Depot: Treherbert
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | 2750 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | 5659 | Transfer in from: | CV.BRY | Barry | ||
Steam | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | 2750 | Transfer out to: | MTHR | Merthyr Tydfil | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 371 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | 5615 | Transfer in from: | CV.FDL | Ferndale | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | 371 | Transfer out to: | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 279 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 302 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 303 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 352 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 365 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 366 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 368 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 373 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 378 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 399 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 409 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5159 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5601 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5607 | Snapshot | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5608 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5611 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5613 | Snapshot | SED | Swansea East Dock | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5615 | Snapshot | THT | Treherbert | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5615 | Snapshot | THT | Treherbert | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5636 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5650 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5659 | Snapshot | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5663 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5676 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5680 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5688 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5691 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5695 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 7722 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | H | 0-6-0T | on | 15/06/1947 | 792 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | H | 0-6-0T | on | 15/06/1947 | 793 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | H | 0-6-0T | on | 15/06/1947 | 794 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 24/01/1948 | 279 | Transfer in from: | THT | Treherbert | ||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 24/01/1948 | 279 | Transfer out to: | THT | Treherbert | ||
Steam | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | m/e | 31/03/1948 | 409 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 04/1948 | 302 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 30/04/1948 | 283 | Transfer in from: | CV.BRY | Barry | ||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 30/06/1948 | 207 | Transfer in from: | CV.FDL | Ferndale | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | m/e | 30/06/1948 | 5622 | Transfer in from: | CV.BRY | Barry | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | m/e | 30/06/1948 | 58 | Transfer in from: | CV.AYN | Abercynon | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | 58 | Transfer out to: | CV.BRY | Barry | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | 6660 | Transfer in from: | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | 207 | Transfer out to: | CV.FDL | Ferndale | ||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/09/1948 | 283 | Transfer out to: | CV.BRY | Barry | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/09/1948 | 6660 | Transfer out to: | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | on | 14/10/1948 | 5622 | Transfer out to: | CV.BRY | Barry | ||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 29/01/1949 | 210 | Transfer in from: | CED | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 29/01/1949 | 285 | Transfer in from: | CED | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 26/02/1949 | 297 | Transfer in from: | CED | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | 5608 | Transfer out to: | CV.FDL | Ferndale | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 23/04/1949 | 5608 | Transfer in from: | CV.FDL | Ferndale | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | 6648 | Transfer in from: | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | 5601 | Transfer out to: | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | 5636 | Transfer out to: | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/06/1949 | 409 | Transfer out to: | CV.FDL | Ferndale | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 18/06/1949 | 5608 | Transfer out to: | CV.FDL | Ferndale | ||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 30/06/1949 | 409 | Transfer out to: | CV.FDL | Ferndale | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | 6655 | Transfer in from: | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | Standard Goods | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/08/1949 | 409 | Transfer in from: | CV.FDL | Ferndale | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 13/08/1949 | 5608 | Transfer in from: | CV.FDL | Ferndale | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 10/09/1949 | 5691 | Transfer out to: | CV.FDL | Ferndale | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/10/1949 | 5691 | Transfer in from: | CV.FDL | Ferndale | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 05/11/1949 | 5608 | Transfer out to: | CV.FDL | Ferndale | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | on | 22/11/1949 | 4177 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 12/1949 | 297 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 28/01/1950 | 5650 | Transfer out to: | CV.AYN | Abercynon | ||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/02/1950 | 285 | Transfer in from: | THT | Treherbert | ||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/02/1950 | 285 | Transfer out to: | 88F | Treherbert | ||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 22/04/1950 | 285 | Transfer in from: | 88F | Treherbert | ||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 22/04/1950 | 285 | Transfer out to: | 88F | Treherbert | ||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 20/05/1950 | 207 | Transfer in from: | CV.FDL | Ferndale | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 20/05/1950 | 5608 | Transfer in from: | CV.FDL | Ferndale | ||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 216 | Transfer in from: | CV.FDL | Ferndale | ||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 299 | Transfer in from: | CV.FDL | Ferndale | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 5608 | Transfer in from: | 88F | Treherbert | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 5693 | Transfer in from: | CV.BRY | Barry | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 373 | Transfer out to: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 5608 | Transfer out to: | 88F | Treherbert | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 7722 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/10/1950 | 5183 | Transfer in from: | CV.BRY | Barry | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/10/1950 | 4177 | Transfer out to: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/10/1950 | 5183 | Transfer in from: | 88F | Treherbert | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/10/1950 | 5183 | Transfer out to: | 88F | Treherbert | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 7722 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 30/11/1950 | 7722 | Transfer in from: | 88F | Treherbert | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 30/11/1950 | 7722 | Transfer out to: | 88F | Treherbert | ||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 06/1951 | 299 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 5668 | Transfer in from: | CV.FDL | Ferndale | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/08/1951 | 5668 | Transfer in from: | 88F | Treherbert | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/08/1951 | 5668 | Transfer out to: | 88F | Treherbert | ||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 216 | Transfer in from: | 88F | Treherbert | ||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 279 | Transfer in from: | THT | Treherbert | ||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 216 | Transfer out to: | 88F | Treherbert | ||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 279 | Transfer out to: | 88F | Treherbert | ||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 279 | Transfer in from: | 88F | Treherbert | ||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 279 | Transfer out to: | 88F | Treherbert | ||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 31/10/1951 | 218 | Transfer in from: | 88E | Abercynon | ||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 31/10/1951 | 236 | Transfer in from: | CV.AYN | Abercynon | ||
