Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 901 Today
» 1408 Yesterday
» 3546 Week
» 6128 Month
» 270761 Year
» 1492326 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
TVR 130 m/e 07/1916
GWR 365 y/e 1924

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Cameron
Class A
Company History TVR/GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Vulcan Foundry
To Service During 07/1916
Withdrawal Mon 17/10/1955
Service Life 39 yrs, 3 mths , 17 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 07/1916
88B Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 16/07/1955
88E Abercynon 4w/e 10/09/1955
   Withdrawn 17/10/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 88B Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 16/07/1955
ALLOC 88E Abercynon 4w/e 10/09/1955
WDN   m/e 31/10/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1916 To Service To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 130
Built at Vulcan Foundry
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 365    
16/07/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B)    
10/09/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Abercynon (88E)    
17/10/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 365    

prev prev