Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1374 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19177 Week
» 72193 Month
» 191720 Year
» 3218573 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Abercynon
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Abercynon |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | CV.AYN (18) | 01/01/1929 | 31/01/1950 | 88E | 01/02/1950 | 02/11/1964 |
|
Date Closed |
02/11/1964 |
Big 4 Company |
GWR |
British Railways Region |
WR |
GWR Division |
CARDIFF VALLEYS |
Information |
Still standing, in use as a foundry |
1947 Directions |
The shed is on the east side of the line at the north end of the station. The yard is visible from the line.
The shed and station entrances are adjacent. Walking time less than 5 minutes. |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to 18 | 01/01/1929 | Change of code to AYN | 01/02/1950 | Change of code to 88E | 02/11/1964 | Depot closed |
|
|
|