Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 2416 Today
» 5000 Yesterday
» 28450 Week
» 127095 Month
» 329759 Year
» 3356612 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8046 |
12/12/1959 |
|
TOPS (20/0) |
20046 |
05/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
20 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheel Arrangement |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
12/12/1959 to Hornsey (34B) |
Withdrawn |
09/06/1993 |
Time in Service |
33 yrs, 5 mths , 28 dys |
Cut Up |
on 02/09/1993 |
Cut At |
MC Metals (Springburn) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with grey roof, red bufferbeams |
12/12/1959 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
01/1971 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
27/02/1971 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
12/12/1959 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
01/1971 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
27/02/1971 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/12/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8046 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Hornsey (34B) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
30/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
23/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
09/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
18/11/1967 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
17/10/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
01/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
27/02/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20046 |
|
|
24/07/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
09/06/1993 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 20046 |
|
|
02/09/1993 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|