Steam | H | 0-6-0T | m/e | 11/1951 | 195 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 5680 | Transfer out to: | 88E | Abercynon | ||
Steam | H | 0-6-0T | m/e | 02/1952 | 193 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 7722 | Transfer out to: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 217 | Transfer in from: | MTHR | Merthyr Tydfil | ||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 210 | Transfer out to: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 09/1952 | 217 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 06/09/1952 | 236 | Transfer out to: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 210 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 211 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 11/1952 | 207 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 12/1952 | 218 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 8495 | Transfer in from: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 9470 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 24/01/1953 | 279 | Transfer in from: | 88F | Treherbert | ||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 24/01/1953 | 290 | Transfer in from: | CV.FDL | Ferndale | ||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 24/01/1953 | 279 | Transfer out to: | 88F | Treherbert | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 8420 | Transfer in from: | 88E | Abercynon | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 8424 | Transfer in from: | 88E | Abercynon | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 8460 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 8465 | Transfer in from: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 8469 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 8489 | Transfer in from: | 88E | Abercynon | ||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 210 | Transfer out to: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 279 | Transfer out to: | 88E | Abercynon | ||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 285 | Transfer out to: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 290 | Transfer out to: | 88E | Abercynon | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 5671 | Transfer in from: | CH | Cae Harris (Dowlais) | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 5183 | Transfer out to: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 5671 | Transfer out to: | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 5162 | Transfer in from: | LDR | Landore | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 5511 | Transfer in from: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 5572 | Transfer in from: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 82000 | Transfer in from: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 303 | Transfer out to: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 399 | Transfer out to: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 6655 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 8495 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 9470 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 5511 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 5572 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 5663 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | H | 0-6-0T | m/e | 11/1953 | 194 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 378 | Transfer out to: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 5195 | Transfer in from: | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 384 | Transfer in from: | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 8489 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 8465 | Transfer out to: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 8469 | Transfer out to: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 377 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 381 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 385 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 8424 | Transfer out to: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 5608 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 5615 | Transfer out to: | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | ||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 01/1955 | 216 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | on | 14/03/1955 | 352 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 377 | Transfer out to: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 05/1955 | 211 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 5600 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 5608 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 5610 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 82007 | Transfer in from: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 8455 | Transfer in from: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 365 | Transfer out to: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 381 | Transfer out to: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 5646 | Transfer in from: | 87H | Neyland | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 5665 | Transfer in from: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 6633 | Transfer in from: | 84J | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 8419 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 9425 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 384 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | on | 10/10/1955 | 366 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 5154 | Transfer in from: | SALOP | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 5168 | Transfer in from: | SALOP | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 82000 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 82007 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 5632 | Transfer in from: | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 368 | Transfer out to: | 88E | Abercynon | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 5636 | Transfer in from: | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 385 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 04/1956 | 5159 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 5636 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 5694 | Transfer in from: | CH | Cae Harris (Dowlais) | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 4101 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 6619 | Transfer in from: | CV.BRY | Barry | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 82005 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 4101 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 5154 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 82001 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 82002 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 82032 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 82033 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 82034 | Transfer in from: | 84H | Wellington | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 5168 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 5195 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 6619 | Transfer out to: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 5678 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 5162 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 6648 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 