Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1638 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15044 Week
» 68060 Month
» 187587 Year
» 3214440 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
8460 |
on |
05/06/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Hawksworth |
Class |
94xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0PT |
Builder |
Yorkshire Engine Company |
Order Number |
Unk |
Works Number |
2453 |
To Service |
Thu 05/06/1950 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 12/01/1961 |
Service Life |
10 yrs, 7 mths , 7 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
on |
05/06/1950 |
88F |
|
Treherbert |
4w/e |
21/03/1953 |
88A |
|
Radyr |
4w/e |
12/06/1958 |
85A |
|
Worcester |
4w/e |
03/10/1959 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
12/01/1961 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
NYA |
|
m/e |
30/06/1950 |
ALLOC |
88F |
Treherbert |
4w/e |
21/03/1953 |
ALLOC |
88F |
Treherbert |
4w/e |
13/08/1955 |
ALLOC |
88F |
Treherbert |
4w/e |
22/03/1958 |
ALLOC |
88A |
Radyr |
4w/e |
12/07/1958 |
ALLOC |
85A |
Worcester |
4w/e |
03/10/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
31/01/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/06/1950 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 8460 Built at Yorkshire Engine Company, Works Number 2453 |
|
|
21/03/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Treherbert (88F) |
|
|
12/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Radyr (88A) |
|
|
03/10/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Worcester (85A) |
|
|
12/01/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 8460 |
|
|
04/1961 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cohens: Morriston |
|
|