Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 2964 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16370 Week
» 69386 Month
» 188913 Year
» 3215766 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Cardiff Cathays
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Cardiff Cathays |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | CHYS (58) | 1875 | 31/01/1950 | 88A | 01/02/1950 | 30/11/1957 | 88M | 01/03/1962 | 29/11/1964 |
|
Big 4 Company |
GWR |
GWR Division |
CARDIFF VALLEYS |
1947 Directions |
The shed is on the west side of the line at the north end of Cathays
Halt. The yard is visible from the line.
From Cathays Halt.
The entrance to the halt is on the opposite side of Corbett Road to
the shed entrance. Note.-This halt is closed during Saturday Afternoon
and Sunday.
From Cardiff General Station.
Turn right outside the station into Saunders Road. Turn left into
St. Mary’s Street, and continue into High Street. Turn right into Duke
Street, and left almost immediately into Kingsway. Continue into
North Road, and turn right into Corbett Road. The shed entrance is
on the left hand side just before the railway underbridge. Walking
time 25 minutes. |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to 58 | 1875 | Change of code to CHYS | 01/02/1950 | Change of code to 88A | 01/03/1962 | Change of code to 88M |
|
|
|