Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1134 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18937 Week
» 71953 Month
» 191480 Year
» 3218333 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D154 |
16/02/1962 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
46017 |
01/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
46 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4625 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box split in two |
|
To Service |
16/02/1962 to Derby (17A) |
Withdrawn |
22/04/1984 |
Time in Service |
22 yrs, 2 mths , 6 dys |
Cut Up |
30/06/1986 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 03/1971 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
02/1972 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
12/02/1972 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
16/02/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
02/1972 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
12/02/1972 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
30/07/1970 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
Passenger working |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
16/02/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D154 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
24/02/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
23/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
12/09/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (16A) |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
21/05/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
01/03/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
03/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
02/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
12/02/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
01/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 46017 |
|
|
11/10/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
06/03/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (LA) |
|
|
08/05/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
09/10/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (LA) |
|
|
29/11/1981 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to Gateshead (GD) |
|
|
22/04/1984 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 46017 |
|
|
30/06/1986 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|