Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 133 Today
» 1086 Yesterday
» 6440 Week
» 21554 Month
» 324744 Year
» 1546309 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 5653 m/e 01/1926

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 56xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 235
To Service During 01/1926
Withdrawal Tue 01/01/1963
Scrapping During 06/1963 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 37 yrs , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 01/1926
88A Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 31/10/1950
88F Treherbert 4w/e 25/01/1958
88C Barry 4w/e 14/07/1962
   Withdrawn on 01/01/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 88A Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 17/10/1950
ALLOC 88F Treherbert 4w/e 28/12/1957
ALLOC 88C Barry 4w/e 14/07/1962
WDN   4w/e 12/01/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1926 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 5653
Built at Swindon Works
   
31/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A)    
25/01/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Treherbert (88F)    
14/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (88C)    
01/01/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 5653    

prev prev