|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 14/01/1938 | 31/01/1938 | 18 days | Light Repair | Larger coal space provided |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/02/1938 | 14/02/1938 | 4 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/01/1939 | 11/02/1939 | 41 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/02/1940 | 27/04/1940 | 62 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/06/1941 | 23/07/1941 | 49 days | General | Tender number 5323 (LNER Corridor) attached. Side skirting removed De-named GREAT SNIPE Named WILLIAM WHITELAW |
||
Doncaster Works | 26/08/1941 | 03/09/1941 | 9 days | Light Repair | BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/09/1942 | 31/10/1942 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 9029 (Diagram 107) Painted Wartime unlined black with NE lettering on tender |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/03/1944 | 19/04/1944 | 41 days | General | To 75% Cut-off |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/03/1945 | 31/03/1945 | 19 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/09/1945 | 27/10/1945 | 53 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/10/1946 | 14/11/1946 | 45 days | General | Painted Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 04/12/1947 | 20/01/1948 | 48 days | General | Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E4 |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/02/1948 | 04/02/1948 | 2 days | Special | Tender change Tender number 5639 (Streamlined Non-Corridor) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/05/1948 | 25/05/1948 | 2 days | Special | Tender change Tender number 5484 (LNER Corridor) attached. Renumbered to BR 60004 |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/07/1948 | 06/08/1948 | 10 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/11/1948 | 19/11/1948 | 12 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/03/1949 | 26/04/1949 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 9126 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/07/1950 | 10/08/1950 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 9129 (Diagram 107) Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/01/1952 | 29/02/1952 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 29311 (Diagram 107) Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/04/1953 | 22/05/1953 | 31 days | General | Long guard irons removed |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/08/1954 | 06/10/1954 | 45 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/03/1955 | 21/03/1955 | 20 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/02/1956 | 28/03/1956 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 29289 (Diagram 107) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 11/07/1956 | 11/07/1956 | 1 day | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/01/1957 | 31/01/1957 | 18 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/11/1957 | 05/12/1957 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 29302 (Diagram 107) Double Chimney fitted |
||
Cowlairs Works | 25/06/1958 | 27/06/1958 | 3 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/11/1958 | 13/11/1958 | 10 days | Light Casual | BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/03/1959 | 16/04/1959 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 29330 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 31/05/1960 | 08/06/1960 | 9 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/12/1960 | 25/01/1961 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 29333 (Diagram 107) Speedometer fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/02/1961 | 11/02/1961 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/11/1962 | 31/12/1962 | 49 days | General | Boiler number 29307 (Diagram 107) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/12/1963 | 06/02/1964 | 58 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Inverurie Works | 13/02/1964 | 13/02/1964 | 1 day | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 05/07/1965 | 28/08/1965 | 55 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
16/01/1943 | Doncaster Notes (engines lettered 'NE') | No. 2005, converted to Class 'A,' was due out 16/1. Another 'Q.4' 5048 is on hand for conversion to 'Q.1.' Other arrivals for works are 3838, 3465 an 4993. Streamlined 'B.17' 2870 has left works after a 'general,' also 'J.55' 3859 (BFD). Following on the previous list of engines lettered 'NE' at Plant:- October: 2957, 4474, 1125, 4513, 180, 4003, 4663, 4340, 3488, 4266, 2572, 4655, 3497, 1158, 1367, 4471, 1312, 4312, 3350, 4601, 1141, 4377, 2598, 4490, 2859, 2555, 2461, 483, 3076, 4637, 590, 2766, 4834, 4664, 1118, 4888, 2394, 3224, 4594, 4462, November: 3476, 2439, 4871, 4594, 4646, 4008, 2960, 601, 4053, 4805, 2426, 118, 135, 2563, 112, 1300, 4035, 4449, 4246, 4884, 2744, 4843, 3298, 2417, 5961, 178, 4495, 608, 2958, 2579, 2453, 3050, 125, 114, 4853, 3500, 3494, 2593, 3167. December: 3821, 4497, 4414, 4426, 3276, 4824, 586, 4545, 3621, 4018, 4225, 587, 3275 4793, 2546, 4456, 3819, 4851, 4316, 3631, 3819, 599, 3010, 3593, 17, 3387, 6139, 3498, 1156, 2870, 4240, 2955, 3232, 3047. | SLS/194302 |
