Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 1022 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18825 Week
» 71841 Month
» 191368 Year
» 3218221 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Taff Vale Railway |
105 |
m/e |
06/1908 |
Great Western Railway (1922) |
236 |
4w/e |
10/1922 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Hurry Riches |
Class |
O4 |
Company History |
TVR/GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
5132 |
To Service |
During 06/1908 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 12/01/1953 |
Service Life |
44 yrs, 7 mths , 12 dys |
Total Mileage |
745,262 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
06/1908 |
CV.AYN |
|
Abercynon |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
88F |
|
Treherbert |
m/e |
31/10/1951 |
88C |
|
Barry |
w/e |
06/09/1952 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
12/01/1953 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
88F |
Treherbert |
m/e |
31/10/1951 |
ALLOC |
88C |
Barry |
4w/e |
06/09/1952 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
31/01/1953 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1908 |
To Service |
To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 105 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 5132 |
|
|
10/1922 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 236 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Abercynon (CV.AYN) |
|
|
31/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Treherbert (88F) |
|
|
06/09/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barry (88C) |
|
|
12/01/1953 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 236 |
|
|
18/04/1953 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|