Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 155 Today
» 1086 Yesterday
» 6462 Week
» 21576 Month
» 324766 Year
» 1546331 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 5676 m/e 09/1926

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 56xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 235
To Service During 09/1926
Withdrawal w/e Sat 06/11/1965
Scrapping During 05/1966 at Cohens (Morriston)
Service Life 39 yrs, 2 mths , 6 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1926
88B Radyr 7w/e 22/06/1964
6C Croes Newydd on 06/09/1964
   Withdrawn w/e 06/11/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 88B Radyr 3w/e 29/06/1964
ALLOC 6C Croes Newydd w/e 12/09/1964
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region 3w/e 14/09/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1926 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 5676
Built at Swindon Works
   
22/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Radyr (88B)    
06/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Croes Newydd (6C)    
06/11/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 5676    

prev prev