Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 588 Today
» 4601 Yesterday
» 588 Week
» 54042 Month
» 400466 Year
» 3427319 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13324 |
19/11/1956 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3324 |
17/03/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08254 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
19/11/1956 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
19/11/1956 |
Power Unit IH3518 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
19/11/1956 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13324 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Percy Main (52E) |
|
|
13/12/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton (52B) |
|
|
20/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
17/03/1960 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3324 |
|
|
08/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Percy Main (52E) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08254 |
|
|
02/11/1986 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08254 from Gateshead (GD) |
|
|
13/05/1994 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|