Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 2964 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16370 Week
» 69386 Month
» 188913 Year
» 3215766 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Taff Vale Railway |
164 |
m/e |
06/1920 |
Great Western Railway |
384 |
y/e |
1924 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Cameron |
Class |
A |
Company History |
TVR/GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Hawthorn Leslie |
To Service |
During 06/1920 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 13/02/1956 |
Service Life |
35 yrs, 8 mths , 13 dys |
Total Mileage |
799,754 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
88F |
Treherbert |
5w/e |
30/01/1954 |
ALLOC |
88A |
Cardiff Cathays |
4w/e |
08/10/1955 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
29/02/1956 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1920 |
To Service |
To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 164 Built at Hawthorn Leslie |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 384 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Cardiff Cathays (CHYS) |
|
|
30/01/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Treherbert (88F) |
|
|
08/10/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A) |
|
|
13/02/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 384 |
|
|
21/04/1956 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|