Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 889 Today
» 1125 Yesterday
» 4255 Week
» 889 Month
» 337735 Year
» 1559300 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 5671 m/e 08/1926

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 56xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 235
To Service During 08/1926
Withdrawal Mon 06/01/1964
Scrapping During 03/1964
Service Life 37 yrs, 5 mths , 6 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 08/1926
88F Treherbert 4w/e 08/08/1953
88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 05/09/1953
88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 30/01/1960
88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 28/01/1961
   Withdrawn on 06/01/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 88F Treherbert 4w/e 08/08/1953
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 05/09/1953
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 30/01/1960
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 28/01/1961
WDN   4w/e 27/01/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1926 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 5671
Built at Swindon Works
   
08/08/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Treherbert (88F)    
05/09/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
30/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
28/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
06/01/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 5671    

prev prev