|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 28/10/1925 | 30/10/1925 | 3 days | Light Repair | For naming Named BAYARDO |
||
Darlington Works | 23/04/1926 | 29/09/1926 | 160 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 30/03/1927 | 15/07/1927 | 108 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 09/08/1927 | 09/09/1927 | 32 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 21/02/1928 | 22/05/1928 | 92 days | Heavy | Rebuilt to class A3 Boiler number 8031 (Diagram 94HP) Long Travel Valves fitted |
||
Gateshead Works | 14/06/1928 | 23/06/1928 | 10 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 22/02/1929 | 21/05/1929 | 89 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 22/10/1929 | 31/12/1929 | 71 days | Heavy | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/05/1930 | 27/06/1930 | 54 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/09/1931 | 05/11/1931 | 42 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/02/1932 | 05/02/1932 | 4 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/11/1932 | 28/12/1932 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 8249 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
Darlington Works | 24/02/1933 | 13/04/1933 | 49 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 09/05/1933 | 17/05/1933 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/09/1933 | 06/11/1933 | 50 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/11/1934 | 15/12/1934 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 8226 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/03/1935 | 18/04/1935 | 22 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 03/12/1935 | 03/12/1935 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 16/12/1935 | 19/12/1935 | 4 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/01/1936 | 14/03/1936 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 8027 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/03/1937 | 10/04/1937 | 40 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 13/05/1937 | 13/05/1937 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 19/07/1937 | 23/07/1937 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/02/1938 | 01/04/1938 | 38 days | General | Tender number 5277 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 17/04/1939 | 13/05/1939 | 27 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/05/1940 | 15/06/1940 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 27009 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/12/1940 | 23/12/1940 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/12/1941 | 16/01/1942 | 31 days | General | Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/08/1943 | 09/09/1943 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/12/1943 | 22/01/1944 | 25 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/03/1945 | 21/04/1945 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 8247 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
Doncaster Works | 27/10/1945 | 29/12/1945 | 64 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/02/1947 | 29/03/1947 | 43 days | General | Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/02/1948 | 20/03/1948 | 48 days | General | Renumbered to BR 60079 |
||
Doncaster Works | 25/04/1949 | 12/05/1949 | 18 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 07/11/1949 | 11/11/1949 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/04/1950 | 19/05/1950 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 27066 (Diagram 94HP) Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 04/01/1952 | 31/01/1952 | 28 days | General | Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 17/07/1952 | 12/08/1952 | 27 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/10/1952 | 04/11/1952 | 13 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/07/1953 | 06/10/1953 | 71 days | General | Boiler number 27050 (Diagram 94A) Right Hand Drive to Left Hand Drive |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/12/1954 | 20/01/1955 | 39 days | General | To 75% Cut-off |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/01/1956 | 14/02/1956 | 23 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/09/1956 | 14/11/1956 | 56 days | General | Boiler number 27065 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/05/1958 | 12/06/1958 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 27000 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
Doncaster Works | 06/04/1959 | 18/04/1959 | 13 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/11/1959 | 01/01/1960 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 27026 (Diagram 94A) Double Chimney fitted |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/03/1948 | Doncaster Works | Nos. 22, 23, 27, 34, 79, 91, 103, 504, 511/2/4 were all in Doncaster Plant about the beginning of March, but not all were in for general repair. Owing to a defective cylinder and piston, 'C.1' No. 2808 has been condemned, the boiler of which has now been placed on No. 2877. New 'A.2' No. 60532 Blue Peter was ready towards the end of March. The first re-numbered engines (green) ex Doncaster were: Nos. 60079, 60066 (after Goswick crash), 60512, 61070 an 60982, while others in hand included Nos. 60007/23 an 61828. No. 60534 will soon be ready, completing E.O. 380. Order 381 is for five 'A.2' following on. It is understood Orders 382-3 will be for 16 new 'A.1' 4-6-2's. | SLS/194805 |
31/03/1948 | Doncaster Works | Nos. 22, 23, 27, 34, 79, 91, 103, 504, 511/2/4 were all in Doncaster Plant about the beginning of March, but not all were in for general repair. Owing to a defective cylinder and piston, 'C.1' No. 2808 has been condemned, the boiler of which has now been placed on No. 2877. New 'A.2' No. 60532 Blue Peter was ready towards the end of March. The first re-numbered engines (green) ex Doncaster were: Nos. 60079, 60066 (after Goswick crash), 60512, 61070 an 60982, while others in hand included Nos. 60007/23 an 61828. No. 60534 will soon be ready, completing E.O. 380. Order 381 is for five 'A.2' following on. It is understood Orders 382-3 will be for 16 new 'A.1' 4-6-2's. | SLS/194805 |
01/10/1961 | Doncaster Works (Scrap Yard-being cut up) | New Erecting Shop: D2399, E3067-73. Outside New Erecting Shop: 13251. Stripping Road: 43159, 60055/64/71/89, 60162, 60525, 61207/27, 61808/88, 61920, 63973, 68894, 73000, 73170. Scrap Yard-intact: 68950, 69533/85/92. Scrap Yard-being cut up: 60035/79, 61833, 64779. Crimpsal: D3447, 43062, 60080, 61361. Outside Crimpsal: D3478, 60017, 60106, 63969, 70000. Erecting Shop: D3254, D4061, D5578, D5602, D5805, 13166, 13333, 43158, 60012/33, 60050/91/2, 60128/59, 60511/3/37, 61145, 61299, 61867, 62006, 63965/80, 70035/8. Outside Erecting Shop: 61897, 70030, 73169. Weigh House : Nil. Outside Weigh House: 61075. Paint Shop: D5050, D5583, D9014, E3066, 60001, 61248. Outside Paint Shop: D5355, D5604, D5816. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196111 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
29/10/1924 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2578 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 23116 Allocated to Heaton (HTN) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Tender fitted: GNR 5,000g Diagram 94 boiler fitted |
||
28/10/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/10/1925. Dep: 30/10/1925. Work undertaken: For naming Named BAYARDO |
||
23/04/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/04/1926. Dep: 29/09/1926. | ||
30/03/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/03/1927. Dep: 15/07/1927. | ||
09/08/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/08/1927. Dep: 09/09/1927. | ||
21/02/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 21/02/1928. Dep: 22/05/1928. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class A3 Boiler number 8031 (Diagram 94HP) Long Travel Valves fitted |
||
14/06/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/06/1928. Dep: 23/06/1928. | ||
22/02/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1929. Dep: 21/05/1929. | ||
22/10/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 22/10/1929. Dep: 31/12/1929. | ||
05/05/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/05/1930. Dep: 27/06/1930. | ||
25/09/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/09/1931. Dep: 05/11/1931. | ||
02/02/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/02/1932. Dep: 05/02/1932. | ||
17/11/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/11/1932. Dep: 28/12/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8249 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
01/1933 | Modification | Modification: Westinghouse Pump removed | ||
24/02/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/02/1933. Dep: 13/04/1933. | ||
09/05/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/05/1933. Dep: 17/05/1933. | ||
18/09/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/09/1933. Dep: 06/11/1933. | ||
07/11/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/11/1934. Dep: 15/12/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8226 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
28/03/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/03/1935. Dep: 18/04/1935. | ||
03/12/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 03/12/1935. Dep: 03/12/1935. | ||
16/12/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/12/1935. Dep: 19/12/1935. | ||
28/01/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/01/1936. Dep: 14/03/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8027 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
02/03/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1937. Dep: 10/04/1937. | ||
13/05/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 13/05/1937. Dep: 13/05/1937. | ||
19/07/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/07/1937. Dep: 23/07/1937. | ||
23/08/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
11/09/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY) | ||
31/01/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
23/02/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/02/1938. Dep: 01/04/1938. Work undertaken: Tender number 5277 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
17/04/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/04/1939. Dep: 13/05/1939. | ||
22/01/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
15/05/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/05/1940. Dep: 15/06/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27009 (Diagram 94A) |
||
16/12/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/12/1940. Dep: 23/12/1940. | ||
17/12/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/12/1941. Dep: 16/01/1942. Work undertaken: Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
16/01/1942 | Livery | Change of livery to Wartime unlined black | ||
12/08/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/08/1943. Dep: 09/09/1943. | ||
29/12/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/12/1943. Dep: 22/01/1944. | ||
06/01/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
10/03/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/03/1945. Dep: 21/04/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8247 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
28/05/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
27/10/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/10/1945. Dep: 29/12/1945. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 547 but not taken up | ||
07/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 79 | ||
15/02/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/02/1947. Dep: 29/03/1947. Work undertaken: Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
02/02/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/02/1948. Dep: 20/03/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 60079 |
||
30/05/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Canal (CAR) | ||
25/04/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/04/1949. Dep: 12/05/1949. | ||
07/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/11/1949. Dep: 11/11/1949. | ||
11/04/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/04/1950. Dep: 19/05/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27066 (Diagram 94HP) Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
19/05/1950 | Livery | Change of livery to BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. | ||
04/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/01/1952. Dep: 31/01/1952. Work undertaken: Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
17/07/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/07/1952. Dep: 12/08/1952. | ||
23/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/10/1952. Dep: 04/11/1952. | ||
28/07/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/07/1953. Dep: 06/10/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27050 (Diagram 94A) Right Hand Drive to Left Hand Drive |
||
13/12/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/12/1954. Dep: 20/01/1955. Work undertaken: To 75% Cut-off |
||
23/01/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/01/1956. Dep: 14/02/1956. | ||
20/09/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/09/1956. Dep: 14/11/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27065 (Diagram 94A) |
||
08/05/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/05/1958. Dep: 12/06/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27000 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
06/04/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/04/1959. Dep: 18/04/1959. | ||
25/11/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/11/1959. Dep: 01/01/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27026 (Diagram 94A) Double Chimney fitted |
||
09/1961 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
11/09/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60079 from Carlisle Canal (12C) |