Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 134 Today
» 1016 Yesterday
» 2279 Week
» 16536 Month
» 244420 Year
» 1465985 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Oxley


Depot Details
Depot Name Oxley
Depot Codes
CodeFromTo
114187531/01/1946
OXY187531/01/1950
84B01/02/195031/08/1963
2B01/09/196328/02/1967
Date Opened 01/07/1907
Date Closed 06/03/1967
Pre Grouping Company GWR
Big 4 Company GWR
British Railways Region LMR
GWR Division WOLVERHAMPTON
1947 Directions The shed is on the west side of the line north of the station and Stafford Road shed. The yard is not visible from the line.

Follow the same routes from the stations as for Stafford Road shed but continue along Stafford Road past the entrance to that shed. Turn first left past the canal bridge along Jones Road. This road ends by a railway viaduct, and there is a gate on the right hand side by one of the viaduct pillars. The left hand cinder path from this gate leads to the shed. Walking time from the stations 30 minutes. A trolley bus service operates between Princes Square, and the end of Jones Road.

Note. Bushbury Lane is the second turning on the right of Stafford Road after Jones Road.
Popup Maps (New Window) Street Map (1:25,000)
Town Map (1:50,000)
Road Map (1:100,000)
Road Map (1:200,000)
County Map (1:500,000)
Regional Map (1:1,000,000)
Chronology
DateEvent
1875Change of code to 114
1875Change of code to OXY
01/07/1907Depot opened
01/02/1950Change of code to 84B
01/09/1963Change of code to 2B
06/03/1967Depot closed