Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 4077 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17483 Week
» 70499 Month
» 190026 Year
» 3216879 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Taff Vale Railway |
156 |
m/e |
05/1919 |
Great Western Railway |
378 |
y/e |
1924 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Cameron |
Class |
A |
Company History |
TVR/GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Nasmyth Wilson |
To Service |
During 05/1919 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 17/12/1956 |
Service Life |
37 yrs, 7 mths , 17 dys |
Total Mileage |
717,464 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1919 |
To Service |
To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 156 Built at Nasmyth Wilson |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 378 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Treherbert (THT) |
|
|
25/11/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B) |
|
|
22/05/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D) |
|
|
04/12/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B) |
|
|
26/03/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A) |
|
|
17/12/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 378 |
|
|
18/05/1957 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|