Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 1014 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18817 Week
» 71833 Month
» 191360 Year
» 3218213 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Severn Tunnel Junction
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Severn Tunnel Junction |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | STJ (136) | 1875 | 31/01/1950 | 86E | 01/02/1950 | 31/05/1968 | ST | 06/05/1973 | |
|
Pre Grouping Company |
GWR |
Big 4 Company |
GWR |
British Railways Region |
WR |
GWR Division |
NEWPORT |
1947 Directions |
The shed is on the north side of the junction of the Swindon and
Gloucester lines east of the station. The yard is partially Visible from
the Gloucester line.
Turn left outside the station along a cinder path running parallel
to the line. This path leads to the shed. Walking time 10 minutes. |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to 136 | 1875 | Change of code to STJ | 01/02/1950 | Change of code to 86E | 06/05/1973 | Change of code to ST |
|
|
|