Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 142 Today
» 1086 Yesterday
» 6449 Week
» 21563 Month
» 324753 Year
» 1546318 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 5663 m/e 02/1926

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 56xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 235
To Service During 02/1926
Withdrawal Fri 03/08/1962
Scrapping During 10/1962 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 36 yrs, 6 mths , 3 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 02/1926
88A Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 31/10/1953
88F Treherbert 4w/e 25/01/1958
88A Radyr 4w/e 24/01/1959
88A Radyr 4w/e 03/10/1959
   Withdrawn on 03/08/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 88A Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 31/10/1953
ALLOC 88F Treherbert 4w/e 28/12/1957
ALLOC 88A Radyr m/e 28/02/1959
ALLOC 88A Radyr 4w/e 03/10/1959
WDN   m/e 31/08/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1926 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 5663
Built at Swindon Works
   
31/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A)    
25/01/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Treherbert (88F)    
24/01/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Radyr (88A)    
03/10/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Radyr (88A)    
03/08/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 5663    

prev prev