31/12/1946 | General | New 'B.1' 4-6-0's, Nos. 1089-99, etc. (from 1094 they are green), are much in evidence on outer suburban, Hitchin' etc., workings at King's Cross. Scottish visitors seen there before Christmas were: Blue 'A.4' 4, William Whitelaw, and 'V.2' 834 (late 4805), both of Haymarket. Gateshead or Heaton 'Pacifics' and 'Green Arrows' often get through to London. N.E., G.C., and G.E. locos. still appear from time to time on G.N. freight, parcel or similar trains. The G.E. principal express workings to Liverpool Street (including the East Anglian) from Norwich are regularly operated by the new standard 2-cyl. 4-6-0's, with drivers keeping their own loco. as far as possible. These excellent engines are on other G.E. as well as G.C. fast passenger turns also. | SLS/194702 |
30/04/1949 | Doncaster Works | Locomotives noted in Works during April included Nos. 13, 17, 60033/34, 56, 69, 91, 60527, 802/07/96, 911/28/34/54, while those ex the Paint Shop included Nos. 60004/10/27/28/55 an 60100. As yet there is not any sign of either the new blue or green paint being used. | SLS/194906 |
29/06/1953 | Elizabethan Express | The first 'Elizabethan' from London was in charge of A4 60028 and Driver J. Howard, and both arrived on time and intact at Edinburgh despite the combined efforts of the reporters and television cameras. Up to quite a late hour it was hoped that 60022 would be able to do the trip but several failures of minor and major importance had made the prospect unlikely, then a final test a day or two beforehand still showed a tendency for one of the motion pins to run warm, and so 60028, fairly new ex works, was quickly made ready. So far, the first month has produced only one failure; a trailing bogie on 60008 ran hot (on Monday the 13th) on her first down run, and at Dunbar a D49 took over for the short run to Edinburgh. One of the Haymarket locos., No. 60009 was suspected of being a little warm on arrival at Kings Cross, during the second week, and 60028 was sent in its place the next morning (60017 had previously taken over the Kings X working leaving 60028 in reserve), 60009 returned on its right working later. This loco. had earlier worked the first Up train, a run spoilt by a piece of cotton waste blocking the water pick-up, causing a stop at Retford for a. 'drink.' Good work by Driver Smith thereafter reduced the late arrival to only five or six minutes. 60004 has performed well from the Edinburgh end (though reported a little weak at the front end), with some help from 60031. | SLS/195310 |
19/12/1960 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: E3057-63, D3329, 12125, and frames for three new diesel shunters. Stripping Road: 60113, 60507/10/32, 61083, 61141/51, 73074. Scrap Road: 61771, 62666, 63950/3, 641S2,48875 68943/7, 69293, 69581. Erecting Shop: 43148, 60004/15/25/74/86, 60109, 60539, 61044, 61177, 61314, 61807, 73097, D3475/86, D8020. Erecting Shop Yard: 60058/66, 60144/5, 61266/85, 63923, D3487. Crimpsall Yard: 63944, 68911/4. Paint Shop: 60006, 60531. 61279, 61366, 61862, 62022/56, 63935, D312, D2113, D2207, D5675-7, E3056. | SLS/196102 |
02/02/1963 | Glasgow - Aberdeen Pacific workings | The last regular workings of L.N.E.R Pacifics - during December and January, Ferryhill usually used 60009 an 60011 on the 7-10 a.m. to Glasgow (back with the 5-30 p.m.) but 60002/4/57/97/522/37 also appeared, whilst the standbies were 60527 or 60955 (rarely required). 60537 appeared on 25th January-one month after its 'withdrawal'! ' St. Rollox usually used 60027* on the 8-25 a.m. to Aberdeen (back with the 5-15 p.m.) with as standby 60031 or 60090, whilst 60012 was borrowed from Haymarket for most of November and December; other locomotives to appear were 60004/512/955/72 an 73153. * 60027 was in Grangemouth shed for repair on 11th February. | SLS/196303 |
14/04/1963 | St. Rollox MPD (in steam) | in steam-60004/31/94, 60955 and 60525 under repair, and stored-42877, 45119, 45718/28/9/31; ex Works-44931, 45309 an 45478. | SLS/196304 |
18/01/1964 | Darlington Works (under repair) | Erecting Shop: 12122, D191, D2615, D3143, D3672, D5102/9, D5370/6, and 0-4-0 Depl. Diesel No. 56, D7583-89 under construction. Steam Locos under repair: 75037, 60004, 60145, 60923/70, 73092/142/162, 75046/53, 90120/709. Stripping Shop: 47482 for general, 63451, 72002, 75006, 90209/578/728. Yard Sidings: D16, D2700, D5112, 43119, 60132, 61013, 60954, 62060/65, 63468, 65033/99, 65804, 73144, 75006/40, 90026. Diesel Test House: D22, D5104 an D5169. Scrap Yard: 43131, 42770, 61468, 65810, 67652, 68008/38/39/41/42/59/61, 68736, 69006/21 an 72001. | SLS/196402 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
27/11/1937 | Tender | Tender fitted: Streamlined Non-Corridor number 5667 | ||
10/12/1937 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4462, name: GREAT SNIPE Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1864 Allocated to Kings Cross (KX) Livery applied: Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining. Diagram 107 boiler fitted |
||
14/01/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/01/1938. Dep: 31/01/1938. Work undertaken: Larger coal space provided |
||
11/02/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/02/1938. Dep: 14/02/1938. | ||
16/02/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
02/01/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/01/1939. Dep: 11/02/1939. | ||
