Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 968 Today
» 1125 Yesterday
» 4334 Week
» 968 Month
» 337814 Year
» 1559379 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 5684 m/e 10/1926

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 56xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 235
To Service During 10/1926
Withdrawal w/e Sat 17/07/1965
Scrapping During 10/1965 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
Service Life 38 yrs, 9 mths , 17 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 10/1926
88A Radyr 4w/e 25/01/1958
88F Treherbert 4w/e 12/06/1958
2B Oxley on 08/09/1963
2A Tyseley w/e 21/03/1964
   Withdrawn w/e 17/07/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 88A Radyr 4w/e 25/01/1958
ALLOC 88F Treherbert 4w/e 12/07/1958
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region 4w/e 29/09/1963
ALLOC 2B Oxley 5w/e 12/10/1963
ALLOC 2A Tyseley 4w/e 04/04/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1926 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 5684
Built at Swindon Works
   
25/01/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Radyr (88A)    
12/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Treherbert (88F)    
08/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Oxley (2B)    
21/03/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Tyseley (2A)    
17/07/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 5684    

prev prev