Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 669 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14075 Week
» 67091 Month
» 186618 Year
» 3213471 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Taff Vale Railway |
38 |
m/e |
04/1907 |
Great Western Railway (1922) |
285 |
4w/e |
10/1922 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Hurry Riches |
Class |
O4 |
Company History |
TVR/GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Manning, Wardle & Co. |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
1698 |
To Service |
During 04/1907 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 24/08/1953 |
Service Life |
46 yrs, 4 mths , 24 dys |
Total Mileage |
703,792 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
THT |
Treherbert |
4w/e |
29/01/1949 |
ALLOC |
88F |
Treherbert |
4w/e |
25/02/1950 |
ALLOC |
88F |
Treherbert |
4w/e |
22/04/1950 |
ALLOC |
88C |
Barry |
4w/e |
21/03/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
31/08/1953 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1907 |
To Service |
To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 38 Built at Manning, Wardle & Co., Works Number 1698 |
|
|
10/1922 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 285 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Cardiff East Dock (CED) |
|
|
29/01/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Treherbert (THT) |
|
|
25/02/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Treherbert (88F) |
|
|
22/04/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Treherbert (88F) |
|
|
21/03/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barry (88C) |
|
|
24/08/1953 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 285 |
|
|
22/03/1958 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|