Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 146 Today
» 1086 Yesterday
» 6453 Week
» 21567 Month
» 324757 Year
» 1546322 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 5680 m/e 09/1926

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 56xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 235
To Service During 09/1926
Withdrawal Mon 02/12/1963
Scrapping During 03/1964
Service Life 37 yrs, 3 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1926
88E Abercynon 4w/e 29/02/1952
88A Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 30/01/1954
88E Abercynon 4w/e 27/02/1954
88J Aberdare 4w/e 06/10/1962
   Withdrawn on 02/12/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 88E Abercynon 4w/e 26/01/1952
ALLOC 88A Cardiff Cathays 5w/e 30/01/1954
ALLOC 88E Abercynon 4w/e 27/02/1954
ALLOC 88J Aberdare 4w/e 06/10/1962
WDN   4w/e 30/11/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
02/04/1948 Caerphilly Works On 2/4 the following locomotives were noted in the Erecting Shop:-Nos. 64, 72, 270, 320/21, 390, 3103/89, 3712, 4134, 4256/63/93/98, 4404, 5114, 5223, 5635/58/68/80, 6661 an 8796, while outside were observed Nos. 190, 3178, 4238/52, 5219, 5549 an 5649. SLS/194805

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1926 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 5680
Built at Swindon Works
   
29/02/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Abercynon (88E)    
30/01/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A)    
27/02/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Abercynon (88E)    
06/10/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdare (88J)    
02/12/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 5680    

prev prev