Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 76 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17879 Week
» 70895 Month
» 190422 Year
» 3217275 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Carlisle Kingmoor
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | 12A | 01/01/1923 | 09/06/1950 | 68A | 10/06/1950 | 31/01/1958 | 12A | 01/02/1958 | 05/05/1973 | KM | 06/05/1973 | 04/01/1975 | KD | 05/01/1975 | |
|
Big 4 Company |
LMS |
1947 Directions |
The shed is on the east side of the main line about l½ miles north of
Carlisle Station. The yard is visible from the line.
Leave Carlisle station by the main entrance and go straight ahead
into Court Square. Turn left along English Street, and continue into
Scotch Street and Rickergate. Cross Eden Bridge and continue up Stanwix Bank. Turn left at the top along Etterby Street and continue along
Etterby Scaur. Turn left at the top of the hill into Etterby Road. A
broad cinder path leads to the shed from the right hand side of this road
(just before the railway bridge). Walking time 45 minutes.
A bus service (C3 or C4 St. Anns) runs from English Street to the end of
Etterby Road (200 yards from the shed entrance). |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to 12A | 10/06/1950 | Change of code to 68A | 01/02/1958 | Change of code to 12A | 31/12/1967 | Closed to steam locomotives | 06/05/1973 | Change of code to KM | 05/01/1975 | Change of code to KD |
|
|
|