Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 3320 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16726 Week
» 69742 Month
» 189269 Year
» 3216122 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
5695 |
m/e |
01/1927 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
56xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
235 |
To Service |
During 01/1927 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 18/12/1962 |
Service Life |
35 yrs, 11 mths , 17 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
01/1927 |
CVFDL |
|
|
4w/e |
26/01/1946 |
CVTRT |
|
|
8w/e |
23/03/1946 |
THT |
|
Treherbert |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
18/12/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
THT |
Treherbert |
4w/e |
23/02/1946 |
ALLOC |
FDL |
Ferndale |
m/e |
28/02/1946 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
18/12/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1927 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 5695 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
26/01/1946 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
23/03/1946 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Treherbert (THT) |
|
|
18/12/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 5695 |
|
|
08/1963 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|