Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 916 Today
» 1408 Yesterday
» 3561 Week
» 6143 Month
» 270776 Year
» 1492341 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
TVR 136 m/e 03/1919
GWR 371 y/e 1924

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Cameron
Class A
Company History TVR/GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Nasmyth Wilson
To Service During 03/1919
Withdrawal Tue 18/01/1955
Service Life 35 yrs, 10 mths , 20 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 03/1919
86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 31/01/1952
86J Aberdare 6w/e 30/06/1952
86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 29/11/1952
88B Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 17/07/1954
   Withdrawn 18/01/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC RHY Rhymney 4w/e 10/07/1948
ALLOC CHYS Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 07/08/1948
ALLOC 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 29/12/1951
ALLOC 86J Aberdare 4w/e 14/06/1952
ALLOC 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 29/11/1952
ALLOC 88B Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 17/07/1954
WDN   m/e 31/01/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1919 To Service To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 136
Built at Nasmyth Wilson
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 371    
31/01/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C)    
30/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdare (86J)    
29/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C)    
17/07/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B)    
18/01/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 371    

prev prev