/08/1970 |
Not severe |
|
Electrical overloads or arcs |
Electrical insulation |
Passenger working |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
15/03/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1513 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 355 Allocated to Finsbury Park (34G) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
25/11/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
07/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
12/11/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
22/11/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (55B) |
|
|
02/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
30/12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
06/10/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (GD) |
|
|
01/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47414 |
|
|
11/01/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (FP) |
|
|
07/03/1986 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47414 |
|
|
06/1989 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: Leicester |
|
|