|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 25/05/1938 | 26/05/1938 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 05/01/1939 | 24/02/1939 | 51 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 25/01/1940 | 01/02/1940 | 8 days | Unclassified | Pony truck exam |
||
Darlington Works | 06/08/1940 | 25/09/1940 | 51 days | General | Boiler number 29460 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/09/1942 | 26/10/1942 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 2892 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/12/1944 | 03/02/1945 | 53 days | General | Boiler number 2919 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/02/1945 | 10/02/1945 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 10/04/1945 | 10/04/1945 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/02/1947 | 01/03/1947 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/01/1948 | 07/02/1948 | 23 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E810 |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/08/1948 | 02/10/1948 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 9166 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60810 |
||
Darlington Works | 05/07/1950 | 17/08/1950 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 29511 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 23/08/1950 | 04/09/1950 | 13 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 02/10/1950 | 02/10/1950 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 18/09/1951 | 29/09/1951 | 12 days | Light Casual | Modified pony truck |
||
Darlington Works | 03/07/1952 | 16/08/1952 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 29472 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/11/1952 | 10/01/1953 | 52 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 16/06/1954 | 16/07/1954 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 29515 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 10/08/1954 | 13/08/1954 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 29/03/1956 | 07/05/1956 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 29526 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 06/02/1958 | 08/03/1958 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 29531 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 10/03/1958 | 11/03/1958 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 16/03/1959 | 18/03/1959 | 3 days | Unclassified | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 15/12/1959 | 21/01/1960 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 29500 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 18/09/1962 | 26/10/1962 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 29475 (Diagram 109) Smith speedometer fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 09/11/1962 | 07/12/1962 | 29 days | Light Casual |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/09/1937 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4781 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1708 Allocated to Heaton (HTN) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
25/05/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/05/1938. Dep: 26/05/1938. | ||
05/01/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/01/1939. Dep: 24/02/1939. | ||
25/01/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/01/1940. Dep: 01/02/1940. Work undertaken: Pony truck exam |
||
06/08/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/08/1940. Dep: 25/09/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29460 (Diagram 109) |
||
09/09/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/09/1942. Dep: 26/10/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2892 (Diagram 109) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
13/12/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/12/1944. Dep: 03/02/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2919 (Diagram 109) |
||
05/02/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/02/1945. Dep: 10/02/1945. | ||
10/04/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 10/04/1945. Dep: 10/04/1945. | ||
17/03/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 710 | ||
26/05/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 810 | ||
01/02/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/02/1947. Dep: 01/03/1947. | ||
16/01/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/01/1948. Dep: 07/02/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E810 |
||
23/08/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/08/1948. Dep: 02/10/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9166 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60810 |
||
06/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
12/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
05/07/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/07/1950. Dep: 17/08/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29511 (Diagram 109) |
||
23/08/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/08/1950. Dep: 04/09/1950. | ||
02/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 02/10/1950. Dep: 02/10/1950. | ||
01/07/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
07/07/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
09/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
15/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
18/09/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/09/1951. Dep: 29/09/1951. Work undertaken: Modified pony truck |
||
03/07/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/07/1952. Dep: 16/08/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29472 (Diagram 109) |
||
20/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 20/11/1952. Dep: 10/01/1953. | ||
16/06/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/06/1954. Dep: 16/07/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29515 (Diagram 109) |
||
10/08/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/08/1954. Dep: 13/08/1954. | ||
29/03/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1956. Dep: 07/05/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29526 (Diagram 109) |
||
06/02/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/02/1958. Dep: 08/03/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29531 (Diagram 109) |
||
10/03/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/03/1958. Dep: 11/03/1958. | ||
16/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/03/1959. Dep: 18/03/1959. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
15/12/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/12/1959. Dep: 21/01/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29500 (Diagram 109) |
||
12/06/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
18/09/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/09/1962. Dep: 26/10/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29475 (Diagram 109) Smith speedometer fitted |
||
09/11/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/11/1962. Dep: 07/12/1962. | ||
21/11/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60810 from York (North) (50A) | ||
01/1966 | Scrapped | Broken up by W George, Station Steel: Wath |