Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 965 Today
» 1125 Yesterday
» 4331 Week
» 965 Month
» 337811 Year
» 1559376 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 5691 m/e 01/1927

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 56xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 235
To Service During 01/1927
Withdrawal Fri 25/06/1965
Scrapping During 10/1965
Service Life 38 yrs, 5 mths , 25 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 01/1927
88E Abercynon 4w/e 09/03/1963
88B Radyr w/e 08/11/1964
   Withdrawn on 25/06/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC FDL Ferndale 4w/e 10/09/1949
ALLOC THT Treherbert 4w/e 08/10/1949
ALLOC 88E Abercynon 4w/e 09/03/1963
ALLOC 88B Radyr 3w/e 02/11/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
15/12/1963 Swindon Works ('A' Shop) Triangle: 3653, 8425, 9425. Yard: D1060, D7092, 2818, 3668/71/6, 4111, 4555, 4690, 4987, 6000/10/25, 6159, 6831/48/9/50/9/61, 6922, 8738, 9645, 76037/76/81. Dump: 3706, 5201, 5787, 6011, 6151, 6618/31/74, 6724, 8103, 8461/91, 8791, 9401. 'A' Shop: D812/9/24/34/5/45/61, D1006/8/16/26/7/8/9/36/40/3/5/9/65, D3031, D3515/7/97, D3603/6/7, D6328, D7003/12/26/35/58, 4113/76, 5691, 6141/3, 6866, 6976/98, 7808/12/20/6, 7928, 9600/66, 73053/93, 76041, 92003. Ex-Works: 6858. Stored on Shed: 1006/27, 3842, 4631, 4924/96, 5017, 5357, 5814, 5904/43, 9604. SLS/196401

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1927 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 5691
Built at Swindon Works
   
09/03/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Abercynon (88E)    
08/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Radyr (88B)    
25/06/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 5691    

prev prev