Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 713 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14119 Week
» 67135 Month
» 186662 Year
» 3213515 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D160 |
31/03/1962 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
46023 |
03/1974 |
|
TOPS (97/4) |
97402 |
|
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
46 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4625 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box split in two |
|
To Service |
31/03/1962 to Derby (17A) |
Withdrawn |
01/11/1983 |
Time in Service |
21 yrs, 7 mths , 1 dy |
Cut Up |
03/1994 |
Cut At |
J&S Metals (at Crewe Basford Hall) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 30/12/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
10/1972 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
31/03/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
10/1972 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
31/03/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D160 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
12/09/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wellingborough (15B) |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester Division (D15) |
|
|
11/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
16/12/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
06/01/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
11/07/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
30/12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
10/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
28/10/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (84A) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 46023 |
|
|
18/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
10/05/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
05/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (LA) |
|
|
01/11/1983 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 46023 |
|
|
12/1983 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 97402 but not taken up |
|
|
03/1994 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by J&S Metals: at Crewe Basford Hall |
|
|