Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 321 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18124 Week
» 71140 Month
» 190667 Year
» 3217520 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
4177 |
on |
22/11/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
5101 |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
369 |
To Service |
Fri 22/11/1949 to Treherbert (THT) |
Withdrawal |
Fri 21/05/1965 |
Service Life |
15 yrs, 5 mths , 29 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1965 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
NYA |
|
m/e |
30/11/1949 |
1STALLOC |
THT |
Treherbert |
m/e |
31/12/1949 |
ALLOC |
88C |
Barry |
4w/e |
17/10/1950 |
ALLOC |
88A |
Cardiff Cathays |
4w/e |
08/10/1955 |
ALLOC |
88A |
Radyr |
4w/e |
28/12/1957 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
5w/e |
16/05/1965 |
WDN |
|
|
4w/e |
13/06/1965 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
22/11/1949 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 4177 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Treherbert (THT) |
|
|
17/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barry (88C) |
|
|
31/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barry (88C) |
|
|
08/10/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A) |
|
|
21/05/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 4177 |
|
|
08/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|