5654 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 8438 | Transfer in from: | 89B | Brecon | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 4578 | Transfer in from: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 4580 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 4589 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 5653 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 5663 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 4589 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 4578 | Transfer out to: | 89A | Oswestry | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 4580 | Transfer out to: | 89A | Oswestry | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 82001 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 82032 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Radyr | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 82033 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Radyr | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 82034 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Radyr | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 82002 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 5684 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Radyr | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 5687 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Radyr | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 5692 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 8419 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Radyr | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 8420 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Radyr | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 8438 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Radyr | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 8460 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Radyr | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 9425 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Radyr | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 82005 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 8455 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Radyr | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 5669 | Transfer in from: | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 5669 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Radyr | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 5692 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Radyr | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 5663 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Radyr | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 5610 | Transfer out to: | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 28/01/1961 | 5607 | Transfer in from: | THT | Treherbert | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 28/01/1961 | 5611 | Transfer in from: | THT | Treherbert | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 28/01/1961 | 5613 | Transfer in from: | THT | Treherbert | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 28/01/1961 | 5632 | Transfer in from: | 88F | Treherbert | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 28/01/1961 | 5607 | Transfer out to: | 88F | Treherbert | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 28/01/1961 | 5611 | Transfer out to: | 88F | Treherbert | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 28/01/1961 | 5613 | Transfer out to: | 88F | Treherbert | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 28/01/1961 | 5632 | Transfer out to: | 88F | Treherbert | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 5668 | Transfer out to: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 5674 | Transfer in from: | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | m/e | 07/1962 | 5600 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 5653 | Transfer out to: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | m/e | 09/1962 | 5646 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 6633 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 2w/e | 17/11/1962 | 6654 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 5678 | Transfer in from: | 88F | Treherbert | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 5678 | Transfer out to: | 88F | Treherbert | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 5687 | Transfer out to: | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | on | 18/12/1962 | 5695 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 5669 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Radyr | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 5611 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 5693 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 09/03/1963 | 5691 | Transfer out to: | 88E | Abercynon | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 5632 | Transfer out to: | 88E | Abercynon | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/05/1963 | 5688 | Transfer out to: | 88E | Abercynon | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 6621 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Radyr | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 14/07/1963 | 3737 | Transfer in from: | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 14/07/1963 | 4624 | Transfer in from: | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 14/07/1963 | 4698 | Transfer in from: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | 6655 | Transfer in from: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | 6681 | Transfer in from: | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | m/e | 08/1963 | 5608 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5w/e | 31/08/1963 | 3791 | Transfer in from: | DYD | Duffryn Yard | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5w/e | 31/08/1963 | 4621 | Transfer in from: | 87J | Fishguard Goodwick | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5w/e | 31/08/1963 | 9602 | Transfer in from: | FGD | Fishguard Goodwick | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5w/e | 31/08/1963 | 9666 | Transfer in from: | 87J | Fishguard Goodwick | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5w/e | 31/08/1963 | 3737 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5w/e | 31/08/1963 | 4624 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5w/e | 31/08/1963 | 4698 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | on | 08/09/1963 | 5684 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 9787 | Transfer in from: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 6655 | Transfer out to: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 12/1963 | 3791 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | m/e | 12/1963 | 5607 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | m/e | 12/1963 | 5654 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | m/e | 01/1964 | 5678 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 22/02/1964 | 6688 | Transfer in from: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | m/e | 04/1964 | 5674 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | m/e | 04/1964 | 6688 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 5694 | Transfer out to: | 88B | Radyr | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 5222 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 5659 | Transfer in from: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 5659 | Transfer out to: | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 5669 | Transfer out to: | 88B | Radyr | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 5676 | Transfer out to: | 88B | Radyr | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 6621 | Transfer out to: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 6654 | Transfer out to: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 6681 | Transfer out to: | 88B | Radyr | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 09/1964 | 9787 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 03/1965 | 9602 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 4621 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 5665 | Transfer out to: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 9666 | Transfer out to: | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | m/e | 05/1965 | 5613 | Condemned |