Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 968 Today
» 1125 Yesterday
» 4334 Week
» 968 Month
» 337814 Year
» 1559379 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 5659 m/e 02/1926

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 56xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 235
To Service During 02/1926
Withdrawal w/e Sat 27/11/1965
Scrapping During 02/1966 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
Service Life 39 yrs, 9 mths , 27 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 02/1926
88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 31/10/1950
88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 30/11/1950
88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 31/01/1951
86G Pontypool Road 4w/e 16/07/1955
88F Treherbert 3w/e 04/05/1964
88D Merthyr Tydfil 7w/e 22/06/1964
2C Stourbridge Junction on 25/04/1965
6C Croes Newydd w/e 02/10/1965
   Withdrawn w/e 27/11/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC MTHR Merthyr Tydfil m/e 30/06/1948
ALLOC CHYS Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 10/07/1948
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 17/06/1950
ALLOC 88A Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 15/07/1950
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 17/10/1950
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 04/11/1950
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil w/e 31/12/1950
ALLOC 88A Cardiff Cathays 8w/e 03/11/1951
ALLOC 86G Pontypool Road 4w/e 16/07/1955
ALLOC 88F Treherbert 3w/e 04/05/1964
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 2w/e 16/05/1964
ALLOC 2C Stourbridge Junction 5w/e 12/04/1965
ALLOC 2C Stourbridge Junction 4w/e 08/05/1965
ALLOC 6C Croes Newydd 4w/e 09/10/1965
WDN   w/e 27/11/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
17/03/1963 Swindon Works (Works Yard) Triangle: 4612, 4915, 5027/95, 5931, 6112, 8472. Works Yard: 3769/84, 4082, 5072/78, 5659, 6011/18/25/26, 6369, 6815, 6933, 7314, 8773/76, 9725, D6352. Weigh House: 6944, 7822. 'C' Shop: W.D. 71528. Dump: 2883, 4939, 5023, 6101, 6342/48, 6422, 6962, 8770, 9652, 9727/44/47/59/75, 7334. Dismantling Shed: 5020. 'A' Shop: D35, D101, D809, D813/18, D825/29, D1001/7/11/35. D1018-27 new - in various stages of oonstruction, D3189, D3365/98, D3424, D3505/06/22/25, D4000, D6311, D7002/32/38, 3687, 3755, 3836, 4623/73/77, 5006, 5775, 6855, 6918/22/61/72, 7919/25/28, 8109, 8433/81, 9437, 9648/66/80, 15100/05. Stock Shed: D7072 New. On Running Shed: 6000. Ex Works: 3837, 6819/78, 7913, 8459, 9405. SLS/196304
24/04/1963 Derby MPD (Works Yard) 42636 was badly damaged when it fell into the pit at Derby on 24th April. It is now on works undergoing assessment. SLS/196304

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1926 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 5659
Built at Swindon Works
   
31/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
30/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
31/01/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
16/07/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Pontypool Road (86G)    
04/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Treherbert (88F)    
22/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
25/04/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Stourbridge Junction (2C)    
02/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Croes Newydd (6C)    
27/11/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 5659    

prev prev