Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 461 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18264 Week
» 71280 Month
» 190807 Year
» 3217660 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D155 |
16/02/1962 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
46018 |
02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
46 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4625 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box split in two |
|
To Service |
16/02/1962 to Derby (17A) |
Withdrawn |
18/12/1983 |
Time in Service |
21 yrs, 10 mths , 2 dys |
Cut Up |
20/04/1985 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 03/1971 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
09/1971 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
02/1979 |
|
Complete headcode assembly removed and replaced by two marker lights. |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
16/02/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
09/1971 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
16/02/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D155 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
10/03/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
05/05/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
05/05/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E) |
|
|
21/07/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
11/08/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
01/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
15/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
12/09/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (16A) |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
21/05/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
08/03/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
03/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
09/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 46018 |
|
|
11/10/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
01/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (LA) |
|
|
02/1979 |
Modification |
Modification: Complete headcode assembly removed and replaced by two marker lights. |
|
|
29/11/1981 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to Gateshead (GD) |
|
|
18/12/1983 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 46018 |
|
|
20/04/1985 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|