26/02/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/02/1940. Dep: 27/04/1940. | ||
17/06/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
05/06/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/06/1941. Dep: 23/07/1941. Work undertaken: Tender number 5323 (LNER Corridor) attached. Side skirting removed De-named GREAT SNIPE Named WILLIAM WHITELAW |
||
24/07/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY) | ||
26/08/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/08/1941. Dep: 03/09/1941. Work undertaken: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
16/09/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/09/1942. Dep: 31/10/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9029 (Diagram 107) Painted Wartime unlined black with NE lettering on tender |
||
10/03/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/03/1944. Dep: 19/04/1944. Work undertaken: To 75% Cut-off |
||
13/03/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/03/1945. Dep: 31/03/1945. | ||
05/09/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/09/1945. Dep: 27/10/1945. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 601 but not taken up | ||
25/08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4 | ||
01/10/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/10/1946. Dep: 14/11/1946. Work undertaken: Painted Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining. |
||
14/11/1946 | Livery | Change of livery to Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining. | ||
04/12/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/12/1947. Dep: 20/01/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E4 |
||
03/02/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Special) - Arr: 03/02/1948. Dep: 04/02/1948. Work undertaken: Tender change Tender number 5639 (Streamlined Non-Corridor) attached. |
||
24/05/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Special) - Arr: 24/05/1948. Dep: 25/05/1948. Work undertaken: Tender change Tender number 5484 (LNER Corridor) attached. Renumbered to BR 60004 |
||
28/07/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/07/1948. Dep: 06/08/1948. | ||
08/11/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/11/1948. Dep: 19/11/1948. | ||
11/03/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/03/1949. Dep: 26/04/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9126 (Diagram 107) |
||
10/07/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/07/1950. Dep: 10/08/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9129 (Diagram 107) Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
21/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/01/1952. Dep: 29/02/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29311 (Diagram 107) Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
22/04/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/04/1953. Dep: 22/05/1953. Work undertaken: Long guard irons removed |
||
23/08/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 23/08/1954. Dep: 06/10/1954. | ||
02/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/03/1955. Dep: 21/03/1955. | ||
18/02/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1956. Dep: 28/03/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29289 (Diagram 107) |
||
11/07/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/07/1956. Dep: 11/07/1956. | ||
14/01/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/01/1957. Dep: 31/01/1957. | ||
05/11/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1957. Dep: 05/12/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29302 (Diagram 107) Double Chimney fitted |
||
25/06/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 25/06/1958. Dep: 27/06/1958. | ||
04/11/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/11/1958. Dep: 13/11/1958. Work undertaken: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
05/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/03/1959. Dep: 16/04/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29330 (Diagram 107) |
||
31/05/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 31/05/1960. Dep: 08/06/1960. | ||
05/12/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/12/1960. Dep: 25/01/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29333 (Diagram 107) Speedometer fitted |
||
07/02/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/02/1961. Dep: 11/02/1961. | ||
11/06/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) (Primarily used on 3hr expresses from Aberdeen - Glasgow) | ||
20/09/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) | ||
13/11/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/11/1962. Dep: 31/12/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29307 (Diagram 107) |
||
17/06/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) (Primarily used on 3hr expresses from Aberdeen - Glasgow) | ||
11/12/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 11/12/1963. Dep: 06/02/1964. | ||
13/02/1964 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/02/1964. Dep: 13/02/1964. | ||
05/07/1965 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/07/1965. Dep: 28/08/1965. | ||
17/07/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60004 from Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) | ||
10/1966 | Scrapped | Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw |