Depot: Treherbert
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Treherbert | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 2750 | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | THT | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | MTHR | Merthyr Tydfil | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5659 | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | CV.BRY | Barry | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | THT | on | 15/06/1947 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays |
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 371 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | THT | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5615 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | CV.FDL | Ferndale | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | THT | on | 15/06/1947 | THT | Treherbert |
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 279 | on | 15/06/1947 | THT | 4w/e | 24/01/1948 | THT | Treherbert | ||||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 302 | on | 15/06/1947 | THT | m/e | 04/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 409 | on | 15/06/1947 | THT | 4w/e | 30/06/1949 | CV.FDL | Ferndale | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5159 | on | 15/06/1947 | THT | m/e | 04/1956 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5601 | on | 15/06/1947 | THT | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5607 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | on | 15/06/1947 | THT | 4w/e | 28/01/1961 | 88F | Treherbert |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5608 | on | 15/06/1947 | THT | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | CV.FDL | Ferndale | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5611 | on | 15/06/1947 | THT | 4w/e | 28/01/1961 | 88F | Treherbert | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5613 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | SED | Swansea East Dock | on | 15/06/1947 | THT | 4w/e | 28/01/1961 | 88F | Treherbert |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5615 | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | THT | Treherbert | on | 15/06/1947 | THT | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5636 | on | 15/06/1947 | THT | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5650 | on | 15/06/1947 | THT | 4w/e | 28/01/1950 | CV.AYN | Abercynon | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5663 | on | 15/06/1947 | THT | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5676 | on | 15/06/1947 | THT | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 88B | Radyr | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5680 | on | 15/06/1947 | THT | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 88E | Abercynon | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5688 | on | 15/06/1947 | THT | 4w/e | 04/05/1963 | 88E | Abercynon | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5691 | on | 15/06/1947 | THT | 4w/e | 10/09/1949 | CV.FDL | Ferndale | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5695 | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | CVTRT | on | 15/06/1947 | THT | on | 18/12/1962 | Withdrawn | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7722 | on | 15/06/1947 | THT | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 303 | on | 15/06/1947 | THT | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 88C | Barry | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 352 | on | 15/06/1947 | THT | on | 14/03/1955 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 365 | on | 15/06/1947 | THT | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 366 | on | 15/06/1947 | THT | on | 10/10/1955 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 368 | on | 15/06/1947 | THT | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 88E | Abercynon | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 373 | on | 15/06/1947 | THT | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 88C | Barry | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 378 | on | 15/06/1947 | THT | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 399 | on | 15/06/1947 | THT | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 88C | Barry | ||||
Steam | H | 0-6-0T | 792 | on | 15/06/1947 | THT | m/e | 02/1952 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | H | 0-6-0T | 793 | on | 15/06/1947 | THT | m/e | 11/1953 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | H | 0-6-0T | 794 | on | 15/06/1947 | THT | m/e | 11/1951 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 279 | on | 15/06/1947 | THT | Treherbert | 4w/e | 24/01/1948 | THT | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 88F | Treherbert |
Steam | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 409 | m/e | 31/03/1948 | THT | 4w/e | 18/06/1949 | CV.FDL | Ferndale | ||||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 283 | on | 15/06/1947 | CV.BRY | Barry | m/e | 30/04/1948 | THT | 4w/e | 04/09/1948 | CV.BRY | Barry |
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 207 | on | 15/06/1947 | CV.FDL | Ferndale | m/e | 30/06/1948 | THT | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | CV.FDL | Ferndale |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5622 | on | 15/06/1947 | CV.BRY | Barry | m/e | 30/06/1948 | THT | on | 14/10/1948 | CV.BRY | Barry |
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 58 | m/e | 31/03/1948 | CV.AYN | Abercynon | m/e | 30/06/1948 | THT | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | CV.BRY | Barry |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6660 | on | 15/06/1947 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | THT | 4w/e | 04/09/1948 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays |
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 285 | on | 15/06/1947 | CED | Cardiff East Dock | 4w/e | 29/01/1949 | THT | 4w/e | 25/02/1950 | 88F | Treherbert |
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 210 | on | 15/06/1947 | CED | Cardiff East Dock | 4w/e | 29/01/1949 | THT | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 297 | on | 15/06/1947 | CED | Cardiff East Dock | 4w/e | 26/02/1949 | THT | m/e | 12/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5608 | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | CV.FDL | Ferndale | 4w/e | 23/04/1949 | THT | 4w/e | 18/06/1949 | CV.FDL | Ferndale |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6648 | on | 15/06/1947 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | THT | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6655 | on | 15/06/1947 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | THT | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 81C | Southall |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5608 | 4w/e | 30/06/1949 | CV.FDL | Ferndale | 4w/e | 13/08/1949 | THT | 4w/e | 05/11/1949 | CV.FDL | Ferndale |
Steam | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 409 | 4w/e | 18/06/1949 | CV.FDL | Ferndale | 4w/e | 13/08/1949 | THT | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5691 | 4w/e | 10/09/1949 | CV.FDL | Ferndale | 4w/e | 08/10/1949 | THT | 4w/e | 09/03/1963 | 88E | Abercynon |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4177 | on | 22/11/1949 (New) | THT | 4w/e | 17/10/1950 | 88C | Barry | ||||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 285 | 4w/e | 29/01/1949 | THT | Treherbert | 4w/e | 25/02/1950 | 88F | 4w/e | 22/04/1950 | 88F | Treherbert |
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 285 | 4w/e | 25/02/1950 | 88F | Treherbert | 4w/e | 22/04/1950 | 88F | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 88C | Barry |
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 207 | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | CV.FDL | Ferndale | 4w/e | 20/05/1950 | 88F | m/e | 11/1952 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5608 | 4w/e | 05/11/1949 | CV.FDL | Ferndale | 4w/e | 20/05/1950 | 88F | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 88F | Treherbert |
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 216 | on | 15/06/1947 | CV.FDL | Ferndale | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 88F | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 88F | Treherbert |
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 299 | on | 15/06/1947 | CV.FDL | Ferndale | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 88F | m/e | 06/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5608 | 4w/e | 20/05/1950 | 88F | Treherbert | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 88F | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5693 | on | 15/06/1947 | CV.BRY | Barry | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 88F | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5183 | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | CV.BRY | Barry | 4w/e | 17/10/1950 | 88F | 4w/e | 31/10/1950 | 88F | Treherbert |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5183 | 4w/e | 17/10/1950 | 88F | Treherbert | 4w/e | 31/10/1950 | 88F | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 88C | Barry |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7722 | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 88F | 4w/e | 30/11/1950 | 88F | Treherbert |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7722 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 88F | Treherbert | 4w/e | 30/11/1950 | 88F | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5668 | on | 15/06/1947 | CV.FDL | Ferndale | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 88F | 4w/e | 31/08/1951 | 88F | Treherbert |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5668 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 88F | Treherbert | 4w/e | 31/08/1951 | 88F | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 88C | Barry |
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 279 | 4w/e | 24/01/1948 | THT | Treherbert | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 88F | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 88F | Treherbert |
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 216 | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 88F | Treherbert | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 88F | m/e | 01/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 279 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 88F | Treherbert | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 88F | 4w/e | 24/01/1953 | 88F | Treherbert |
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 236 | on | 15/06/1947 | CV.AYN | Abercynon | m/e | 31/10/1951 | 88F | w/e | 06/09/1952 | 88C | Barry |
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 218 | 4w/e | 30/11/1950 | 88E | Abercynon | m/e | 31/10/1951 | 88F | m/e | 12/1952 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 217 | on | 15/06/1947 | MTHR | Merthyr Tydfil | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 88F | m/e | 09/1952 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 210 | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 88F | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 88C | Barry |
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 211 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 88F | m/e | 05/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8495 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 88C | Barry | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 88F | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9470 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 88F | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays |
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 279 | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 88F | Treherbert | 4w/e | 24/01/1953 | 88F | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 88E | Abercynon |
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 290 | m/e | 30/06/1948 | CV.FDL | Ferndale | 4w/e | 24/01/1953 | 88F | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 88E | Abercynon |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8420 | 4w/e | 31/08/1951 | 88E | Abercynon | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 88F | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 88A | Radyr |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8424 | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 88E | Abercynon | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 88F | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8460 | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 88F | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 88A | Radyr | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8465 | 4w/e | 29/02/1952 | 88C | Barry | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 88F | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8469 | 4w/e | 30/04/1951 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 88F | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8489 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 88E | Abercynon | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 88F | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5671 | on | 15/06/1947 | CH | Cae Harris (Dowlais) | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 88F | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5162 | 4w/e | 31/12/1949 | LDR | Landore | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 88F | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5511 | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 88F | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5572 | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 88F | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays |
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82000 | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 88C | Barry | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 88F | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 84G | Shrewsbury |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5195 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 88F | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 384 | on | 15/06/1947 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 88F | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays |
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 377 | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 88F | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 381 | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 88F | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 385 | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 88F | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5600 | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 88F | m/e | 07/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5608 | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 88F | m/e | 08/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5610 | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 88F | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8455 | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 88C | Barry | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 88F | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 88A | Radyr |
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82007 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 88C | Barry | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 88F | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 84G | Shrewsbury |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5646 | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 87H | Neyland | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 88F | m/e | 09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5665 | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 88C | Barry | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 88F | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6633 | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 84J | Croes Newydd | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 88F | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8419 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 88F | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 88A | Radyr | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9425 | 6w/e | 30/06/1951 | 84C | Banbury | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 88F | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 88A | Radyr |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5154 | on | 15/06/1947 | SALOP | Shrewsbury | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 88F | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5168 | on | 15/06/1947 | SALOP | Shrewsbury | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 88F | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5632 | 4w/e | 28/01/1956 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 88F | 4w/e | 28/01/1961 | 88F | Treherbert |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5636 | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 88F | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5694 | on | 15/06/1947 | CH | Cae Harris (Dowlais) | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 88F | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 88B | Radyr |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4101 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 88F | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6619 | on | 15/06/1947 | CV.BRY | Barry | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 88F | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 88C | Barry |
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82005 | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 88F | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82001 | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 88F | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82002 | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 88F | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82032 | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 88F | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 88A | Radyr |
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82033 | on | 13/01/1955 | 83A | Newton Abbot (New) | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 88F | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 88A | Radyr |
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82034 | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 84H | Wellington | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 88F | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 88A | Radyr |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5678 | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 88F | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 88F | Treherbert |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5654 | 4w/e | 31/10/1950 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 88F | m/e | 12/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8438 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 89B | Brecon | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 88F | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 88A | Radyr |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4578 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 88C | Barry | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 88F | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 89A | Oswestry |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4580 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 88F | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 89A | Oswestry |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4589 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 88F | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5653 | 4w/e | 31/10/1950 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 88F | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 88C | Barry |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5663 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 88F | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 88A | Radyr |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5684 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 88A | Radyr | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 88F | on | 08/09/1963 | 2B | Oxley |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5687 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 88A | Radyr | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 88F | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5692 | 4w/e | 31/10/1950 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 88F | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 88A | Radyr |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5669 | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 88F | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 88A | Radyr |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5607 | on | 15/06/1947 | THT | Treherbert | 4w/e | 28/01/1961 | 88F | m/e | 12/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5611 | on | 15/06/1947 | THT | Treherbert | 4w/e | 28/01/1961 | 88F | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5613 | on | 15/06/1947 | THT | Treherbert | 4w/e | 28/01/1961 | 88F | m/e | 05/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5632 | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 88F | Treherbert | 4w/e | 28/01/1961 | 88F | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 88E | Abercynon |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5674 | 4w/e | 28/01/1961 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 88F | m/e | 04/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6654 | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 2w/e | 17/11/1962 | 88F | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 88C | Barry |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5678 | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 88F | Treherbert | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 88F | m/e | 01/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5669 | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 88A | Radyr | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 88F | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 88B | Radyr |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6621 | 4w/e | 11/08/1962 | 88B | Radyr | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 88F | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 88C | Barry |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3737 | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | on | 14/07/1963 | 88F | 5w/e | 31/08/1963 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4624 | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | on | 14/07/1963 | 88F | 5w/e | 31/08/1963 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4698 | w/e | 11/03/1959 | 70A | Nine Elms | on | 14/07/1963 | 88F | 5w/e | 31/08/1963 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6655 | 4w/e | 26/03/1960 | 88C | Barry | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | 88F | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 87F | Llanelli |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6681 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | 88F | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 88B | Radyr |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3791 | on | 15/06/1947 | DYD | Duffryn Yard | 5w/e | 31/08/1963 | 88F | m/e | 12/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4621 | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | 87J | Fishguard Goodwick | 5w/e | 31/08/1963 | 88F | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9602 | on | 15/06/1947 | FGD | Fishguard Goodwick | 5w/e | 31/08/1963 | 88F | m/e | 03/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9666 | 4w/e | 05/10/1957 | 87J | Fishguard Goodwick | 5w/e | 31/08/1963 | 88F | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9787 | 5w/e | 31/08/1963 | 87F | Llanelli | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 88F | m/e | 09/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6688 | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 22/02/1964 | 88F | m/e | 04/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5222 | m/e | 05/1964 | Withdrawn | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 (R) | 88F | |||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5659 | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 88F | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil |