Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 894 Today
» 1125 Yesterday
» 4260 Week
» 894 Month
» 337740 Year
» 1559305 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 5668 m/e 06/1926

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 56xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 235
To Service During 06/1926
Withdrawal Mon 07/09/1964
Service Life 38 yrs, 3 mths , 7 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 06/1926
88F Treherbert 4w/e 31/08/1951
88C Barry 4w/e 17/06/1961
   Withdrawn on 07/09/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 88F Treherbert 4w/e 11/08/1951
ALLOC 88C Barry 4w/e 17/06/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
02/04/1948 Caerphilly Works On 2/4 the following locomotives were noted in the Erecting Shop:-Nos. 64, 72, 270, 320/21, 390, 3103/89, 3712, 4134, 4256/63/93/98, 4404, 5114, 5223, 5635/58/68/80, 6661 an 8796, while outside were observed Nos. 190, 3178, 4238/52, 5219, 5549 an 5649. SLS/194805

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1926 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 5668
Built at Swindon Works
   
31/08/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Treherbert (88F)    
17/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (88C)    
07/09/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 5668    

prev prev