Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 142 Today
» 1086 Yesterday
» 6449 Week
» 21563 Month
» 324753 Year
» 1546318 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 5678 m/e 09/1926

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 56xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 235
To Service During 09/1926
Withdrawal Wed 15/01/1964
Scrapping During 05/1964
Service Life 37 yrs, 4 mths , 15 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1926
88A Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 31/08/1950
88F Treherbert 4w/e 03/11/1956
88F Treherbert 4w/e 15/12/1962
   Withdrawn on 15/01/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC RHY Rhymney 4w/e 28/12/1946
ALLOC 88A Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 12/08/1950
ALLOC 88F Treherbert 4w/e 03/11/1956
ALLOC 88F Treherbert 4w/e 15/12/1962
WDN   4w/e 27/01/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1926 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 5678
Built at Swindon Works
   
31/08/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A)    
03/11/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Treherbert (88F)    
15/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Treherbert (88F)    
15/01/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 5678    

prev prev